Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Los Angeles County Of By And Through, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Abrena Jolina Asuncion, Guzman Adrianna Elizabeth, against Association For Los Angeles Deputy, Los Angeles County Employee Relations, Ramirez Esmeralda Assistant Director Los Angeles County Sheriff'S Department Personnel Administration Bureau, represented by Kalinski Jacob Ariel, Lewis Edwin Arthur, Mellk Gidian, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Robert S. Draper presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions137 days |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time743 days |
Notice of Ruling
Date: September 12, 2019Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON COUNTY'S PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE
Date: September 13, 2019Answer
Date: October 11, 2019Answer
Date: November 07, 2019Objection - OBJECTION COUNTY'S OBJECTIONS TO ALADS' EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-PETITION
Date: January 10, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION COUNTY'S OPPOSITION TO ALADS' CROSS-PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE
Date: January 10, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 10, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: February 11, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: February 18, 2020Objection - OBJECTION COUNTY'S OBJECTION TO ALADS' PROPOSED JUDGMENT
Date: February 25, 2020Objection - OBJECTION COUNTY'S OBJECTION TO ALADS' PROPOSED WRIT OF MANDATE
Date: February 25, 2020Response - RESPONSE TO OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED JUDGMENT AND PROPOSED WRIT OF MANDATE
Date: February 28, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 24, 2020Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: June 30, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE
Date: July 02, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED JUDGMENT)
Date: July 09, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: July 10, 2020Judgment
Date: July 14, 2020Writ of - WRIT OF COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' INTERMEDIATE RETURN TO WRIT OF MANDATE
Date: August 14, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO COMPLY WITH WRIT AND FILE RETURN
Date: August 28, 2020Writ - Return
Date: March 22, 2021Motion re: - MOTION RE: TO ENFORCE WRIT OF MANDATE
Date: April 12, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: May 25, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 22, 2021Writ - Return
Date: August 04, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAN NATHAN
Date: January 31, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION SECOND DECLARATION OF JACOB A. KALINSKI
Date: January 31, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF GEORGE CREAMER
Date: January 31, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEFF COATES
Date: January 31, 2022Motion re: - MOTION RE: SECOND MOTION TO ENFORCE WRIT OF MANDATE
Date: January 31, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF GIDIAN MELLK
Date: January 31, 2022Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: February 09, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO ALADS' SECOND MOTION TO ENFORCE WRIT OF MANDATE
Date: February 09, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 09, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF DEREK HSIEH IN SUPPORT OF SECOND MOTION TO ENFORCE WRIT OF MANDATE
Date: February 16, 2022Reply - REPLY TO COUNTY'S OPPOSITION TO SECOND MOTION TO ENFORCE
Date: February 16, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: February 23, 2022Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: February 17, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: March 09, 2022Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: March 10, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: June 14, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF JACOB KALINSKI IN SUPPORT OF CLAIMS FOR BACK PAY
Date: August 10, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARC SCHULTZ IN SUPPORT OF CLAIM FOR BACK PAY
Date: August 10, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF ERVIN FRANCOIS IN SUPPORT OF CLAIMS FOR BACK PAY
Date: August 10, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF RYAN LOCKNER IN SUPPORT OF CLAIMS FOR BACK PAY
Date: August 10, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF KEVIN HILGENDORF IN SUPPORT OF CLAIMS FOR BACK PAY
Date: August 10, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOE GARRIDO IN SUPPORT OF CLAIMS FOR BACK PAY
Date: August 10, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF JUHN LEE IN SUPPORT OF CLAIMS FOR BACK PAY
Date: August 10, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF RONALD CHIPS IN SUPPORT OF CLAIMS FOR BACK PAY
Date: August 10, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANTHONY GEISBAUER IN SUPPORT OF CLAIMS FOR BACK PAY
Date: August 10, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF MARC SCHULTZ IN SUPPORT OF CLAIM FOR BACK PAY
Date: August 12, 2022Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE
Date: August 19, 2022Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: August 15, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF JACK EWELL ISO COUNTY'S OPPOSITION
Date: August 30, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 17, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 30, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO ALADS' OPENING BRIEF
Date: August 30, 2022Objection - OBJECTION TO DECLARATIONS FILED ISO ALADS' OPENING BRIEF
Date: August 30, 2022Joint Status Conference Report
Date: September 06, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MICHAEL O'SHEA IN SUPPORT OF CLAIM FOR BACK PAY
Date: September 06, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION SECOND DECLARATION OF KEVIN HILGENDORF IN SUPPORT OF CLAIM FOR BACK PAY
Date: September 06, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANASTASIA TRIMARCHI RE SEPTEMBER 13, 2022 STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: September 06, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF CATHERINE M. BANUELOS RE SEPTEMBER 13, 2022 STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: September 06, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF CONNIE YEE RE SEPTEMBER 13, 2022 STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: September 06, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION SECOND DECLARATION OF MARC SCHULTZ IN SUPPORT OF CLAIM FOR BACK PAY
Date: September 06, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE UNRESOLVED ISSUES ON MOTION TO ENFORCE WRIT)
Date: September 13, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: September 16, 2022Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Reply ( Brief of Cross-Petitioner/Cross-Plaintiff in Support of Its Complaint to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (Proof of Service)
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF JACOB A. KALINKSI IN SUPPORT OF OPENING BRIEF)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Notice (of Demurrer and Demurrer to Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF HEARING ON COMPLAINT TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Declaration (and Appendix of Exhibits In Support of Opening Brief)
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (at August 30, 2018 Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (in support of opposition to demurrer to cross-complaint)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Request (for Judicial Notice in Support of Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Declaration ( OF JACOB A. KALINSKI)
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Declaration ( OF ERVIN FRANCOIS)
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Opposition (County's Opposition to ALADS' Cross-Petition for Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00County's Reply to Association for Los Angeles Deputy Sheriff's Opposition to Demurrer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Jacob A. Kalinski Re: Notice of Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Opposition (to ALADS' Cross-Petition to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Notice ( OF ERRATA)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE))
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Declaration (County's Appendix of Evidence in Support of Opposition to ALADS' Cross-Petition)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer to cross-complaint)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Ex-parte Request for Order
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Order, Preliminary Injunction
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Declaration ( OF ELIZABETH GIBBONS)
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Notice (of Errata Regarding Bates Numbered Exhibits in County's Appendix of Evidence)
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling ( ON EX PARTE APPLICATION)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Objection (County's Objections to ALADS' Evidence in Support of Cross-Petition)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT, LOS ANGELES DEPUTY SHERIFF...))
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Strike cross-complaint)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Declaration (of Jolina Abrena in Support of County's Demurrer to Cross- Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON COUNTY'S PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Motion re: (TO ENFORCE WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED JUDGMENT))
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Response (to Objections to Proposed Judgment and Proposed Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Order (Approving Joint Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Comply with Writ and File Return)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Writ of Mandate
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Writ - Return (COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES? THIRD INTERMEDIATE RETURN TO WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00Notice (of Order Extending Deadline to Comply with Writ and File Return)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/NOTICE OF ENTRY OF...))
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00Declaration (of Esmeralda Ramirez in Support of County's Second Intermediate Return to Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO COMPLY WITH WRIT AND FILE RETURN)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Declaration (OF SERGEANT KEVIN BROWN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO ENFORCE WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Writ - Return (COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES? SECOND INTERMEDIATE RETURN TO WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Objection (EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO COUNTY?S OPPOSITION TO ENFORCE WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Notice (of Telephonic Appearance)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER) of )
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Writ - Return
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER))
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Opposition (County of Los Angeles' Opposition to ALADS' Motion to Enforce Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Declaration (of Jack Ewell in Support of County's Second Intermediate Return to Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Writ of (COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' INTERMEDIATE RETURN TO WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Objection (County's Objection to ALADS' Proposed Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Declaration (OF JACOB A.KALINSKI IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-PETITIONER's MOTION TO ENFORCE WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (MOTION OF RESPONDENT, ASSOCIATION OF LOS ANGELES DEPUTY SHERI...))
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/NOTICE OF ENTRY OF...) of )
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE))
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Catherine Banuelos in Support of County's Second Intermediate Return to Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Objection (County's Objection to ALADS' Proposed Judgment)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Motion re: (Second Motion to Enforce Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Declaration (of Derek Hsieh in Support of Second Motion to Enforce Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Declaration (of George Creamer)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2022-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER))
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Jolena Abrena ISO County's Opposition to Second Motion to Enforce Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Anastasia Trimarchi ISO County's Opposition to Second Motion to Enforce Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Response (to ALADS' Supplemental Brief re its Second Motion to Enforce Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00Declaration (of Jeff Coates)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (STATUS CONFERENCE))
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Opposition (to ALADS' Second Motion to Enforce Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Declaration (Second Declaration of Jacob A. Kalinski)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Gidian Mellk)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Reply (to County's Opposition to Second Motion to Enforce)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Jack W. Ewell ISO County's Opposition to Second Motion to Enforce Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Dan Nathan)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Appearance
Date: 2022-06-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (MOTION OF PETITIONER, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, TO ENFORCE THE W...))
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Elaine Boyd ISO County's Opposition to Second Motion to Enforce Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Writ - Return
Date: 2021-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-03-23T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report (JOINT STATUS REPORT)
Date: 2022-05-04T00:00:00Declaration (of Joseph J. Williams ISO County's Opposition to Second Motion to Enforce Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Joint Status Conference Report
Date: 2022-06-03T00:00:00Notice (of Ruling)
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: March 23, 2022Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE
Date: May 05, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF RULING
Date: May 12, 2022Joint Status Conference Report
Date: June 03, 2022Notice of Appearance
Date: June 06, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: June 09, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: May 10, 2022Notice of Appearance (NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE)
Date: 2022-05-05T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Appear by Telephone
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Objection (to ALADS' Evidence ISO Second Motion to Enforce Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)) of )
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Brief (Opening Brief)
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-30 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-07-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Request (for Judicial Notice in Support of Demurrer and Motion to Strike)
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Jolina Abrena in Support of County's Demurrer to Cross- Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail (Proof of Service)
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Notice (of Demurrer and Demurrer to Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-10T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Strike cross-complaint)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (in support of opposition to demurrer to cross-complaint)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Opposition (to Demurrer to cross-complaint)
Date: 2018-11-02T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)))
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (at August 30, 2018 Trial Setting Conference)
Date: 2019-04-23T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Jacob A. Kalinski Re: Notice of Ex Parte Application)
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling ( ON EX PARTE APPLICATION)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF DEFENDANT, LOS ANGELES DEPUTY SHERIFF...))
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF JACOB A. KALINKSI IN SUPPORT OF OPENING BRIEF)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF HEARING ON COMPLAINT TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Notice ( OF ERRATA)
Date: 2019-07-22T00:00:00Declaration (and Appendix of Exhibits In Support of Opening Brief)
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Brief (Opening Brief)
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Opposition (to ALADS' Cross-Petition to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Declaration ( OF ELIZABETH GIBBONS)
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Declaration ( OF JACOB A. KALINSKI)
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Declaration ( OF ERVIN FRANCOIS)
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Notice (of Errata Regarding Bates Numbered Exhibits in County's Appendix of Evidence)
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Reply ( Brief of Cross-Petitioner/Cross-Plaintiff in Support of Its Complaint to Compel Arbitration)
Date: 2019-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION)
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (ON COUNTY'S PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE))
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Opposition (County's Opposition to ALADS' Cross-Petition for Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Objection (County's Objections to ALADS' Evidence in Support of Cross-Petition)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Declaration (County's Appendix of Evidence in Support of Opposition to ALADS' Cross-Petition)
Date: 2020-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ((HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE))
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00Objection (County's Objection to ALADS' Proposed Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Objection (County's Objection to ALADS' Proposed Judgment)
Date: 2020-02-25T00:00:00Response (to Objections to Proposed Judgment and Proposed Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2020-02-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER) of 06/24/2020)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER))
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Notice (of Telephonic Appearance)
Date: 2020-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (HEARING ON OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED JUDGMENT))
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/NOTICE OF ENTRY OF...))
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Order (Approving Joint Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Comply with Writ and File Return)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO COMPLY WITH WRIT AND FILE RETURN)
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00Notice (of Order Extending Deadline to Comply with Writ and File Return)
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00Writ of (COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES' INTERMEDIATE RETURN TO WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: 2020-08-14T00:00:00Writ - Return (COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES? SECOND INTERMEDIATE RETURN TO WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Esmeralda Ramirez in Support of County's Second Intermediate Return to Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Jack Ewell in Support of County's Second Intermediate Return to Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Declaration (of Catherine Banuelos in Support of County's Second Intermediate Return to Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2020-10-13T00:00:00Motion re: (TO ENFORCE WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Declaration (OF JACOB A.KALINSKI IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-PETITIONER's MOTION TO ENFORCE WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Declaration (OF SERGEANT KEVIN BROWN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO ENFORCE WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Writ - Return (COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES? THIRD INTERMEDIATE RETURN TO WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: 2021-01-11T00:00:00Opposition (County of Los Angeles' Opposition to ALADS' Motion to Enforce Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2021-05-05T00:00:00Objection (EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS IN SUPPORT OF REPLY TO COUNTY?S OPPOSITION TO ENFORCE WRIT OF MANDATE)
Date: 2021-05-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (MOTION OF RESPONDENT, ASSOCIATION OF LOS ANGELES DEPUTY SHERI...))
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00Declaration (of Gidian Mellk)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Declaration (of Anastasia Trimarchi ISO County's Opposition to Second Motion to Enforce Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Declaration (of George Creamer)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Declaration (of Jeff Coates)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Reply (to County's Opposition to Second Motion to Enforce)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Elaine Boyd ISO County's Opposition to Second Motion to Enforce Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Dan Nathan)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Motion re: (Second Motion to Enforce Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Declaration (Second Declaration of Jacob A. Kalinski)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Declaration (of Derek Hsieh in Support of Second Motion to Enforce Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2022-02-16T00:00:00Opposition (to ALADS' Second Motion to Enforce Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Jack W. Ewell ISO County's Opposition to Second Motion to Enforce Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Jolena Abrena ISO County's Opposition to Second Motion to Enforce Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Declaration (of Joseph J. Williams ISO County's Opposition to Second Motion to Enforce Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER))
Date: 2022-02-23T00:00:00Objection (to ALADS' Evidence ISO Second Motion to Enforce Writ of Mandate)
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.