Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Marshall, Alex, Marshall, Nathan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Cooper, Miles B, Mcguinn, Cynthia Bernet, against Behbahani, Faegh, Desoto Cab Company, Inc., Does 1 To 20, Incl., Does 3-20, Selby And Hudson Corporation, (total of 5) See All represented by Frimel, William J, King, David Matthew, Segal, Philip Allan, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with John Kennedy Stewart presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn Kennedy Stewart Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 05, 2012 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions562 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time1534 days |
This complaint is a reply in support of a defendant's demurrer to the plaintiffs' second amended complaint. The defendant, Selby and Hudson Corporation, is arguing that the plaintiffs have failed to adequately plead that Selby and Hudson is the alter...
PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 55026631) FILED BY DEFENDANT SELBY AND HUDSON CORPORATION
Date: February 20, 2014ORDER OVERRULING DEFENDANT SELBY AND HUDSON'S DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 10, 2014ORDER TO ADD DEFENDANTS TO CASE CAPTION
Date: September 20, 2013ORDER AND STIPULATION FOR MOTION TO BE HEARD BY A MEMBER OF THE CA BAR SERVING AS A TEMPORARY JUDGE
Date: September 26, 2014ORDER GRANTING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OF DEFENDANTS DESOTO CAB COMPANY, INC. AND FAEGH BEHBAHANI
Date: December 23, 2014ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR STIPULATED CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL DATE
Date: August 14, 2013ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT BEHBAHANI, FAEGH
Date: June 29, 2012NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: June 05, 2012ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Date: September 16, 2014ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT DESOTO CAB COMPANY, INC.
Date: June 22, 2012MEDICAL REIMBURSEMENT LIEN FILED BY OTHER CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO
Date: October 30, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE (TRANSACTION ID # 55036192) FILED BY DEFENDANT SELBY AND HUDSON CORPORATION
Date: February 21, 2014ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION PURSUANT TO STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL
Date: March 26, 2014ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT SELBY AND HUDSON CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 15, 2014REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (TRANSACTION ID # 55802145)
Date: July 29, 2014ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: October 22, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2016 | Hearing |
CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
August 17, 2016 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OF AUG-30-2016 IS OFF CALENDAR. DISMISSAL ON FILE. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
May 18, 2016 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE (TRANSACTION ID # 59023311) | |
February 17, 2015 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: JOHN K. STEWART |
|
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event | REMOVED FROM MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR FEB-17-2015 - CASE SETTLED PER NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED ON 12/3/14. ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 610 ON AUG-30-2016 AT 10:30 AM FOR DISMISSAL PER CRC 3.1385. (206) | |
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 56555327) FILED BY DEFENDANT BEHBAHANI, FAEGH DESOTO CAB COMPANY, INC. | |
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT OF DEFENDANTS DESOTO CAB COMPANY, INC. AND FAEGH BEHBAHANI | |
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT , CONDITIONAL(TRANSACTION ID # 56411787) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARSHALL, NATHAN MARSHALL, ALEX INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS IN ITEREST TO DECEDENTS DENNIS T. MARSHALL AND KAREN MARSHALL | |
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 56411787) FILED BY PLAINTIFF MARSHALL, NATHAN MARSHALL, ALEX INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS IN ITEREST TO DECEDENTS DENNIS T. MARSHALL AND KAREN MARSHALL | |
October 28, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; POS FILED BY DEFENDANT DESOTO CAB COMPANY, INC. INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSORS IN ITEREST TO DECEDENTS DENNIS T. MARSHALL AND KAREN MARSHALL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.