Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hernandez Julio, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mikhov Steve Borislav Esq., Wirtz Richard, against Bmw Of North America Llc, Nick Alexander Imports Dba Nick Alexander Bmw, represented by Lehrman Kate S., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michelle Williams Court presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichelle Williams Court Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management120 days |
Filing DateJune 22, 2017 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions769 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time790 days |
Motion to Tax Costs
Date: December 10, 2019Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Document:Order-Case Management Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-use CSR Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 6; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 3; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 8; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 19; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Order - Dismissal; Filed by: Court; As to: Causes: for Breach of Implied Warranty
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 03, 2021Motion in Limine No. 22; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order)]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant); Nick Alexander Imports (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Special Verdict; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order re hearing continuance) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 5; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 7; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant); Nick Alexander Imports (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Document:Notice, Association of Counsel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 9; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 1; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 4; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 12; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Declaration of Amy R. Rotman; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine 17; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 18; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 16; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Disassociation of Attorney; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 10; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Jury Instructions (Given); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 17; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 16; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 13; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Declaration re Plaintiff's Counsel's Unavailability; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 14; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 11; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 21; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 2; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 12; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Reply PLAINTIFF?S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY?S FEES; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 20; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs; Filed by: BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant); Nick Alexander Imports (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Reply Motion for Prejudgment Interest; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Declaration in support of Reply; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 19; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Jury Question; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: December 11, 2020Notice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 17, 2021Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Witness List; Filed by: BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant); Nick Alexander Imports (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 15; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 18; Filed by: Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: June 07, 2019PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: July 07, 2017PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: August 02, 2017Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 22, 2020PLAINTIFF?S REPLY TO DEFENDANT?S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION? TO COMPEL
Date: March 27, 2018DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO.6 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF OTHER INCIDENTS, ETC.
Date: July 13, 2018Reply - Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Order Reopening Discovery
Date: January 08, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 18
Date: June 05, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 14
Date: June 05, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13
Date: June 05, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 19
Date: June 05, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 16
Date: June 05, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 17
Date: June 05, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15
Date: June 05, 2019Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 21
Date: June 07, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 16
Date: June 07, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 19
Date: June 07, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 18
Date: June 07, 2019Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12
Date: June 07, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE 17
Date: June 07, 2019Notice - NOTICE JOINT STATEMENT RE: MOTIONS IN LIMINE
Date: June 17, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 19
Date: July 26, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 16
Date: July 26, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 18
Date: July 26, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 15
Date: July 26, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 17
Date: July 26, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 13
Date: July 26, 2019Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 14
Date: July 26, 2019Motion re: - MOTION RE: FOR PREJUDGMENT INTEREST
Date: November 06, 2019Reply - REPLY MOTION FOR PREJUDGMENT INTEREST
Date: November 27, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER PREJUDGMENT INTEREST)
Date: December 06, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES
Date: December 13, 2019Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: December 13, 2019Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF’S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY’S FEES
Date: June 22, 2020COMPLAINT: 1. VIOLATION OF SONG-BEVERLY ACT - BREACH OF EXPRESS WARRANTY; ETC
Date: June 22, 2017DEFENDANT BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: July 20, 2017DEFENDANT NICK ALEXANDER IMPORTS D/B/A NICK ALEXANDER BMW'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: August 07, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 31, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 10, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: June 17, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 08, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 12, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: September 30, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 06, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: November 27, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: December 13, 2019Answer Filed by Nick Alexander Imports (Defendant); Nick Alexander BMW (Legacy Party)
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (Calendar error))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-20 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine (17) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 19) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 14) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Court
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 4) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 17) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 12) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 19) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 16) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 9) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 8) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Order - Dismissal Filed by Court
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Trial) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Notice (Joint Statement re: Motions in Limine) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Jury Question Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Special Verdict Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Notice (List of Stipulated Facts) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: re Entry of Judgment)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Jury Instructions ((Given)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Judgment on Special Verdict Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re hearing continuance)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Reply (Motion for Prejudgment Interest) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: December 11, 2020Order (Proposed Order) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: August 05, 2020Declaration (of Amy R. Rotman) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Declaration (in support of Reply) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings Filed by Clerk
Date: March 17, 2021Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees; Hearing on Motion to Tax...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs Filed by BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant); Nick Alexander Imports (Defendant)
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Prejudgment Interest)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Motion re: (for Prejudgment Interest) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Pleadings Filed by Clerk
Date: February 03, 2021Reply (PLAINTIFF?S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY?S FEES) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re hearing continuance) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order)]) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 21) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Answer Filed by BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Declaration (re Plaintiff's Counsel's Unavailability) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-04 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-03 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 22) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Points and Authorities Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-13 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-25 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 3) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 2) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 10) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-20 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 11) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Reply to Opposition Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Notice Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 1) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 18) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-01 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant); Nick Alexander Imports (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 16) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant); Nick Alexander Imports (Defendant)
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-04 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 5) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-30 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 7) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 12) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 20) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 18) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 13) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 6) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 15) Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant); Nick Alexander Imports (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Disassociation of Attorney Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Kate S. Lehrman (Attorney)
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Julio Hernandez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Witness List Filed by BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant); Nick Alexander Imports (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2017-07-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-10-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-20 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-10-13T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-04 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2018-05-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-04 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-01 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-07-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-07-09T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-07-13T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-07-20T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-25T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2018-11-08T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-30 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Reply (to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Order Reopening Discovery)
Date: 2019-01-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")))
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 6)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 7)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 2)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 1)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 5)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 12)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 3)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 4)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 8)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Exhibit List (JOINT AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 10)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 9)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's MIL No. 11)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Witness List (AMENDED JOINT WITNESS LIST)
Date: 2019-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Declaration (re Plaintiff's Counsel's Unavailability)
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2019-02-08T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial (Calendar error)))
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Disassociation of Attorney
Date: 2019-04-05T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2019-03-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 19)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 18)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 13)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 14)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 17)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 15)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 16)
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Memorandum (and Points and Authorities to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine NO. 22)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Memorandum (and Points and Authorities to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine NO. 16)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Memorandum (and Points and Authorities to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine NO. 18)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Memorandum (and Points and Authorities to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine NO. 17)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Memorandum (and Points and Authorities to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine NO. 21)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Memorandum (and Points and Authorities to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine NO. 20)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 20)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 19)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Memorandum (and Points and Authorities to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine NO. 19)
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 16)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 21)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine (17)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Opposition (to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 12)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 18)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 22)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Brief (Bench Brief of Defendants Regarding In-applicability of Implied Warranty of Merchangtability)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Notice (Joint Statement re: Motions in Limine)
Date: 2019-06-17T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Notice (List of Stipulated Facts)
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-06-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter (Leandra Amber, CSR#12070)
Date: 2019-07-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial))
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (to Continue Trial)
Date: 2019-07-25T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 18)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 13)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 14)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 15)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 16)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 17)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 19)
Date: 2019-07-26T00:00:00Notice (of Lodging Deposition Transcripts)
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-07-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-08-05T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-08-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-12T00:00:00Jury Instructions ((Given))
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Special Verdict
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing])
Date: 2019-08-28T00:00:00Jury Question
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: re Entry of Judgment))
Date: 2019-09-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING)
Date: 2019-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Declaration (of Amy R. Rotman)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Motion re: (for Prejudgment Interest)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Judgment on Special Verdict
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Stipulation to Extend Plaintiff's Deadline to File His Memorandum of Costs)
Date: 2019-11-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Declaration (in support of Reply)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Reply (Motion for Prejudgment Interest)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/06/2019)
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2019-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Prejudgment Interest))
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Declaration (in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Declaration ( of Steve Mikhov in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees, Costs and Expenses)
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Opposition (TO DEFENDANT BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC?S MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS)
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Notice of Motion (PLAINTIFF?S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEY?S FEES, COSTS AND EXPENSES)
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-12-13T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/30/2020)
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order)])
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Reply (PLAINTIFF?S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ATTORNEY?S FEES)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Objection (PLAINTIFF?S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF DAN VILLEGAS)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Objection (PLAINTIFF?S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF ANDREW STEFATOS)
Date: 2020-06-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re hearing continuance))
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Order (Proposed Order)
Date: August 05, 2020Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re hearing continuance) of 06/25/2020)
Date: 2020-06-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 07/24/2020)
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees; Hearing on Motion to Tax...))
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.