Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance, California Insurance Company,, Silver Autumn Hotel, Warwick Amusements Corporation,, Warwick California Corporation, (total of 8) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kook, Spencer Y, Wall, Travis R., Lichtenegger, Larry J, Roxborough, Nicholas P, against Applied Risk Services, Inc.,, Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance, Applied Underwriters, Inc., A Nebraska Corporation, California Insurance Company,, Continental Indeminty Company, An Iowa Corporation, (total of 9) See All represented by Cohen, Jodi S., Kook, Spencer Y, Larsen, Cynthia J, Wall, Travis R., in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Richard B. Ulmer, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard B. Ulmer, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 22, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions678 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
This complaint is a cross-complaint filed by Applied Underwriters Captive Risk Assurance Company, Inc. (AUCRA) and California Insurance Company (CIC) against Warwick California Corporation and WSF Beverage Corporation. AUCRA and CIC allege that Cross...
MINUTES FOR MAY-23-2018 9:50 AM
Date: May 23, 2018ORDER RE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS/BRIEF ETAL A149713 DIV 4
Date: November 03, 2016ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 23, 2017ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: April 25, 2017ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS.
Date: March 01, 2018STATEMENT OF DECISION [PROPOSED]
Date: July 10, 2018STATEMENT OF DECISION
Date: August 17, 2018REMITTITUR DISMISSED A155523 DIV 4
Date: March 18, 2020CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: October 11, 2018CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: March 26, 2019MINUTES FOR AUG-17-2018 2:30 PM
Date: August 17, 2018EXHIBIT LIST FOR DEFENDANTS FILED
Date: June 05, 2018EXHIBIT LIST FOR PLAINTIFF FILED
Date: June 05, 2018MINUTES FOR JUN-04-2018 9:00 AM
Date: June 04, 2018MINUTES FOR MAY-31-2018 9:00 AM
Date: May 31, 2018MINUTES FOR MAY-30-2018 1:30 PM
Date: May 30, 2018MINUTES FOR MAY-29-2018 9:00 AM
Date: May 29, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event | REMITTITUR DISMISSED A155523 DIV 4 | |
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ORDER APPOINTING COMMISSIONER AS CONSERVATOR OF CALIFORNIA INSURANCE COMPANY AND ENJOINING PROCEEDINGS (TRANSACTION ID # 100089486) FILED BY DEFENDANT INSURANCE COMMISSIONER IN HIS CAPACITY AS CONSERVATOR OF CALIFORNIA INSURANCE COMPANY | |
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE DESIGNATING ORIGINAL EXHIBITS TO BE TRANSMITTED TO REVIEWING COURT (TRANSACTION ID # 63629234) FILED BY DEFENDANT APPLIED UNDERWRITERS, INC., A NEBRASKA CORPORATION APPLIED UNDERWRITERS CAPTIVE RISK ASSURANCE COMPANY, INC., AN IOWA CORPORATION | |
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE DESIGNATING ORIGINAL EXHIBITS TO BE TRANSMITTED TO REVIEWING COURT (TRANSACTION ID # 63559764) FILED BY APPELLANT APPLIED UNDERWRITERS CAPTIVE RISK ASSURANCE COMPANY, INC., AN IOWA CORPORATION CALIFORNIA INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION | |
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION NOTICE | |
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event | APPEAL RECORD CERTIFIED TO THE COURT OF APPEAL - 8.124, 7 VOLS RT (APPEAL FILED 10/10/18, A155523 DIV 4) | |
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL *AMENDED* (TRANSACTION ID # 62675102) FILED BY APPELLANT APPLIED UNDERWRITERS CAPTIVE RISK ASSURANCE COMPANY, INC., AN IOWA CORPORATION CALIFORNIA INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION | |
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL (TRANSACTION ID # 62674209) FILED BY APPELLANT APPLIED UNDERWRITERS CAPTIVE RISK ASSURANCE COMPANY, INC., AN IOWA CORPORATION CALIFORNIA INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION | |
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL SENT TO APPELLANT APPLIED UNDERWRITERS CAPTIVE RISK ASSURANCE COMPANY, INC., AN IOWA CORPORATION CALIFORNIA INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION | |
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event | CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.