Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Chulick, Carol, Hagen, Deborah, Hagler, Joleen, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Brayton, Alan Richard, against Anheuser-Busch, Llc, Anheuserbusch, Llc, Associated Insulation Of California, Buttner Corp., Columbia Mechanical Contractors, Inc., (total of 31) See All represented by Barber, Steven J., Burke, John Anthony, Cordery, Theodore Thomas, Dillon, Ian P, Duffy, Joseph, (total of 16) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Cynthia Ming-mei Lee presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2019 |
CategoryAsbestos |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions191 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
This complaint is a complaint in intervention filed by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company and American Employers Insurance Company, who are insurers of defendant Associated Insulation of California, Inc. The complaint is filed in the Superior Court of ...
DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 64452518) AS TO DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLC
Date: November 21, 2019ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PREFERENCE AND ADVANCING THE TRIAL DATE PURSUANT TO C.C.P 36(A)
Date: September 09, 2021WITNESS LIST (TRANSACTION ID # 66956746) FILED BY DEFENDANT ROSENDIN ELECTRIC, INC.
Date: September 22, 2021ORDER : STIPULATION AND ORDER TO PERMIT FILING OF ANSWER IN INTERVENTION
Date: December 17, 2020CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 64318744)
Date: October 15, 2019DEMAND FOR JURY (TRANSACTION ID # 63056829) FILED BY DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLC
Date: March 12, 2019ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 63056829) FILED BY DEFENDANT GRINNELL LLC
Date: March 12, 2019ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PREFERENCE AND EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUT-OFF
Date: August 14, 2019ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62997191) FILED BY DEFENDANT MONTEREY MECHANICAL CO.
Date: February 22, 2019ANSWER TO COMPLAINT (TRANSACTION ID # 62982154) FILED BY DEFENDANT FDCC CALIFORNIA, INC.
Date: February 19, 2019NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 22, 2019ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT COLUMBIA MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 23, 2021ORDER - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: November 04, 2021MINUTES FOR AUG-14-2019 9:30 AM
Date: August 14, 2019MINUTES FOR FEB-08-2022 2:00 PM
Date: February 08, 2022MINUTES FOR FEB-04-2022 2:00 PM
Date: February 04, 2022MINUTES FOR JAN-25-2022 1:30 PM
Date: January 25, 2022MINUTES FOR JAN-13-2022 10:00 AM
Date: January 13, 2022MINUTES FOR JAN-03-2022 10:00 AM
Date: January 03, 2022WITNESS LIST (TRANSACTION ID # 67201952) FILED BY DEFENDANT COSCO FIRE PROTECTION, INC.
Date: December 29, 2021EXHIBIT LIST (TRANSACTION ID # 67201952) FILED BY DEFENDANT COSCO FIRE PROTECTION, INC.
Date: December 29, 2021EXHIBIT LIST (TRANSACTION ID # 67199849) FILED BY DEFENDANT ROSENDIN ELECTRIC, INC.
Date: December 29, 2021TRIAL BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 67198506) FILED BY DEFENDANT D. ZELINKSY & SONS, INC.
Date: December 28, 2021TRIAL BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 67198495) FILED BY DEFENDANT GEORGE H. WILSON, INC.
Date: December 28, 2021TRIAL BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 67195845) FILED BY DEFENDANT FDCC CALIFORNIA, INC.
Date: December 27, 2021TRIAL BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 67195560) FILED BY DEFENDANT SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA
Date: December 27, 2021TRIAL BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 67195731) FILED BY DEFENDANT MONTEREY MECHANICAL CO.
Date: December 27, 2021TRIAL BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 67195641) FILED BY DEFENDANT ROSENDIN ELECTRIC, INC.
Date: December 27, 2021WITNESS LIST (TRANSACTION ID # 67193243) FILED BY DEFENDANT ROSENDIN ELECTRIC, INC.
Date: December 23, 2021WITNESS LIST (TRANSACTION ID # 67200992) FILED BY DEFENDANT FDCC CALIFORNIA, INC.
Date: December 29, 2021TRIAL BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 67195363) FILED BY DEFENDANT COLUMBIA MECHANICAL CONTRACTORS, INC.
Date: December 27, 2021TRIAL BRIEF (TRANSACTION ID # 67195270) FILED BY DEFENDANT COOPER BROTHERS, INC.
Date: December 27, 2021EXHIBIT LIST (TRANSACTION ID # 67200992) FILED BY DEFENDANT FDCC CALIFORNIA, INC.
Date: December 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2022 | Hearing |
ASBESTOS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
|
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67740198) AS TO DEFENDANT FRANK BONETTI PLUMBING, INC. | |
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67731792) AS TO DEFENDANT MARCONI PLASTERING COMPANY, INC. | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 67656628) FILED BY DEFENDANT MONTEREY MECHANICAL CO. | |
May 20, 2022 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ; EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 67642102) AS TO DEFENDANT MONTEREY MECHANICAL CO. | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ; EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 67623604) AS TO DEFENDANT SCOTT CO. OF CALIFORNIA | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ; EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 67602603) AS TO DEFENDANT D. ZELINSKY & SONS, INCORPORATED | |
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ; EACH PARTY TO BEAR ITS OWN COSTS (TRANSACTION ID # 67576594) AS TO DEFENDANT GEORGE H. WILSON, INC. | |
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PLAINTIFFS HEREBY DISMISS ALL ALLEGATIONS, IF ANY, RELATED TO EXPOSURE TO ASBESTOS ON OR AGTER DECEMBER 5, 1980 AS TO ASSOCIATED INSULATION OF CALIFORNIA ONLY AND HEREBY AMENDS THEIR COMPLAINT(S) ACCORDINGLY. (TRANSACTION ID # 67515732) | |
March 28, 2022 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY ASBESTOS
Judge: CYNTHIA M. LEE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.