Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
City And County Of San Francisco, City And County Of San Francisco (Consolidated, Ghlotti Bros., Inc., A California Corporation, Synergy Project Management, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Daar, Randolph Elliott, Knadler, Johnny D., Rosenfeld, Ben, Yan, Matthew, Diwik, James P, (total of 6) See All against Breed, London, City And County Of San Francisco, Does 1-100, Does 2-100, Et Al., Ghilotti Bros., Inc., (total of 9) See All represented by Baruth, Ari, Delaye, Jaime Huling, Diwik, James P, Flynn, Ronald, Lew, Debra Dee, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Samuel K. Feng presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSamuel K. Feng Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 10, 2017 |
CategoryOther Non Exempt Complaints (Intentional Interference With Contractual Relations) |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL
Date: February 03, 2022RECORD REMANDED BACK TO SUPERIOR COURT
Date: August 09, 2021ORDER GRANTING THE CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: May 17, 2022MINUTES FOR APR-12-2021 9:30 AM
Date: April 12, 2021ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SENT BY COURT
Date: November 27, 2019RECORD REMANDED BACK TO SUPERIOR COURT
Date: November 25, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF SYNERGY PROJECT MANAGEMENT, INC.
Date: October 23, 2017NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: July 10, 2017STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: February 04, 2021ANSWER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GHILOTTI BROS., INC.
Date: November 04, 2020NOTICE OF LIEN (CPF-19-516886) FILED BY CLAIMANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO
Date: August 11, 2020NOTICE OF LIEN (CPF-19-516755) FILED BY CLAIMANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO
Date: August 11, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67814023)
Date: July 12, 2022ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REOPEN DISCOVERY
Date: July 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2023 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
September 19, 2022 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: SAMUEL K. FENG |
|
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER ON STIPULATION WITHDRAWING DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO'S MEMORANDUM OF COSTS IN EXCHANGE FOR PLAINTIFF FOREGOING APPEAL | |
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AND DISBURSEMENTS, $1,486.00 TOTAL COSTS, (TRANSACTION ID # 67849347) FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 67814023) | |
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF SYNERGY PROJECT MANAGEMENT, INC. TAKE NOTHING FROM DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REOPEN DISCOVERY | |
July 06, 2022 | Hearing |
Plaintiff Synergy Project Management, Inc.'S Amended Notice Of Hearing Date And Time Of Motion To Reopen Discovery
Judge: RICHARD B. ULMER |
|
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | LAW & MOTION, DEPT. 302, JUL-06-2022 HEARING HELD RE: PLAINTIFF SYNERGY PROJECT MANAGEMENT, INC.'S MOTION TO REOPEN DISCOVERY. THE COURT TAKES THE MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION. JUDGE: RICHARD B. ULMER JR.; CLERK: SEAN KANE; COURT REPORTER: NANCY PRESANT, CSR NO. 9906, EMAIL: NPRESANTCSR@GMAIL.COM, TEL: 510-757-8550 (302/RBU) ***** AFTER THE HEARING, THE COURT SIGNS AN ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REOPEN DISCOVERY. (SEE SIGNED ORDER FOR COMPLETE RULING.) (302/RBU) ***** | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR JUL-06-2022 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.