Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Xxxxxxxxxx, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Ashour Ashkan, Delany Genna Brooke, Yehoshua Eitan, against Xxxxxxx Xxxxxx, Xxxxxxxxxx Xxxxxx, represented by Gold Barry Ian Esq., Hundley Paul Bernhardt, Liskey Robert John, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Stephanie M. Bowick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephanie M. Bowick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management124 days |
Filing DateApril 12, 2018 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time441 days |
Notice of Ruling
Date: May 27, 2022Motion to Seal - MOTION TO SEAL COURT FILE
Date: November 01, 2022Notice of Related Case
Date: August 09, 2021Abstract of Judgment - Civil and xxxxx Claims
Date: July 01, 2019Complaint
Date: April 12, 2018Notice of Ruling
Date: June 14, 2019SUMMONS -
Date: April 12, 2018COMPLAINT-CONTRACT -
Date: April 12, 2018NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: April 20, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: May 30, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: May 30, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: July 30, 2018NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY DEFENDANTS xxxxxx xxxxxxx AND xxxxxx xxxxxxxxxx
Date: August 10, 2018NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING
Date: August 03, 2018CIVIL DEPOSIT -
Date: August 10, 2018Substitution of Attorney
Date: August 27, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING AN...)
Date: September 01, 2021Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: September 13, 2021Separate Statement
Date: September 20, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF xxxxxx xxxxxxxxxx RE OSC
Date: September 20, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 20, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF xxxxxx xxxxxxx RE OSC
Date: September 20, 2021Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: September 20, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF GENNA DELANY RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONTEMPT
Date: September 24, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATI...)
Date: September 28, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF GENNA DELANY RE ATTORNEY FEES
Date: October 12, 2021Motion to Quash - MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA
Date: October 12, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT ISSUE AN ORD...)
Date: November 05, 2021Separate Statement
Date: November 05, 2021Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: November 05, 2021Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)
Date: November 08, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: November 09, 2021Informal Discovery Conference
Date: November 18, 2021Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER ISSUING SANCTIONS AGAINST GUARAV xxxxxxxxxx AND xxxxxx xxxxxxx
Date: December 07, 2021Exhibit List
Date: January 31, 2022Application for Order of Sale of Dwelling
Date: January 31, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SETTING HEARING DAT...)
Date: February 01, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: February 03, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/03/2022
Date: February 03, 2022Order - ORDER [PROPOSED ORDER] TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING SHOULD NOT BE MADE
Date: February 03, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SETTING HEARING DA...)
Date: February 04, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: February 09, 2022Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: February 17, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF TAMAR RAVID IN SUPPORT OF REPLY
Date: February 28, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF GENNA DELANY IN SUPPORT OF REPLY
Date: February 28, 2022Response - RESPONSE TO OBJECTION TO DECLARATIONS OF xxxx xxxxx AND EITAN YEHOSHUA
Date: February 28, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: February 28, 2022Exhibit List
Date: February 28, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF JENNIFER LACORTE IN SUPPORT OF REPLY
Date: February 28, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/01/2022
Date: March 01, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 01, 2022Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUBPOENA
Date: March 03, 2022Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: March 11, 2022Proof of Service by Posting
Date: March 16, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION RE EX PARTE NOTICE
Date: March 16, 2022Motion to Quash - MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA
Date: March 17, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY
Date: March 17, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: March 18, 2022Objection - OBJECTION TO [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING
Date: March 24, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 13, 2022Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING
Date: April 18, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/13/2022
Date: April 13, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 18, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RFPS
Date: April 27, 2022Separate Statement
Date: April 27, 2022Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: April 27, 2022Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL SIS
Date: April 27, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: May 27, 2022Order - ORDER PROPOSED AMENDED ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING
Date: June 01, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: June 07, 2022Writ - Return
Date: August 16, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA)
Date: August 23, 2022Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: September 07, 2022Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: September 19, 2022Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SEAL COURT FILE
Date: November 17, 2022Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/17/2022
Date: November 17, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: November 17, 2022Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION RE MOTION SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO SEAL
Date: January 06, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SEAL RECORD)
Date: November 22, 2022Declaration - DECLARATION OF EXHIBITS TO SUPPLEMENT TO MOTION TO SEAL
Date: January 06, 2023Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SEAL FILED BY THE DEFENDANTS xxxxxx SRIV...)
Date: February 21, 2023Request for Dismissal
Date: June 12, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: June 14, 2019Judgment - JUDGMENT PROPOSED JUDGMENT
Date: June 27, 2019Notice - NOTICE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: June 28, 2019Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)
Date: July 01, 2019Abstract of Judgment - Civil and xxxxx Claims
Date: July 01, 2019Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: February 18, 2020Writ - Return
Date: February 21, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RESCHEDULED HEARING CURRENTLY SET FOR 6/3/20)
Date: April 21, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: May 01, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 23, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: July 08, 2020Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: July 30, 2020Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: July 30, 2020Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: July 30, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 03, 2020Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/03/2020
Date: August 03, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL
Date: October 05, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: October 05, 2020Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: October 19, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: January 06, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATI...)
Date: November 19, 2020Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: February 18, 2021Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: March 01, 2021Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)
Date: March 18, 2021Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: April 23, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: June 23, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: June 23, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: July 06, 2021Notice of Related Case
Date: August 09, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: August 03, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION REGARDING EX PARTE NOTICE
Date: August 10, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 12, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: August 13, 2021Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/12/2021
Date: August 12, 2021Application for Order of Sale of Dwelling
Date: August 18, 2021Notice of Ruling
Date: August 20, 2021Order - ORDER FOR DEFENDANTS TO APPEAR FOR DEBTOR'S EXAM
Date: August 20, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RULING ON NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)
Date: August 27, 2021Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012
Date: February 21, 2023Request for Dismissal Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order Entering Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)) Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Jennifer LaCorte in Support of Reply) Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Genna DeLany in Support of Reply) Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Proof of Service by Posting Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)) Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Declaration (of xxxxxx xxxxxxx re OSC) Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Order For Sale of Dwelling Should...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Subpoena) Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxx (Defendant); xxxxxx xxxxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Setting Hearing Da...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER SETTING HEARING DAT...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Application for Order of Sale of Dwelling Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why The Court Should Not Issue An Ord...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Genna DeLany Re Attorney Fees) Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte Application for Order Staying Discovery) Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Order (to Show Cause Why Order for Sale of Dwelling Should Not Be Made) Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Response (to Objection to Declarations of xxxx xxxxx and Eitan Yehoshua) Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Tamar Ravid in Support of Reply) Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Declaration (re Ex Parte Notice) Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxx (Defendant); xxxxxx xxxxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Amended Order for Sale...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Amended Order for Sale...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Deposition Subpoena) Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxx (Defendant); xxxxxx xxxxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Revised Proposed Order For Sal...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Writ - Return Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of , and the ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Compel SIs) Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxx (Defendant); xxxxxx xxxxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Compel RFPs) Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxx (Defendant); xxxxxx xxxxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Staying Discover...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Motion to Seal (Court File) Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxx (Defendant); xxxxxx xxxxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-11-01T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxx (Defendant); xxxxxx xxxxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Application for Order of Sale of Dwelling by ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Submission of Revised Proposed...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Submission of Revised Proposed...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-17T00:00:00Order (Proposed Amended Order for Sale of Dwelling) Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-06-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Seal Record)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-11-22T00:00:00Order ([Proposed] Order for Sale of Dwelling) Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles))
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of )
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Declaration (of xxxxxx xxxxxxx re OSC)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...) of )
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Demurrer and Motion to Strike Off Calendar)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Declaration (Regarding Ex Parte Notice)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Notice (of hearing)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Transferring Department 44 hearing/case;))
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order Entering Judgment))
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Notice ( of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment Pursuant to CCP Section 664.6)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: August 10, 2018Minute Order -
Date: September 10, 2018CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT -
Date: September 20, 2018Complaint - Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: November 27, 2018Notice - Notice of Taking Demurrer and Motion to Strike Off Calendar
Date: November 26, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...)
Date: November 28, 2018Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: January 14, 2019Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: January 14, 2019Notice - Notice OF CONTINUANCE OF THE DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: February 13, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: March 14, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: March 14, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: March 19, 2019Judgment (Proposed Judgment)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...))
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Notice (of Order to Show Cause)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...))
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles))
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...))
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-10 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Genna DeLany Re Attorney Fees)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Application for Order of Sale of Dwelling
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order Entering Judgment))
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Notice ( OF CONTINUANCE OF THE DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set For ) of )
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...))
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...))
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (TO STAY DISCOVERY, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING AN...))
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Order ([PROPOSED] ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE DEBTORS EXAMINATIONS)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO STAY DISCOVERY, OR IN THE ...))
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Declaration (of xxxxxx xxxxxxxxxx re OSC)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Notice (Entry of Judgment)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte for Order Setting He...))
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Notice (OF RESCHEDULED HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Order for Defendants to Appear for Debtor's Exam])
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why xxxxxx xxxxxxx and xxxxxx Srivast...))
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Genna DeLany Re: Order to Show Cause Re: Contempt)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set For ))
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte for Order Setting Hearing on Application for Sale)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Transferring Department 44 hearing/case;) of )
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING AN...) of )
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Ruling on Notice of Related Case) of )
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Order (for Defendants to Appear for Debtor's Exam)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Ruling on Notice of Related Case))
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: 2022-03-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Order (to Show Cause Why Order for Sale of Dwelling Should Not Be Made)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Jennifer LaCorte in Support of Reply)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Order For Sale of Dwelling Should...))
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Posting
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Quash Service of Subpoena)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Setting Hearing Da...))
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Application for Order of Sale of Dwelling
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for Order Setting Hearing Date on Application for Sale)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference
Date: 2021-11-18T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SETTING HEARING DATE ON APPLICATION)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Subpoena)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER SETTING HEARING DAT...))
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles))
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Declaration (re Ex Parte Notice)
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why The Court Should Not Issue An Ord...))
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Why Order For Sale of Dwelling Should...) of )
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Declaration (of Tamar Ravid in Support of Reply)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Genna DeLany in Support of Reply)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Response (to Objection to Declarations of xxxx xxxxx and Eitan Yehoshua)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00Objection (to [Proposed] Order for Sale of Dwelling)
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order Staying Discover...))
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte Application for Order Staying Discovery)
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Application for Order of Sale of Dwelling by ...) of )
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion Compel Responses to Demand for Production of Documents)
Date: 2022-05-11T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Order ([Proposed] Order for Sale of Dwelling)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Submission of Revised Proposed...))
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Submission of Revised Proposed...))
Date: 2022-03-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Amended Order for Sale...))
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Amended Order for Sale...) of )
Date: 2022-05-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2022-04-13T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Compel SIs)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of , and the ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING)
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Notice of and Ex Parte Application for an Amended Order for Sale of Dwelling)
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00Declaration (re Meet and Confer Efforts for Motion to Compel Hearing Set for May 24, 2022)
Date: 2022-05-19T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Deposition Subpoena)
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Submission of Revised Proposed...) of )
Date: 2022-04-08T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Compel RFPs)
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest
Date: 2022-03-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Application for Order of Sale of Dwelling by ...))
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination))
Date: 2022-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Notice (of hearing) Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Notice (of Order to Show Cause) Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Complaint Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxx (Defendant); xxxxxx xxxxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Transferring Department 44 hearing/case;) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment - Civil and xxxxx Claims Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Ruling on Notice of Related Case) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set For ) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-30T00:00:00Judgment (Proposed Judgment) Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Declaration Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxx (Defendant); xxxxxx xxxxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order Entering Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing) Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Demurrer Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxx (Defendant); xxxxxx xxxxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Complaint ((1st)) Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte for Order Setting He...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-10 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Notice Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why xxxxxx xxxxxxx and xxxxxx Srivast...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Order (for Defendants to Appear for Debtor's Exam) Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Notice (Entry of Judgment) Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Motion to Strike Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxx (Defendant); xxxxxx xxxxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Barry Ian Gold, Esq. (Attorney)
Date: 2020-10-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Ruling on Notice of Related Case)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Application for Order of Sale of Dwelling Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-08-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles)) Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Transferring Department 44 hearing/case;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set For )) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Barry Ian Gold, Esq. (Attorney)
Date: 2020-07-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by xxxx xxxxx (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO STAY DISCOVERY, OR IN THE ...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING AN...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Order for Defendants to Appear for Debtor's Exam]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Declaration (of xxxxxx xxxxxxxxxx re OSC) Filed by xxxxxx xxxxxxxxxx (Defendant)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Order ([Proposed] ORDER ISSUING SANCTIONS AGAINST GUARAV xxxxxxxxxx AND xxxxxx xxxxxxx)
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order Entering Judgment))
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Notice (Entry of Judgment)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles))
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set For 6/3/20) of 04/21/2020)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Rescheduled Hearing Currently Set For 6/3/20))
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Transferring Department 44 hearing/case;) of 06/10/2020)
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/23/2020)
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Transferring Department 44 hearing/case;))
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00Notice (of hearing)
Date: 2020-07-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/03/2020)
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-08-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...))
Date: 2020-11-19T00:00:00Notice (OF RESCHEDULED HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles))
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Order ([PROPOSED] ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE DEBTORS EXAMINATIONS)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...))
Date: 2021-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...))
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 06/23/2021)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why xxxxxx xxxxxxx and xxxxxx Srivast...))
Date: 2021-07-30T00:00:00Notice (of Order to Show Cause)
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (TO STAY DISCOVERY, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO STAY DISCOVERY, OR IN THE ...))
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Declaration (Regarding Ex Parte Notice)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/12/2021)
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ((Court Order))
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Order for Defendants to Appear for Debtor's Exam])
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Order (for Defendants to Appear for Debtor's Exam)
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Ruling on Notice of Related Case) of 08/27/2021)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte for Order Setting Hearing on Application for Sale)
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Ruling on Notice of Related Case))
Date: 2021-08-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR SALE OF DWELLING AN...))
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte for Order Setting He...))
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00Declaration (of xxxxxx xxxxxxx re OSC)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Declaration (of xxxxxx xxxxxxxxxx re OSC)
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...))
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Genna DeLany Re: Order to Show Cause Re: Contempt)
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for Order Setting Hearing Date on Application for Sale)
Date: 2022-02-02T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Genna DeLany Re Attorney Fees)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Order (to Show Cause Why Order for Sale of Dwelling Should Not Be Made)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Setting Hearing Da...))
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00Writ of Execution ((Los Angeles))
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SETTING HEARING DATE ON APPLICATION)
Date: 2022-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why The Court Should Not Issue An Ord...))
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Subpoena)
Date: 2021-10-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER SETTING HEARING DAT...))
Date: 2022-02-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/03/2022)
Date: 2022-02-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Genna DeLany in Support of Reply)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Jennifer LaCorte in Support of Reply)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Response (to Objection to Declarations of xxxx xxxxx and Eitan Yehoshua)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Order For Sale of Dwelling Should...))
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Opposition (to Ex Parte Application for Order Staying Discovery)
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Motion to Quash (Deposition Subpoena)
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Declaration (re Ex Parte Notice)
Date: 2022-03-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Application for Order of Sale of Dwelling by ...))
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Tamar Ravid in Support of Reply)
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Quash Service of Subpoena)
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/01/2022)
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00Complaint ((1st))
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Notice (of Taking Demurrer and Motion to Strike Off Calendar)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Notice ( OF CONTINUANCE OF THE DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Cas...))
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 03/14/2019)
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Notice ( of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment Pursuant to CCP Section 664.6)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Motion for Order Entering Judgment))
Date: 2019-06-12T00:00:00Judgment (Proposed Judgment)
Date: 2019-06-27T00:00:00Order ([Proposed] ORDER ISSUING SANCTIONS AGAINST GUARAV xxxxxxxxxx AND xxxxxx xxxxxxx)
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.