Case Last Refreshed: 17 hours ago
Asimos, Dean Gregory, Thompson, Jason Everett, Wired Real Estate Group, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Barsotti, Jessica R, Kyle, Stephan E, Norris, C.Todd, against Asimos, Dean Gregory, Thompson, Jason Everett, represented by Barsotti, Jessica R, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Richard B. Ulmer, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard B. Ulmer, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 11, 2011 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions682 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time2673 days |
This complaint is a cross-complaint filed by Dean Gregory Asimos, DBA Drake Realty, against Jason Everett Thompson and Wired Real Estate Group, Inc. The complaint alleges breach of contract, breach of good faith and fair dealing, accounting, fraud an...
REMITTITUR AFFIRMED A147960 DIV 4
Date: November 19, 2018ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES ON APPEAL (SEE SCANNED ORDER FOR DETAILS)
Date: February 01, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 210077459)(AMENDED JUDGMENT)
Date: April 25, 2024ORDER ON MOTION FOR AMENDMENT OF JUDGMENT
Date: April 23, 2024ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ASIMOS, DEAN GREGORY DBA DRAKE REALTY
Date: December 30, 2011NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM
Date: May 11, 2012NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM
Date: March 19, 2012ORDER OF THE COURT SETTING ASIDE REQUEST FOR ENTER OF DEFAULT ENTERED ON 1/25/12
Date: February 02, 2012ORDER - STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (MODIFIED)
Date: August 27, 2012NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: October 11, 2011MINUTES FOR OCT-03-2013 9:30 AM
Date: October 03, 2013MINUTES FOR OCT-18-2013 9:00 AM
Date: October 18, 2013NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY APPELLANT ASIMOS, DEAN GREGORY DBA DRAKE REALTY
Date: October 23, 2013ORDER AND STIPULATION PERMITTING PLAINTIFFS' DESIGNATION OF EXPERT JASON EVERETT THOMPSON
Date: September 13, 2012NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT OF JURY FEES
Date: September 17, 2012REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO RECONSIDER FILED BY DEFENDANT ASIMOS, DEAN GREGORY DBA DRAKE REALTY
Date: September 17, 2012ORDER AND STIPULATION REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: September 13, 2012ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT DEAN GREGORY ASIMOS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
Date: September 28, 2012NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL SENT TO APPELLANT
Date: November 06, 2013CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: October 28, 20133 MOTIONS IN LIMINE FILED BY PLAINTIFF THOMPSON, JASON EVERETT WIRED REAL ESTATE GROUP, INC.
Date: October 04, 2012NOTICE OF HEARING ABOUT COURT FEES FILED BY DEFENDANT ASIMOS, DEAN GREGORY DBA DRAKE REALTY
Date: November 06, 2013TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY PLAINTIFF
Date: October 09, 2012MINUTES FOR NOV-13-2013 9:30 AM
Date: November 13, 2013ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT DEAN GREGORY ASIMOS' NOTICE ON HEARING ABOUT COURT FEES
Date: November 14, 2013ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES (DOUGLASS-D608)
Date: November 13, 2013TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT DEAN GREGORY ASIMOS
Date: October 09, 2012MINUTES FOR DEC-06-2013 9:00 AM
Date: December 06, 2013ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT (DOUGLASS - 608).
Date: November 26, 2013CLERK'S CERTIFICATE RE DISMISSAL OF APPEAL
Date: December 02, 2013MINUTES FOR OCT-09-2012 10:15 AM
Date: October 09, 2012MINUTES FOR OCT-10-2012 9:00 AM
Date: October 10, 2012MINUTES FOR OCT-11-2012 10:00 AM
Date: October 11, 2012MINUTES FOR OCT-12-2012 9:00 AM
Date: October 12, 2012NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL FILED BY APPELLANT ASIMOS, DEAN GREGORY DBA DRAKE REALTY
Date: January 24, 2014MINUTES FOR OCT-15-2012 9:00 AM
Date: October 15, 2012MINUTES FOR OCT-16-2012 9:00 AM
Date: October 16, 2012EXHIBIT LIST FOR DEFENDANTS FILED
Date: October 18, 2012MINUTES FOR OCT-17-2012 9:00 AM
Date: October 17, 2012TENTATIVE DECISION (DOUGLASS-D608)
Date: February 15, 2013CLERK'S ESTIMATE OF COST OF APPEAL RECORD SENT TO RESPONDENT, ESTIMATED COST $322.00
Date: April 09, 2014EXHIBIT LIST FOR PLAINTIFF FILED
Date: November 08, 2012WITNESS LIST FILED
Date: October 18, 2012NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL SENT TO APPELLANT
Date: April 22, 2014STATEMENT OF DECISION (PROPOSED) (DOUGLASS-D608)
Date: May 30, 2013NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: August 28, 2013CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: April 29, 2014ORDER GRANTING AUGMENTATION A140096 DIV 4
Date: August 01, 2014CLERK'S ESTIMATE OF COST OF APPEAL RECORD SENT TO APPELLANT, ESTIMATED COST $570.00 ON AUGMENTATION
Date: September 02, 2014CLERK'S ESTIMATE OF COST OF APPEAL RECORD SENT TO RESPONDENT, ESTIMATED COST $285.00 ON AUGMENTATION
Date: September 02, 2014CERTIFICATION NOTICE ON AUGMENTATION
Date: September 23, 2014ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CONTEMPT (SET FOR 10/21/15 AT 1:30PM IN DEPT. 503)
Date: September 24, 2015NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL SENT TO DEFENDANT ASIMOS, DEAN GREGORY
Date: May 05, 2016NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT JUDGMENT OF CONTEMPT (TRANSACTION ID # 15316050)
Date: November 13, 2015THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: JUDGMENT OF CONTEMPT (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT)
Date: November 13, 2015ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS FOLLOWING JUDGMENT OF CONTEMPT
Date: February 04, 2016ORDER RECALLING THE ISSUANCE OF BENCH WARRANT
Date: November 20, 2015NOTICE OF DEFAULT ON APPEAL SENT TO APPELLANT ASIMOS, DEAN GREGORY DBA DRAKE REALTY
Date: March 28, 2016ORDER (RE: OSC RE CONTEMPT)
Date: November 13, 2015CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (APPEAL FILED 3/3/16)
Date: March 11, 2016ORDER REGARDING THE 11/20/2015 O.S.C. HEARING RE: CONTEMPT
Date: December 03, 2015ORDER FROM COA RE REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES DENIED A147960 DIV 4
Date: May 16, 2016NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT - DEPOSIT (N. HATLER & A. POURTABIB)
Date: June 08, 2016ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FILED ON 3/3/16 A147960 DIV 4
Date: June 21, 2016ORDER RESTORING APPEAL TO ACTIVE STATUS. A147960 #4
Date: July 22, 2016CLERK'S ESTIMATE OF COST OF APPEAL RECORD SENT TO APPELLANT, ESTIMATED COST $500.00
Date: August 04, 2016CERTIFICATION NOTICE
Date: November 16, 2016REMITTITUR FILED A140096 DIV 4 (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT)
Date: February 23, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 210077459) FILED BY PLAINTIFF THOMPSON, JASON EVERETT | |
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 210077459)(AMENDED JUDGMENT) | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR APR-23-2024 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING AMENDED JUDGMENT ENTERED: TOTAL AMENDED JUDGMENT = $324,687.16. SEE SCANNED "AMENDED JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF JASON EVERETT THOMPSON AND AGAINST DEFENDANT DEAN GREGORY ASIMOS" FOR DETAILS. | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | LAW & MOTION, DEPT. 302, AS TO THE APRIL-23-2024 HEARING RE: PLAINTIFF JASON THOMPSON, WIRED REAL ESTATE GROUP, INC.'S MOTION FOR AMENDMENT OF JUDGMENT, THE COURT ADOPTS ITS TENTATIVE RULING. PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AMENDMENT OF JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. ORDER SIGNED. JUDGMENT SIGNED. JUDGE: RICHARD B. ULMER JR.; CLERK: V. DA FONSECA; NOT REPORTED. (302/RBU) | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER ON MOTION FOR AMENDMENT OF JUDGMENT | |
April 23, 2024 | Hearing |
Notice Of Motion For Amendment Of Judgment
Judge: RICHARD B. ULMER |
|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON OPPOSITOIN TO PLIANTIFF'S MOTION FOR AMENDMENT OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 210075343) FILED BY PLAINTIFF THOMPSON, JASON EVERETT WIRED REAL ESTATE GROUP, INC. | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AMENDMENT OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 210069678) FILED BY PLAINTIFF THOMPSON, JASON EVERETT WIRED REAL ESTATE GROUP, INC. | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FOR AMENDMENT OF JUDGMENT (TRANSACTION ID # 210069678) FILED BY PLAINTIFF THOMPSON, JASON EVERETT WIRED REAL ESTATE GROUP, INC. HEARING SET FOR APR-23-2024 AT 09:30 AM IN DEPT 302 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.