Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Callahan, Nancy, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Clack, Kathleen, Schallert, Mark Mcclain, against Carmel Mission Partnership Aka Heather Glen Court, Does 1 Through 25, Inclusive, Goya, Bradley, Goya, Donna, Goya, Elizabeth, (total of 7) See All represented by Jaffe, Harold, Pedersen, L Jay, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Ksenia Tsenin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKsenia Tsenin Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2008 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions612 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time827 days |
EXHIBIT LIST FOR PLAINTIFF FILED
Date: May 24, 2010MINUTES FOR MAY-20-2010 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 303
Date: May 20, 2010MINUTES FOR MAY-18-2010 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 303
Date: May 18, 2010EXHIBIT LIST FOR DEFENDANTS FILED
Date: May 18, 2010MINUTES FOR MAY-24-2010 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 303
Date: May 24, 2010MINUTES FOR MAY-26-2010 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 303
Date: May 26, 2010MINUTES FOR MAY-25-2010 9:45 AM FOR DEPT 303
Date: May 25, 2010MINUTES FOR APR-28-2010 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 303
Date: April 28, 2010MINUTES FOR APR-20-2010 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 303
Date: April 20, 2010MINUTES FOR APR-29-2010 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 303
Date: April 29, 2010MINUTES FOR APR-27-2010 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 303
Date: April 27, 2010MINUTES FOR APR-26-2010 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 303
Date: April 26, 2010MINUTES FOR MAY-03-2010 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 303
Date: May 03, 2010MINUTES FOR APR-22-2010 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 303
Date: April 20, 2010MINUTES FOR APR-07-2010 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 303
Date: April 07, 2010MINUTES FOR APR-13-2010 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 303
Date: April 13, 2010WITNESS LIST FILED
Date: May 18, 2010MINUTES FOR MAY-13-2010 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 303
Date: May 13, 2010MINUTES FOR MAR-11-2011 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 303
Date: March 11, 2011MINUTES FOR APR-19-2010 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 303
Date: April 19, 2010MINUTES FOR MAY-12-2010 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 303
Date: May 12, 2010MINUTES FOR MAY-27-2010 9:00 AM FOR DEPT 303
Date: May 27, 2010JURY VERDICT FILED
Date: June 01, 2010MINUTES FOR MAY-10-2010 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 303
Date: May 10, 2010MINUTES FOR MAR-29-2010 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 303
Date: March 29, 2010MINUTES FOR MAY-05-2010 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 303
Date: May 05, 2010MINUTES FOR MAY-11-2010 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 303
Date: May 11, 2010MINUTES FOR MAY-04-2010 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 303
Date: May 04, 2010NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY DISCHARGE OF DEBTOR AND FINAL DECREE FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALLAHAN, NANCY
Date: February 03, 2012MINUTES FOR MAY-06-2010 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 303
Date: May 06, 2010NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR MOTION FOR COSTS AND ATTORNEY'S FEES
Date: March 26, 2012ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Date: June 09, 2009SUMMONS ISSUED TO PLAINTIFF CALLAHAN, NANCY
Date: June 02, 2009ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY MATTERS HEARD ON MAY 12 2009
Date: May 19, 2009ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COPEL THE DEPOSITION OF DR. ROGER KATZ
Date: July 06, 2009NOTICE OF EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - EARLY SETTLEMENT PROGRAM
Date: October 14, 2008ORDER SHORTENING TIME RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Date: May 28, 2009ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE (5/13/09 HEARING)
Date: June 08, 2009ORDER SHORTENING TIME RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE
Date: April 30, 2009MINUTES FOR SEP-03-2010 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 303
Date: September 03, 2010EXHIBIT/DEPOSITION RECEIPT FILED
Date: June 01, 2010MINUTES FOR MAY-17-2010 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 303
Date: May 17, 2010MINUTES FOR MAR-08-2010 10:00 AM FOR DEPT 303
Date: March 08, 2010NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: February 25, 2008MINUTES FOR MAR-18-2010 9:30 AM FOR DEPT 303
Date: March 18, 2010ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR DISCOVERY SANCTIONS
Date: July 06, 2009ORDER QUASHING SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: July 28, 2009ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT GOYA, ELIZABETH ANN GOYA, BRADLEY
Date: July 28, 2009ORDER OF PROVING FILING OF AMENDMENT TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 25, 2010DECISION OF THE COURT AND ORDER, FILED
Date: July 08, 2010ORDER EXCLUDING PAROL EVIDENCE IN PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT 67 IS FILED
Date: April 13, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2012 | Docket Event | TRIAL MOTION CALENDAR ON MAR-29-2012 IN DEPT. 303, MOTION FOR COSTS AND ATTORNEY'S FEES. IS OFF CALENDAR. DECLARATION OF RICHARD D. GORMAN RE: DISCHARGE OF CALLAHAN BANKRUPTCY WAS FILED ON DECEMBER 10, 2012. NOTICE SENT BY COURT. | |
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF RICHARD D. GORMAN RE: DISCHARGE OF CALLAHAN BANKRUPTCY FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALLAHAN, NANCY | |
March 29, 2012 | Hearing |
Motion For Costs And Attorney'S Fees.
Judge: VISITING JUDGE |
|
March 26, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR MOTION FOR COSTS AND ATTORNEY'S FEES | |
February 03, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY DISCHARGE OF DEBTOR AND FINAL DECREE FILED BY PLAINTIFF CALLAHAN, NANCY | |
December 16, 2011 | Hearing |
Motion For Costs And Attorney'S Fees.
Judge: KSENIA TSENIN |
|
December 16, 2011 | Docket Event | TRIAL MOTION IN DEPT. 303, MOTION FOR COSTS AND ATTORNEY'S FEES. CONTINUED FROM DEC-16-2011 TO TRIAL DEPT. MOTION AT MAR-29-2012, 8:00 AM IN DEPT. 303 - THE CLERK CALLED MR. DICK GORMAN THE BANKRUPTCY ATTY FOR NANCY CALLAHAN AND HE REPRESENTED THAT THE STATUS IS THE SAME AND THAT THE MATTER SHOULD BE CONTINUED FOR ABOUT THREE MONTHS. - JUDGE O'MALLEY-TAYLOR, CLERK KEVIN LEE, NOT ON THE RECORD, D303 | |
September 02, 2011 | Hearing |
Motion For Costs And Attorney'S Fees.
Judge: KSENIA TSENIN |
|
September 02, 2011 | Docket Event | TRIAL MOTION IN DEPT. 303, MOTION FOR COSTS AND ATTORNEY'S FEES. CONTINUED FROM SEP-02-2011 TO TRIAL DEPT. MOTION AT DEC-16-2011, 9:30 AM IN DEPT. 303, KATHLEEN CLACK FOR THE PLAINTIFF AND JAMES TREPPA FOR THE DEFENDANT - BOTH APPEARED BY TELEPHONE - AT THE NEXT CALLING, IF THERE IS NO CHANGE IN THE PLAINTIFF'S BANKRUPTCY STATUS, THEN BOTH SIDES MAY APPEAR BY TELEPHONE - JUDGE KAY TSENIN, CLERK KEVIN LEE, NOT ON THE RECORD, D303 | |
March 25, 2011 | Hearing |
Motion For Costs And Attorney'S Fees.
Judge: KSENIA TSENIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.