Case Last Refreshed: 44 minutes ago
Shirvanyan Anahit, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Lim Mark Irwin, Madjidi Mahru, Nguyen Anthony, Rostomyan Aram Esq., Shegerian Carney Richard Esq., (total of 5) See All against Los Angeles Community College District, Shirvanyan Anahit, represented by Felipe June Grace, Messer Charles Robert, Smith Keith E, Zimmer Jeanne Louise Esq., Orr Cheryl A., (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Superior with Stephanie M. Bowick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephanie M. Bowick Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2016 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions869 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJury Verdict |
Case Cycle Time869 days |
Joint Notice of Filing Requested Proposed General Verdict Form
Date: December 14, 2018Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: May 06, 2019Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (;B296593;)
Date: June 10, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: April 30, 2021Other - (GENERAL VERDICT)
Date: December 18, 2018Notice of Ruling
Date: March 21, 2019Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict
Date: February 06, 2019Notice (NTC ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SHIRVANYAN))
Date: January 28, 2019Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed (;B296593;)
Date: March 22, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by:
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Proposed First Amended Joint Jury Instructions; Filed by:
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00Trial Brief; Filed by: Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Plaintiff Anahit Shirvanyan's First Amended Proposed Jury Instructions; Filed by:
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by:
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Plaintiff's Proposed Jury Instructions; Filed by:
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Other - GENERAL VERDICT; Filed by: Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Association of Attorney; Filed by: Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Jury Question; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial; Filed by: Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-04-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-06-06T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Attorney; As to: Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2023-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2023-09-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2023-09-21T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 3; Filed by: Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Joint Exhibit List; Filed by: Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees; Filed by:
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-01-03T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-02T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Proposed Joint Statement of the Case; Filed by: Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Witness List First Amended Joint; Filed by: Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Document:Supporting Docs/ P's & A's Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00(proposed) Joint Jury Instructions; Filed by:
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Objection to Defendant's Special Instructions; Filed by: Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-10-06T00:00:00Document:Notice, Association of Counsel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Document:Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-10-17T00:00:00Stipulation Regarding Trial Exhibits; Filed by: Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Document:Statement of Facts Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING THE PROPOSED JUDGMENT; Filed by: Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Objection EVID OBJ OPP NEW TRIAL JNOV (SHIRVANYAN); Filed by: Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Document:Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Case Management Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine No. 2; Filed by: Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Plaintiff's trial brief; Filed by:
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Motion to Bifurcate; Filed by: Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Brief Jointly Requested Court Voir Dire Questions; Filed by: Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Jury Instructions; Filed by:
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Reply in Support of Motion in Limine #2; Filed by: Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Notice of Lodging FED AUTH RE MTN ATTY FEES (SHIRVANYAN); Filed by: Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Other - JUDGMENT ON GENERAL VERDICT; Filed by: Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Objection OBJ TO MTN NEW TRIAL JNOV (SHIRVANYAN); Filed by: Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Opposition to Motion for Interest; Filed by: Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Exhibit List; Filed by: Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Reply Response to Evidentiary Objections; Filed by: Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Reply Response to Noncompliant Objections; Filed by: Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Notice Notice of CMC; Filed by: Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal for Notice of Appeal, filed ("U"); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Appeal - Appendix CRC 8.124 Transcript Certified; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript;B296593;; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Appeal Document NOA: ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Other Reversed with directions. B297419; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Jury Question
Date: December 18, 2018PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -
Date: October 06, 2016NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND PROOF OF SERVICE THEREOF
Date: December 05, 2016NOTICE OF SETTING OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: November 02, 2017Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 14, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 06, 2019EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: June 07, 2018Opposition - Opposition to Motion to Compel Further Responses
Date: October 19, 2018Motion in Limine - Motion in Limine No. 3
Date: October 31, 2018Motion to Bifurcate
Date: October 31, 2018Motion in Limine - Motion in Limine No. 2
Date: October 31, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Legacy Event Type : Motion to Compel)
Date: November 01, 2018Reply - Reply in Support of Motion in Limine #2
Date: November 16, 2018Declaration - Declaration Index of Exhibits in Support of Opposition to Motion for Interest
Date: January 14, 2019Opposition - Opposition to Motion for Interest
Date: January 14, 2019Declaration - Declaration of Charles Messer in Support of Opposition to Motion for Interest
Date: January 14, 2019Memorandum - Memorandum in support of Motion for New Trial
Date: February 06, 2019Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding the Verdict
Date: February 06, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)
Date: February 13, 2019Notice - Notice of Change of Hearing Date re Motion for New Trial and Motion for Partial JNOV
Date: February 14, 2019Reply - Reply in support of Motions for New Trial and Partial JNOV
Date: March 05, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS’ FEES)
Date: April 15, 2019PLAINTIFF ANAHIT SHIRVANYAN?S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION; ETC
Date: September 08, 2016Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Answer Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2016-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Motion to Bifurcate Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Statement of Facts Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Motion in Limine Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Other - (GENERAL VERDICT) Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Notice Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00Response Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-01-03T00:00:00Notice Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-30 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 3) Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-13 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-07-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 2) Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Objection (to Defendant's Special Instructions) Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-11-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-04 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-21 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-23 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Order Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Trial Brief Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-03 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Brief (Jointly Requested Court Voir Dire Questions) Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Other (Reversed with directions. B297419) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Proposed Joint Statement of the Case Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Appeal Document (NOA: ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-20 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-12 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Notice Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : Motion to Compel)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Joint Exhibit List Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Jury Question Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Association of Attorney Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Notice (APPENDIX EVID OPP NEW TRIAL JNOV VOL 2 (SHIRVANYAN)) Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Court
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Notice (of WITHDRAWAL MTN FOR PRE-JUDGMENT INTEREST (SHIRVANYAN)) Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Notice (OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE) Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Change of Handling Attorney Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2022-10-26T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Appellant)
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2023-02-09T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Objection (EVID OBJ OPP NEW TRIAL JNOV (SHIRVANYAN)) Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Notice (NTC ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SHIRVANYAN)) Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00Order (ORDER DENYING NEW TRIAL JNOV (SHIRVANYAN)) Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP- Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Appellant)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Objection (OBJ TO MTN NEW TRIAL JNOV (SHIRVANYAN)) Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Notice (FINAL REPLY APPENDIX EVID RE MTN ATTY FEES (SHIRVANYAN)) Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Reply (Response to Evidentiary Objections) Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (FED AUTH RE MTN ATTY FEES (SHIRVANYAN)) Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter Re: Defendant Los Angeles Communit...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Appellant)
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Counsel) Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Appellant)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Appendix CRC 8.124 Transcript Certified Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Notice to Reporter to Prepare Transcript on Appeal (;B296593;) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial and All Tr...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-12T00:00:00Notice of Default Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Notice (Notice of CMC) Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2021-04-30T00:00:00Order (PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MTN ATTY FEES (SHIRVANYAN)) Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary) Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Appellant)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS? FEES)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Ruling on the Motion for Attorneys' Fees with...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-07-30 00:00:00
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-08-20T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-18 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Motion to Bifurcate
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 3)
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ((Legacy Event Type : Motion to Compel))
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Defendant Los Angeles Community College District's Opposition to Motion in Limine No. 2
Date: 2018-11-09T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion to Bifurcate the Trial of the Issues of Liability Before Damages)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion in Limine #2)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Proposed Joint Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Witness List (First Amended Joint)
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Joint Witness List
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Joint Exhibit List
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference))
Date: 2018-11-28T00:00:00Minute Order ((Final Status Conference))
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Objection (to Defendant's Special Instructions)
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Defendant Los Angeles Community College District's Trial Brief
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Brief (Jointly Requested Court Voir Dire Questions)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Stipulation Regarding Trial Exhibits
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-12-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Trial Brief
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Stipulation, Receipt and Order re: Release of Civil Exhibits
Date: 2018-12-17T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Interest)
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING THE PROPOSED JUDGMENT
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2019-01-04T00:00:00Declaration (of Charles Messer in Support of Opposition to Motion for Interest)
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Jury Trial))
Date: 2018-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Lodging (FED AUTH RE MTN ATTY FEES (SHIRVANYAN))
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Notice (of WITHDRAWAL MTN FOR PRE-JUDGMENT INTEREST (SHIRVANYAN))
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00Declaration (Index of Exhibits in Support of Opposition to Motion for Interest)
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 01/25/2019)
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Other - (JUDGMENT ON GENERAL VERDICT)
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-01-30T00:00:00Reply (PLAINTIFF ANAHIT SHIRVANYAN?S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS? FEES)
Date: 2019-02-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Charles Messer in Support of Motion for New Trial and Motion for Partial JNOV)
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Memorandum (in support of Motion for New Trial)
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Intent to Move for New Trial
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Notice (FINAL REPLY APPENDIX EVID RE MTN ATTY FEES (SHIRVANYAN))
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2019-02-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees))
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 02/13/2019)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order ( to Combine Post-Trial Briefing-Exe.SIGNED)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Notice (of Change of Hearing Date re Motion for New Trial and Motion for Partial JNOV)
Date: 2019-02-14T00:00:00Objection (OBJ TO MTN NEW TRIAL JNOV (SHIRVANYAN))
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Objection (EVID OBJ OPP NEW TRIAL JNOV (SHIRVANYAN))
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Notice (APPENDIX EVID OPP NEW TRIAL JNOV VOL 1 (SHIRVANYAN))
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Notice (APPENDIX EVID OPP NEW TRIAL JNOV VOL 2 (SHIRVANYAN))
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Objection (Evidentiary Objections to Campi Declaration)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Reply (in support of Motions for New Trial and Partial JNOV)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Reply (Response to Noncompliant Objections)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Reply (Response to Evidentiary Objections)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Declaration (of J. Grace Felipe in support of Reply re Motions for New Trial and Partial JNOV)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Order (ORDER DENYING NEW TRIAL JNOV (SHIRVANYAN))
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion for Judgment Notwithstanding...))
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter Re: Defendant Los Angeles Communit...))
Date: 2019-03-15T00:00:00Notice of Default
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/10/2021)
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (for Notice of Appeal, filed 5/2/19 ("U"))
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2019-05-02T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS? FEES))
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil)
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Other (Reversed with directions. B297419)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Notice (OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Appeal Record Delivered
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Notice (of Withdrawal of Counsel)
Date: 2019-04-22T00:00:00Appendix CRC 8.124 Transcript Certified
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Order (PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING MTN ATTY FEES (SHIRVANYAN))
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2019-05-06T00:00:00Notice to Reporter to Prepare Transcript on Appeal (;B296593;)
Date: 2019-06-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Ruling on the Motion for Attorneys' Fees with...))
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Appeal Document (NOA: 03/22/19 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION)
Date: 2019-07-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order Re: MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS? FEES) of 04/15/2019)
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/09/2021)
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Notice (Notice of CMC)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-01-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-12-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-12 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-13 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-23 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-02 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-11-02T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2017-12-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-05 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Response
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-04 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-08 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-03 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-03T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-08-15T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-08-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2018-09-10T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion to Compel Further Responses)
Date: 2018-10-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine (No. 2)
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Notice Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-11-02T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING THE PROPOSED JUDGMENT Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-12-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-23 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-08-23T00:00:00Witness List (First Amended Joint) Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Interest) Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion in Limine #2) Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2018-11-16T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-01-14T00:00:00Stipulation Regarding Trial Exhibits Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Other - (JUDGMENT ON GENERAL VERDICT) Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-03-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Reply (Response to Noncompliant Objections) Filed by Los Angeles Community College District (Defendant)
Date: 2019-03-05T00:00:00Notice (APPENDIX EVID OPP NEW TRIAL JNOV VOL 1 (SHIRVANYAN)) Filed by Anahit Shirvanyan (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-02-26T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Default Issued
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Appeal - Appendix CRC 8.124 Transcript Certified
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (for Notice of Appeal, filed 5/2/19 ("U"))
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.