Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Fetter, Elizabeth, Rudin, Alexa, Rudin, Ethan, Friedman, Barbara, Hill & Co(Sued Erroneously As Hill & Company, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Divelbiss, Robert Owen, against Does 1 Through 49, Does 1 Through 50, Does 1 To 25, Does 2 -25, Elizabeth Fetter, (total of 12) See All represented by Roeca, Russell Samuel, Zacks, Andrew Mayer, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Katherine Feinstein presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management609 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 20, 2009 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions629 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time1085 days |
ORDER FOR AMENDMENT OF JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION
Date: May 01, 2012DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT ELIZABETH FETTER
Date: May 01, 2012ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT
Date: April 24, 2012ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE WRIT PURSUANT TO CCP 877.6
Date: April 24, 2012ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE
Date: April 24, 2012ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION
Date: April 20, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT ELIZABETH FETTER
Date: May 01, 2012MINUTES FOR APR-25-2012 4:30 PM
Date: April 25, 2012DECLARATION OF ANTHONY C. SOLDATO FILED BY DEFENDANT ELIZABETH FETTER
Date: March 16, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY DEFENDANT ELIZABETH FETTER
Date: March 16, 2012OPPOSITION TO PLTFS MOTION FOR SUMM ADJUDICATION FILED BY DEFENDANT ELIZABETH FETTER
Date: March 15, 2012DECLARATION OF SCOTT A. FREEDMAN FILED BY DEFENDANT ELIZABETH FETTER
Date: March 16, 2012DECLARATION OF WALTER L. RICCI FILED BY PLAINTIFF RUDIN, ALEXA RUDIN, ETHAN
Date: April 16, 2012ORDER FOR EXPERT DEPOSITIONS
Date: April 13, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT ELIZABETH FETTER
Date: March 07, 2012SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT ELIZABETH FETTER
Date: March 07, 2012DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT ELIZABETH FETTER
Date: February 21, 2012DECLARATION OF ROD DIVELBISS FILED BY PLAINTIFF RUDIN, ALEXA RUDIN, ETHAN
Date: March 14, 2012OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL FILED BY DEFENDANT ELIZABETH FETTER
Date: April 16, 2012DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF RUDIN, ALEXA RUDIN, ETHAN
Date: March 07, 2012NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: August 20, 2009PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF RUDIN, ALEXA RUDIN, ETHAN
Date: March 07, 2012DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH FETTER FILED BY DEFENDANT ELIZABETH FETTER
Date: April 10, 2012DECLARATION OF CYNTHIA A MERTENS FILED BY DEFENDANT ELIZABETH FETTER
Date: April 10, 2012DECLARATION OF ANTHONY C SOLDATO FILED BY DEFENDANT ELIZABETH FETTER
Date: April 10, 2012DECLARATION OF ANDREW M ZACKS FILED BY DEFENDANT ELIZABETH FETTER
Date: April 10, 2012REPLY MEMO IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT ELIZABETH FETTER
Date: March 07, 2012ORDER SHORTENING TIME RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: April 06, 2012MINUTES FOR MAR-05-2012 8:45 AM FOR DEPT 604
Date: March 05, 2012OPPOSITION TO MTN TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE FILED BY PLAINTIFF RUDIN, ALEXA RUDIN, ETHAN
Date: February 22, 2012ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT ELIZABETH FETTER
Date: February 24, 2012MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT ELIZABETH FETTER
Date: February 21, 2012REPLY MEMO P/A IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO LIFT STAY FILED BY PLAINTIFF RUDIN, ALEXA RUDIN, ETHAN
Date: February 09, 2012OPPOSITION TO PLTFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION FILED BY DEFENDANT ELIZABETH FETTER
Date: February 08, 2012ORDER LIFTING STAY
Date: February 17, 2012DECLARATION OF ALEXA RUDIN IN SUPPORT FILED BY PLAINTIFF RUDIN, ALEXA RUDIN, ETHAN
Date: November 09, 2011REPLY MEMO FOR DEFT'S MOTION TO COMPEL FILED BY DEFENDANT ELIZABETH FETTER
Date: February 08, 2012CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN SUPPORT OF PLTFS' OPPOS FILED BY PLAINTIFF RUDIN, ALEXA RUDIN, ETHAN
Date: February 02, 2012ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT FETTER'S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES
Date: February 16, 2012DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF RUDIN, ALEXA RUDIN, ETHAN
Date: January 25, 2012CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF RUDIN, ALEXA RUDIN, ETHAN
Date: January 25, 2012OPPOSITION TO DEFTS SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF RUDIN, ALEXA RUDIN, ETHAN
Date: February 02, 2012APPLICATION TO ALLOW LATE FILING OF PLTF'S OPPOS FILED BY PLAINTIFF RUDIN, ALEXA RUDIN, ETHAN
Date: November 08, 2011CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF RUDIN, ALEXA RUDIN, ETHAN
Date: November 08, 2011ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY CROSS DEFENDANT ELIZABETH FETTER
Date: August 19, 2011REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO PLTFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
Date: February 08, 2012ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND REOPENING DISCOVERY
Date: September 20, 2011ORDER SHORTENING TIME RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Date: November 01, 2011REPLY MEMO IN SUPP OF MTN TO QUASH DEPO FILED BY DEFENDANT ELIZABETH FETTER
Date: November 09, 2011ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT ELIZABETH FETTER'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: October 12, 2011OPPOSITION TO PLTFS' MTN TO LIFT STAY FILED BY DEFENDANT ELIZABETH FETTER
Date: February 03, 2012OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH FILED BY PLAINTIFF RUDIN, ALEXA RUDIN, ETHAN
Date: November 08, 2011OPPOSITION TO DEFTS MOTION TO COMPEL FILED BY PLAINTIFF RUDIN, ALEXA RUDIN, ETHAN
Date: February 02, 2012DECLARATION OF (SUPPLEMENTAL) ANTHONY C. COLDATO; POS FILED BY DEFENDANT ELIZABETH FETTER
Date: November 09, 2011MINUTES FOR NOV-10-2011 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 608
Date: November 10, 2011DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLTF'S OPPOS FILED BY PLAINTIFF RUDIN, ALEXA RUDIN, ETHAN
Date: November 08, 2011SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF RUDIN, ALEXA RUDIN, ETHAN
Date: January 23, 2012ORDER SHORTENING TIME RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: March 22, 2011NOTICE OF REMOVAL FROM THE EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM
Date: March 14, 2011NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM
Date: February 02, 2011ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE PURSUANT TO STIPULATION
Date: August 19, 2010ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT HILL & CO.'S REQUEST TO CORRECT ITS NAME ON THE PLEADINGS
Date: August 11, 2010AMENDED NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM
Date: September 07, 2010SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR SEP-07-2010 CONTINUED TO APR-05-2011 AT 2:30 PM IN 306
Date: August 19, 2010PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT ELIZABETH FETTER
Date: January 19, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF RUDIN, ALEXA RUDIN, ETHAN
Date: January 23, 2012NOTICE OF NON-PAYMENT OF JURY FEES
Date: April 04, 2011NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SENT BY COURT. (206)
Date: April 21, 2011NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM
Date: July 09, 2010NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM
Date: February 03, 2010NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY ATTORNEY ZACKS, ANDREW MAYER
Date: January 19, 2012DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY PLAINTIFF RUDIN, ALEXA RUDIN, ETHAN
Date: January 23, 2012NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM
Date: August 30, 2010PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY PLAINTIFF FETTER, ELIZABETH (FROM CASE# 509013)
Date: December 27, 2011NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY DEFENDANT ELIZABETH FETTER
Date: December 13, 2011ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER AND DENYING SANCTIONS
Date: December 30, 2011OBJECTION TO DECLARATION OF ROD DIVELBISS IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TP PLTF
Date: December 28, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS MAIL FILED BY DEFENDANT ELIZABETH FETTER
Date: December 13, 2011DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT ELIZABETH FETTER
Date: January 19, 2012SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FILED BY DEFENDANT ELIZABETH FETTER
Date: January 19, 2012PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF FETTER, ELIZABETH (FROM CASE# 509013)
Date: December 28, 2011DECLARATION OF ROD DIVELBISS IN SUPPORT OF REPLY FILED BY PLAINTIFF RUDIN, ALEXA RUDIN, ETHAN
Date: December 22, 2011NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY DEFENDANT ELIZABETH FETTER
Date: January 13, 2012SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF FETTER, ELIZABETH (FROM CASE# 509013)
Date: December 20, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 13, 2012 | Hearing |
MASTER CALENDAR JURY
Judge: KATHERINE FEINSTEIN |
|
August 09, 2012 | Docket Event | MASTER JURY CALENDAR SET FOR AUG-13-2012 VACATED. DISMISSALS FILED AS TO ALL ACTIONS. (206) | |
July 09, 2012 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE | |
July 09, 2012 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 1ST AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY FRIEDMAN, BARBARA, POST, MALCOLM, HILL & CO(SUED ERRONEOUSLY AS HILL & COMPANY AS TO CROSS DEFENDANT ELIZABETH FETTER | |
July 09, 2012 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT HILL & COMPANY REAL ESTATE FRIEDMAN, BARBARA DOES 1 THROUGH 49 THE ESTATE OF MALCOLM POST (FROM CASE# 509013) | |
May 15, 2012 | Tentative Ruling |
Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn For Reconsideration Of Order Granting Mtn For Good Faith Settlement Set for hearing on Tuesday, May 15, 2012, Line 4, DEFENDANT ELIZABETH FETTER Motion For Reconsideration Of Order ...
Judge: HAROLD E. KAHN |
|
May 15, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT MOTION AFTER RECONSIDERATION ON THE COURT'S OWN MOTION | |
May 15, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER ON COURT'S MOTION RECONSIDERING ORDER GRANTING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT MOTION | |
May 15, 2012 | Hearing |
Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn For Reconsideration Of Order Granting Mtn For Good Faith Settlement
Judge: HAROLD E. KAHN |
|
May 15, 2012 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR MAY-15-2012 09:30 AM FOR DEPT 302 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.