Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
xxxx xxxx VS PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ET AL
On September 25, 2017 an other pi/pd/wd (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Dennis J. Landin presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 25, 2017
Last Refreshed
July 04, 2024
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
James R. Dunn; William D. Stewart; John J. Kralik; Colin P. Leis; William A. Crowfoot;Category
civil
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Torts
Case Outcome Type
Transfrd to LASC North District
Status
Dismissal
Case Duration
8 months and 11 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF
MANDATORY DUTIES UNDER
CALIFORNIA GOVERNMENT CODE §§
815.2 (FOR VICARIOUS LIABILITY)
DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and OrderFiled by Clerk
Date: Jan 23, 2023Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: Jan 23, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 3 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
May 01, 2023 | hearing |
Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) |
|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 3, William A\. Crowfoot, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued Judge: William A. Crowfoot |
|
March 07, 2023 | hearing |
Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
in Department 3 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court |
|
February 24, 2023 | hearing |
Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk |
|
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 3 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court |
|
December 28, 2022 | hearing |
Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling Filed by Clerk |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk |
|
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 3, Colin P\. Leis, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued Judge: Colin P. Leis |
|
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
September 29, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 3, Colin P\. Leis, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued Judge: Colin P. Leis |
|
September 29, 2022 | hearing |
Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) |
|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk |
|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 3, Colin P\. Leis, Presiding Non-Appearance Case Review - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Non-Appearance Case Review - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Colin P. Leis |
|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
September 22, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 3, Colin P\. Leis, Presiding Non-Appearance Case Review - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Judge: Colin P. Leis |
|
September 22, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 3 Non-Appearance Case Review |
|
September 22, 2022 | hearing |
Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801 Non-Appearance Case Review |
|
September 16, 2022 | Proof of Service - No Service | ||
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - No Service Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Deposit (Order to deposit money in to blocked account) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 3, Colin P\. Leis, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued Judge: Colin P. Leis |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - No Service Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Deposit (Order to deposit money in to blocked account) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - No Service Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Deposit (Order to deposit money in to blocked account) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Deposit (Order to deposit money in to blocked account) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - No Service Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
September 16, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 3, Colin P\. Leis, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued Judge: Colin P. Leis |
|
September 16, 2022 | hearing |
Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) |
|
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability (Miscellaneous) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability (Miscellaneous) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability (Miscellaneous) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability (Miscellaneous) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk |
|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 3, Colin P\. Leis, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued Judge: Colin P. Leis |
|
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
July 15, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 3, Colin P\. Leis, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued Judge: Colin P. Leis |
|
July 15, 2022 | hearing |
Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) |
|
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk |
|
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 3, Colin P\. Leis, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued Judge: Colin P. Leis |
|
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
May 13, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 3, Colin P\. Leis, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued Judge: Colin P. Leis |
|
May 13, 2022 | hearing |
Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 3, Colin P\. Leis, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued Judge: Colin P. Leis |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
March 01, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 3, Colin P\. Leis, Presiding Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued Judge: Colin P. Leis |
|
March 01, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 3 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 01, 2022 | hearing |
Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 3 Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
January 24, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 3 Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
in Department 3 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
January 13, 2022 | hearing |
in Department 3 Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court |
|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department 3, Colin P\. Leis, Presiding Court Order Court Order Judge: Colin P. Leis |
|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of ) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of ) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
December 28, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 3, Colin P\. Leis, Presiding Court Order Judge: Colin P. Leis |
|
December 28, 2021 | hearing |
in Department 3 Court Order |
|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of 12/28/2021) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)) Filed by Clerk |
|
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (of Case Reassignment) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (of Case Reassignment) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (of Case Reassignment) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (of Case Reassignment) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (of Case Reassignment) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice (of Case Reassignment) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department B Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation |
|
February 16, 2021 | hearing |
in Department B Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation |
|
February 16, 2021 | hearing |
Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502 Jury Trial |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
in Department B, John J\. Kralik, Presiding Final Status Conference - Held - Continued Final Status Conference - Held - Continued Judge: John J. Kralik |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
February 04, 2021 | hearing |
in Department B, John J\. Kralik, Presiding Final Status Conference - Held - Continued Judge: John J. Kralik |
|
February 04, 2021 | hearing |
in Department B Final Status Conference - Held - Continued |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk |
|
February 04, 2021 | hearing |
Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502 Final Status Conference |
|
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department STL-C MSC Timeslot (Judge James R\. Dunn) MSC Timeslot (Judge James R\. Dunn) |
|
September 03, 2020 | hearing |
in Department STL-C MSC Timeslot (Judge James R\. Dunn) |
|
September 03, 2020 | hearing |
in Department STL-C, James R\. Dunn, Presiding MSC Timeslot (Judge James R\. Dunn) Judge: James R. Dunn |
|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department STL-C MSC Timeslot (Judge James R\. Dunn) - Not Held - Clerical Error MSC Timeslot (Judge James R\. Dunn) - Not Held - Clerical Error |
|
August 03, 2020 | hearing |
in Department STL-C MSC Timeslot (Judge James R\. Dunn) - Not Held - Clerical Error |
|
August 03, 2020 | hearing |
in Department STL-C, James R\. Dunn, Presiding MSC Timeslot (Judge James R\. Dunn) - Not Held - Clerical Error Judge: James R. Dunn |
|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk |
|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department B, John J\. Kralik, Presiding Trial Setting Conference - Held Trial Setting Conference - Held Judge: John J. Kralik |
|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
July 27, 2020 | hearing |
in Department B, John J\. Kralik, Presiding Trial Setting Conference - Held Judge: John J. Kralik |
|
July 27, 2020 | hearing |
in Department B Trial Setting Conference - Held |
|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk |
|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department B Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
June 01, 2020 | hearing |
in Department B Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department B Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
May 21, 2020 | hearing |
in Department B Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk |
|
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
in Department B, John J\. Kralik, Presiding Court Order Court Order Judge: John J. Kralik |
|
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
April 01, 2020 | hearing |
in Department B, John J\. Kralik, Presiding Court Order Judge: John J. Kralik |
|
April 01, 2020 | hearing |
in Department B Court Order |
|
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/01/2020) Filed by Clerk |
|
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department B Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion |
|
October 15, 2019 | hearing |
in Department B Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion |
|
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department B Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion |
|
October 03, 2019 | hearing |
in Department B Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Nancy Prapion Doumanian (Attorney) |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Nancy Prapion Doumanian (Attorney) Filed by Nancy Prapion Doumanian (Attorney) |
|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department B Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party |
|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department B Hearing on Joinder to Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party Hearing on Joinder to Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party |
|
September 06, 2019 | hearing |
in Department B Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party |
|
September 06, 2019 | hearing |
in Department B Hearing on Joinder to Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party |
|
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order (Granting Ex Parte Application) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Cont...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department B, John J\. Kralik, Presiding Ex-Parte Proceedings (Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and Related Hearing Dates Per Stipulation of Counsel) - Held - Motion Granted Ex-Parte Proceedings (Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and Related Hearing Dates Per Stipulation of Counsel) - Held - Motion Granted Judge: John J. Kralik |
|
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order (Granting Ex Parte Application) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Cont...)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
August 23, 2019 | hearing |
in Department B, John J\. Kralik, Presiding Ex-Parte Proceedings (Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and Related Hearing Dates Per Stipulation of Counsel) - Held - Motion Granted Judge: John J. Kralik |
|
August 23, 2019 | hearing |
in Department B Ex-Parte Proceedings (Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial and Related Hearing Dates Per Stipulation of Counsel) - Held - Motion Granted |
|
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order (Granting Ex Parte Application) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings Defendant's Ex Parte Application to Cont...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application (Def. Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial (08-22-19)) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application (Def. Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial (08-22-19)) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application (Def. Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial (08-22-19)) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
August 16, 2019 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS AT DEPOSITION) | ||
August 16, 2019 | Order - ORDER COURT'S ORDER RE: MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER ANSWERS AT DEPOSITION AND REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS | ||
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order (Court's Order re: Motion to Compel Further Answers at Deposition and Request for Monetary Sanctions) Filed by Clerk |
|
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Answers at Deposition)) Filed by Clerk |
|
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department B, William D\. Stewart, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel (Answers at Deposition) - Held - Motion Granted Hearing on Motion to Compel (Answers at Deposition) - Held - Motion Granted Judge: William D. Stewart |
|
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order (Court's Order re: Motion to Compel Further Answers at Deposition and Request for Monetary Sanctions) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Answers at Deposition)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
August 16, 2019 | hearing |
in Department B, William D\. Stewart, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel (Answers at Deposition) - Held - Motion Granted Judge: William D. Stewart |
|
August 16, 2019 | hearing |
in Department B Hearing on Motion to Compel (Answers at Deposition) - Held - Motion Granted |
|
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Answers at Deposition)) Filed by Clerk |
|
August 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order (Court's Order re: Motion to Compel Further Answers at Deposition and Request for Monetary Sanctions) Filed by Clerk |
|
August 16, 2019 | Tentative Ruling | North Central District xxxx xxxx, Plaintiff, v. pasadena unified school district, Defendant. Case No.: BC677307 Hearing Date: August 16, 2019 TENTATIVE order RE: motion to compel further answers at ... | |
August 09, 2019 | Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL | ||
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Compel) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Compel) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Compel) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Compel) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Compel) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
August 02, 2019 | Opposition - OPPOSITION TO SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL | ||
August 02, 2019 | Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL | ||
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition (to Motion to Compel) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition (to Separate Statement in Support of Motion to Compel) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition (to Motion to Compel) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition (to Separate Statement in Support of Motion to Compel) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition (to Separate Statement in Support of Motion to Compel) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
August 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition (to Motion to Compel) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
May 14, 2019 | Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS AT DEPOSITION AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS | ||
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel (Answers at Deposition and Request for Sanctions) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel (Answers at Deposition and Request for Sanctions) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel (Answers at Deposition and Request for Sanctions) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel (Answers at Deposition and Request for Sanctions) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel (Answers at Deposition and Request for Sanctions) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
May 14, 2019 | hearing |
Motion to Compel (Answers at Deposition and Request for Sanctions) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department B Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion |
|
May 13, 2019 | hearing |
in Department B Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion |
|
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department B Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion |
|
May 01, 2019 | hearing |
in Department B Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion |
|
April 05, 2019 | Other - - OTHER - COURT'S ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES FROM DEFENDANT TO 1. FORM INTERROGATORIES (SET ONE); AND 2. REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (SET ONE) | ||
April 05, 2019 | Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES) | ||
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)) Filed by Clerk |
|
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Other - (Court's Order re: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses from Defendant to 1. Form Interrogatories (Set One); and 2. Request for Admissions (Set One)) Filed by Clerk |
|
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department B, John J\. Kralik, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Held - Motion Denied Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Held - Motion Denied Judge: John J. Kralik |
|
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Other - (Court's Order re: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses from Defendant to 1. Form Interrogatories (Set One); and 2. Request for Admissions (Set One)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
April 05, 2019 | hearing |
in Department B, John J\. Kralik, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Held - Motion Denied Judge: John J. Kralik |
|
April 05, 2019 | hearing |
in Department B Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Held - Motion Denied |
|
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)) Filed by Clerk |
|
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Other - (Court's Order re: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses from Defendant to 1. Form Interrogatories (Set One); and 2. Request for Admissions (Set One)) Filed by Clerk |
|
April 05, 2019 | Tentative Ruling | North Central District xxxx xxxx, Plaintiff, v. pasadena unified school district, Defendant. Case No.: BC677307 Hearing Date: April 5, 2019 TENTATIVE order RE: Plaintiffs motion to compel further r... | |
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department B Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
March 29, 2019 | hearing |
in Department B Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court |
|
March 20, 2019 | Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT’S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF’S FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET NO. ONE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DEC. OF NANCY P | ||
March 20, 2019 | Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT’S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF’S FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET NO. ONE | ||
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition (DEFENDANT?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF?S FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET NO. ONE) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition (DEFENDANT?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF?S FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET NO. ONE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DEC. OF NANCY P. DOUMANIAN) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition (DEFENDANT?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF?S FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET NO. ONE) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition (DEFENDANT?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF?S FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET NO. ONE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DEC. OF NANCY P. DOUMANIAN) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition (DEFENDANT?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF?S FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET NO. ONE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DEC. OF NANCY P. DOUMANIAN) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition (DEFENDANT?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF?S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF?S FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET NO. ONE) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings re PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Other - (Order) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department B, John J\. Kralik, Presiding Ex-Parte Proceedings (re PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES, ETC) - Held - Motion Granted Ex-Parte Proceedings (re PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES, ETC) - Held - Motion Granted Judge: John J. Kralik |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Other - (Order) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Other - (Order) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings re PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ...)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Other - (Order) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
March 19, 2019 | hearing |
in Department B, John J\. Kralik, Presiding Ex-Parte Proceedings (re PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES, ETC) - Held - Motion Granted Judge: John J. Kralik |
|
March 19, 2019 | hearing |
in Department B Ex-Parte Proceedings (re PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL TRIAL RELATED DATES, ETC) - Held - Motion Granted |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Other - (Order) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Ex-Parte Proceedings re PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Other - (Order) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
March 18, 2019 | Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS, SET NO. ONE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARAT | ||
March 18, 2019 | Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS, SET NO. ONE | ||
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition (Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Admissions, Set No. One; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; and Declaration of Nancy P. Doumanian in Support Thereof) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition (Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Separate Statement in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Admissions, Set No. One) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition (Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Admissions, Set No. One; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; and Declaration of Nancy P. Doumanian in Support Thereof) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition (Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Separate Statement in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Admissions, Set No. One) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition (Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Admissions, Set No. One; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; and Declaration of Nancy P. Doumanian in Support Thereof) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition (Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Separate Statement in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Admissions, Set No. One) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department A, William D\. Stewart, Presiding Ex-Parte Proceedings Ex-Parte Proceedings Judge: William D. Stewart |
|
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department A, William D\. Stewart, Presiding Nunc Pro Tunc Order Nunc Pro Tunc Order Judge: William D. Stewart |
|
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE ...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE ...)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
March 14, 2019 | hearing |
in Department A, William D\. Stewart, Presiding Nunc Pro Tunc Order Judge: William D. Stewart |
|
March 14, 2019 | hearing |
in Department A, William D\. Stewart, Presiding Ex-Parte Proceedings Judge: William D. Stewart |
|
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE ...)) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - No Order (to Continue Trial Date and all Related Dates) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application (for Order Continuing Trial Date and all Trial Related Dates) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application (for Order Continuing Trial Date and all Trial Related Dates) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - No Order (to Continue Trial Date and all Related Dates) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application (for Order Continuing Trial Date and all Trial Related Dates) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - No Order (to Continue Trial Date and all Related Dates) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - No Order (to Continue Trial Date and all Related Dates) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application (for Order Continuing Trial Date and all Trial Related Dates) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - No Order (to Continue Trial Date and all Related Dates) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application (for Order Continuing Trial Date and all Trial Related Dates) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
March 12, 2019 | hearing |
Stipulation - No Order (to Continue Trial Date and all Related Dates) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
in Department B, John J\. Kralik, Presiding Court Order Court Order Judge: John J. Kralik |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
February 21, 2019 | hearing |
in Department B, John J\. Kralik, Presiding Court Order Judge: John J. Kralik |
|
February 21, 2019 | hearing |
in Department B Court Order |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 02/21/2019) Filed by Clerk |
|
February 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk |
|
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order (Regarding Discovery Concerning Minor Pupil School Records and Plaintiff's Medical Records) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order (Regarding Discovery Concerning Minor Pupil School Records and Plaintiff's Medical Records) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order (Regarding Discovery Concerning Minor Pupil School Records and Plaintiff's Medical Records) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department B Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party |
|
December 14, 2018 | hearing |
in Department B Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party |
|
December 05, 2018 | Notice - Notice of continuance of hearing on plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to form interrogatories, set no. one | ||
December 05, 2018 | Notice - Notice of continuance of hearing on plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to request for admissions, set no. one | ||
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice (of continuance of hearing on plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to form interrogatories, set no. one) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice (of continuance of hearing on plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to request for admissions, set no. one) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice (of continuance of hearing on plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to form interrogatories, set no. one) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice (of continuance of hearing on plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to request for admissions, set no. one) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice (of continuance of hearing on plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to request for admissions, set no. one) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice (of continuance of hearing on plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to form interrogatories, set no. one) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice (of continuance of hearing on plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to request for admissions, set no. one) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice (of continuance of hearing on plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to form interrogatories, set no. one) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice (of continuance of hearing on plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to form interrogatories, set no. one) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice (of continuance of hearing on plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to request for admissions, set no. one) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice (of continuance of hearing on plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to form interrogatories, set no. one) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice (of continuance of hearing on plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to request for admissions, set no. one) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk |
|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
November 09, 2018 | Other - - Other - Court's Order re: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses form Defendant to : 1) Special Interrogatories (Set One) and 2) Request for Production of Documents-Set One | ||
November 09, 2018 | Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses) | ||
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department B, John J\. Kralik, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Held - Motion Granted Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Held - Motion Granted Judge: John J. Kralik |
|
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Other - (Court's Order re: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses form Defendant to : 1) Special Interrogatories (Set One) and 2) Request for Production of Documents-Set One) Filed by Clerk |
|
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)) Filed by Clerk |
|
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Other - (Court's Order re: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses form Defendant to : 1) Special Interrogatories (Set One) and 2) Request for Production of Documents-Set One) Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
November 09, 2018 | hearing |
in Department B, John J\. Kralik, Presiding Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Held - Motion Granted Judge: John J. Kralik |
|
November 09, 2018 | hearing |
in Department B Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Held - Motion Granted |
|
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Other - (Court's Order re: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Further Responses form Defendant to : 1) Special Interrogatories (Set One) and 2) Request for Production of Documents-Set One) Filed by Clerk |
|
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses)) Filed by Clerk |
|
November 09, 2018 | Tentative Ruling | xxxx xxxx, Plaintiff, v. pasadena unified school district, Defendant. Case No.: BC677307 Hearing Date: November 9, 2018 TENTATIVE order RE: Plaintiffs motion to compel further responses from defend... | |
November 02, 2018 | Reply - Reply to defendant's opposition to plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's request for production of documents, set #1; declaration of Eric R. Canton, Esq. | ||
November 02, 2018 | Reply - Reply to defendant's opposition to plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's special interrogatories, set #1; declaration of Eric R. Canton, Esq. | ||
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Reply (to defendant's opposition to plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's special interrogatories, set #1; declaration of Eric R. Canton, Esq.) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Reply (to defendant's opposition to plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's request for production of documents, set #1; declaration of Eric R. Canton, Esq.) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Reply (to defendant's opposition to plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's special interrogatories, set #1; declaration of Eric R. Canton, Esq.) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Reply (to defendant's opposition to plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's request for production of documents, set #1; declaration of Eric R. Canton, Esq.) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Reply (to defendant's opposition to plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's special interrogatories, set #1; declaration of Eric R. Canton, Esq.) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Reply (to defendant's opposition to plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's special interrogatories, set #1; declaration of Eric R. Canton, Esq.) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Reply (to defendant's opposition to plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's special interrogatories, set #1; declaration of Eric R. Canton, Esq.) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Reply (to defendant's opposition to plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's request for production of documents, set #1; declaration of Eric R. Canton, Esq.) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Reply (to defendant's opposition to plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's special interrogatories, set #1; declaration of Eric R. Canton, Esq.) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
October 29, 2018 | Opposition - Opposition to plaintiff's separate statement in support of plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's special interrogatories, set #1 | ||
October 29, 2018 | Opposition - Opposition to plaintiff's separate statement in support of plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's request for production of documents, set #1 | ||
October 29, 2018 | Opposition - Opposition to plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's request for production of documents, set #1 | ||
October 29, 2018 | Opposition - Opposition to plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's special interrogatories, set #1... | ||
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Opposition (to plaintiff's separate statement in support of plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's special interrogatories, set #1) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Opposition (to plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's special interrogatories, set #1...) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Opposition (to plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's request for production of documents, set #1) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Opposition (to plaintiff's separate statement in support of plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's request for production of documents, set #1) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Opposition (to plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's request for production of documents, set #1) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Opposition (to plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's special interrogatories, set #1...) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Opposition (to plaintiff's separate statement in support of plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's request for production of documents, set #1) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Opposition (to plaintiff's separate statement in support of plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's special interrogatories, set #1) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Opposition (to plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's request for production of documents, set #1) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Opposition (to plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's special interrogatories, set #1...) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Opposition (to plaintiff's separate statement in support of plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's request for production of documents, set #1) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Opposition (to plaintiff's separate statement in support of plaintiff's motion to compel further responses to plaintiff's special interrogatories, set #1) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
September 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department B Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial and Conference Set) - Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial and Conference Set) - |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2018-09-26 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2018-09-26 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
September 26, 2018 | hearing |
in Department B Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial and Conference Set) - |
|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
September 10, 2018 | Motion to Compel - AMWNDED | ||
September 10, 2018 | Motion to Compel - AMENDED | ||
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel AMWNDED | |
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel AMENDED | |
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Separate Statement AMENDED | |
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
August 31, 2018 | Separate Statement - IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION | ||
August 31, 2018 | Separate Statement - IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES | ||
August 31, 2018 | Motion to Compel - FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS | ||
August 31, 2018 | Motion to Compel - FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERRAGATORIES | ||
August 31, 2018 | Motion to Compel - FURTHER RESPONSESTO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | ||
August 31, 2018 | Motion to Compel - FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES | ||
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Separate Statement IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION | |
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS | |
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES | |
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel FURTHER RESPONSESTO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERRAGATORIES | |
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Separate Statement IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES | |
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) Filed by xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff); Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff) |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) Filed by Karla Cabrera (Plaintiff); xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff) |
|
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER | |
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by PASADENA, CITY OF (Defendant) |
|
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by PASADENA, CITY OF (Defendant) Filed by PASADENA, CITY OF (Defendant) |
|
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department B Court Order - Held Court Order - Held |
|
June 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2018-06-21 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
June 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2018-06-21 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
June 21, 2018 | hearing |
in Department B Court Order - Held |
|
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant) |
|
June 13, 2018 | JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL AFTER SUSTAINING OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND | ||
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by PASADENA, CITY OF (Defendant) |
|
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment (Judgment of Dismissal After Sustaining of Demurrer to Complaint Without Leave to Amend ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL AFTER SUSTAINING OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND | |
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment (Judgment of Dismissal After Sustaining of Demurrer to Complaint Without Leave to Amend ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by PASADENA, CITY OF (Defendant) Filed by PASADENA, CITY OF (Defendant) |
|
June 13, 2018 | hearing |
Judgment (Judgment of Dismissal After Sustaining of Demurrer to Complaint Without Leave to Amend ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 07, 2018 | MOTION OPPOSITION STIPULATION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER | ||
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2018-06-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Transfer (TRNSFRD TO DEPT B/BURBANK ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 4 Court Order (Court Order; Transferred to different departmnt) - Court Order (Court Order; Transferred to different departmnt) - |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department SS4, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding Court Order - Transferred to different departmnt Court Order - Transferred to different departmnt Judge: Dennis J. Landin |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Transfer Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION OPPOSITION STIPULATION TO TRANSFER COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT AND ORDER | |
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Transfer (TRNSFRD TO DEPT B/BURBANK ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Transfer Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2018-06-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department SS4, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding Court Order - Transferred to different departmnt Judge: Dennis J. Landin |
|
June 07, 2018 | hearing |
in Department 4 Court Order (Court Order; Transferred to different departmnt) - |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Transfer (TRNSFRD TO DEPT B/BURBANK ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
May 24, 2018 | NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT CITY OF PASADENA'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT | ||
May 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling (ON DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
May 24, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT CITY OF PASADENA'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT | |
May 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by PASADENA, CITY OF (Defendant) |
|
May 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed by PASADENA, CITY OF (Defendant) Filed by PASADENA, CITY OF (Defendant) |
|
May 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling (ON DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
May 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling (ON DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
May 17, 2018 | ORDER RE:DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT | ||
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2018-05-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER RE:DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT | |
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 4 Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (DEMURRER; Demurrer sustained without leave) - Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (DEMURRER; Demurrer sustained without leave) - |
|
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department SS4, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding DEMURRER (TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT) - Demurrer sustained without leave DEMURRER (TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT) - Demurrer sustained without leave Judge: Dennis J. Landin |
|
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Court |
|
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order (RE DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT ) Filed by Court |
|
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2018-05-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order (RE DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT ) Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Filed by Court Filed by Court |
|
May 17, 2018 | hearing |
in Department 4 Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (DEMURRER; Demurrer sustained without leave) - |
|
May 17, 2018 | hearing |
in Department SS4, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding DEMURRER (TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT) - Demurrer sustained without leave Judge: Dennis J. Landin |
|
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order (RE DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT ) Filed by Court |
|
May 17, 2018 | Tentative Ruling | MOVING PARTY: Defendants, City of Pasadena RESPONDING PARTY: None The court considered the moving papers and the arguments of counsel. BACKGROUND Plaintiff xxxx xxxx (Plaintiff), a minor, by and thr...
Judge: Dennis J. Landin |
|
April 20, 2018 | DEFENDANT CITY OF PASADENA'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF ARNOLD F. LEE | ||
April 20, 2018 | DEFENDANT CITY OF PASADENA'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT | ||
April 20, 2018 | SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ARNOLD. F. LEE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CITY OF PASADENA'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT | ||
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request Filed by PASADENA, CITY OF (Defendant) |
|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT CITY OF PASADENA'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT | |
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Demurrer Filed by PASADENA, CITY OF (Defendant) |
|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT CITY OF PASADENA'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF; DECLARATION OF ARNOLD F. LEE | |
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Demurrer (TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ARNOLD F. LEE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CITY OF PASADENA'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, ETC... ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by PASADENA, CITY OF (Defendant) |
|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ARNOLD. F. LEE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CITY OF PASADENA'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT | |
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request (FOE JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Demurrer (TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ARNOLD F. LEE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CITY OF PASADENA'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, ETC... ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other Filed by PASADENA, CITY OF (Defendant) Filed by PASADENA, CITY OF (Defendant) |
|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request (FOE JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Demurrer Filed by PASADENA, CITY OF (Defendant) Filed by PASADENA, CITY OF (Defendant) |
|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request Filed by PASADENA, CITY OF (Defendant) Filed by PASADENA, CITY OF (Defendant) |
|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous-Other (SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ARNOLD F. LEE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT CITY OF PASADENA'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE, ETC... ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request (FOE JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Demurrer (TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Receipt Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Receipt Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | CIVIL DEPOSIT | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Receipt Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Receipt Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer | |
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint (PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION | |
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by PASADENA, CITY OF (Defendant) |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration (of demurrering party in support of automatic extension; ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed by PASADENA, CITY OF (Defendant) Filed by PASADENA, CITY OF (Defendant) |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration (of demurrering party in support of automatic extension; ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint (PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed by Defendant/Respondent Filed by Defendant/Respondent |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration (of demurrering party in support of automatic extension; ) Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer to Complaint (PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS | |
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons | |
January 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Filed Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Application-Miscellaneous (RESUBMITTED FOR xxxx CABRERA GUARDIAN AD LITEM ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
November 27, 2017 | Docket Event | APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL | |
November 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Application-Miscellaneous (RESUBMITTED FOR xxxx CABRERA GUARDIAN AD LITEM ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
November 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Application-Miscellaneous (RESUBMITTED FOR xxxx CABRERA GUARDIAN AD LITEM ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
October 05, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM | |
September 25, 2017 | COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF MANDATORY DUTIES UNDER CALIFORNIA GOVERNMENT CODE 815.6 (FOR DIRECT LIABILITY) AND 815.2 (FOR VICARIOUS LIABILITY) DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL | ||
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF MANDATORY DUTIES UNDER CALIFORNIA GOVERNMENT CODE 815.6 (FOR DIRECT LIABILITY) AND 815.2 (FOR VICARIOUS LIABILITY) DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL | |
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Application-Miscellaneous (FOR xxxx xxxx GUARDIAN AD LITEM ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL | |
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by null |
|
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by null Filed by null |
|
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Application-Miscellaneous (FOR xxxx xxxx GUARDIAN AD LITEM ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
September 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Application-Miscellaneous (FOR xxxx xxxx GUARDIAN AD LITEM ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr |
|