Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Zepeda Jose, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Maryann P. Gallagher Law Offices Of, against Michno Pam Judgment, Perras Joelean Judgment, Starbucks Corporation, Zepeda Jose, represented by Kennedy Tracey Adano, Lopez Richard Paul, Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Gregory W. Alarcon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory W. Alarcon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management204 days |
Filing DateMay 16, 2016 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions514 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeJury Verdict |
Case Cycle Time711 days |
Order Ruling Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Declaration of Maryann P. Gallagher in support of reply to opp.,etc. Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-15T00:00:00Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance of Default on Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 29, 2019Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed; Filed by:
Date: July 18, 2019Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Default; Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 29, 2019NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 08, 2017PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO TAX COSTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
Date: November 13, 2017DEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATION'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1
Date: November 29, 2017RULING RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS.
Date: March 27, 2018RULING ON MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: April 17, 2018PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATION'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS; ETC.
Date: September 18, 2018PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
Date: September 24, 2018PLAINTIFF'S COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE [N SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES
Date: September 24, 2018PLAINTIFF'S COMPENDIUM OF DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES
Date: September 24, 2018CORRECTED DECLARATION OF MARYANN P. GALLAGHER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES
Date: September 25, 2018AMENDED DECLARATION OF SHAWN DANTZLER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES
Date: September 25, 2018Notice - Notice of Continued Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys Fees
Date: October 17, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)
Date: December 03, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)
Date: November 14, 2018Order - Order Ruling Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees
Date: January 03, 2019DEFENDANT STARBUCKS CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: August 09, 2016PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION; ETC.
Date: August 16, 2016Complaint Filed by Jose Zepeda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-05-16T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Starbucks Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2016-07-07T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Statement of Facts Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Stipulation Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-07-13T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Starbucks Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by Jose Zepeda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-07-18T00:00:00Summons Filed by Jose Zepeda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-07-18T00:00:00Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Starbucks Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Notice Filed by Jose Zepeda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-12 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Points and Authorities Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-25 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-24 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-10-06T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-13T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00Document:Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-09T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Document:Reply to Opposition Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-16T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-11T00:00:00Document:Ntc and Acknowledgement of Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-15T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-18T00:00:00Document:Second Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-16T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Document:Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-18T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-07-07T00:00:00Document:Statement of Facts Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Document:Notice of Lodging Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-09-27T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Document:Stipulation Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-07-13T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-07-13T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Document:Memorandum of Costs Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-25T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-16T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Document:Partial Judgment (not entire case) Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Document:Jury Question Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Objection to Evidence in support of Defendant's opposition; Filed by: Starbucks Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Document:Verdict Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Document:Jury Question Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Declaration of Tracey A. Kennedy in support of Opposition; Filed by:
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Document:Memorandum of Costs Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Starbucks Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Document:Stipulation Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Opposition re Plaintiff's Mtn. for Atty's. fees; Filed by: Starbucks Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Continued Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys Fees; Filed by: Jose Zepeda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Reply to Deft's. Opp. to Plaintiff's Motion for Atty. fees; Filed by: Jose Zepeda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Continuance; Filed by: Jose Zepeda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-01 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Jury Question Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-07 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint Filed by Jose Zepeda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-08-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-19 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Order Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-10-06T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Jose Zepeda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-08-11T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Objection (to Evidence in support of Defendant's opposition) Filed by Starbucks Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Notice (of continuance) Filed by Jose Zepeda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Stipulation Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Declaration (of Tracey A. Kennedy in support of Opposition) Filed by Starbucks Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Reply (to Deft's. Opp. to Plaintiff's Motion for Atty. fees) Filed by Jose Zepeda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys Fees) Filed by Jose Zepeda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Jose Zepeda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Starbucks Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Filed by Jose Zepeda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Starbucks Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Jose Zepeda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Starbucks Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs Filed by Jose Zepeda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Opposition (re Plaintiff's Mtn. for Atty's. fees) Filed by Starbucks Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-25 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Jose Zepeda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Points and Authorities Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-19 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-27 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance of Default on Appeal Filed by Clerk
Date: April 29, 2019Notice of Default Filed by Clerk
Date: March 29, 2019Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed Filed by Starbucks Corporation (Appellant)
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Jury Question Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Order (Ruling Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ruling on Submitted Matter: Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2016-05-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-07-07T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-07-18T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-08-09T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2016-07-13T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-07-18T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-07-13T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2016-08-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-10-06T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2016-08-16T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-09-27T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-08-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-06 00:00:00
Date: 2016-12-06T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Jose Zepeda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-08-15T00:00:00Answer Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-09-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Jose Zepeda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-11-28T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Notice Filed by Jose Zepeda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by Starbucks Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2016-08-09T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-12-06 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-12-06T00:00:00Motion in Limine Filed by Jose Zepeda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-06-28T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Starbucks Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Reply to Opposition Filed by Pam JUDGMENT Michno (Defendant); Joelean JUDGMENT Perras (Defendant)
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Reply to Opposition Filed by Starbucks Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-21 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-20 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Brief Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-11 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Jose Zepeda (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-12-05T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Court
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Notice of Lodging Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-10-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-23 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-27 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00General Verdict Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-26 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-08-11T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-11 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-19 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-12 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Partial Judgment (not entire case)
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2017-10-25T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2017-10-31T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-01 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-07 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-05 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2017-12-05T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-17 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-18 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-24 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-25T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Jury Question
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Jury Question
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00General Verdict
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2018-05-04T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-27T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2018-07-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys Fees)
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-25 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Opposition to Plaintiff Jose Zepeda's Motion for Attorney's Fees
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-26T00:00:00Reply (to Deft's. Opp. to Plaintiff's Motion for Atty. fees)
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-09-24T00:00:00Opposition (re Plaintiff's Mtn. for Atty's. fees)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Declaration (of Tracey A. Kennedy in support of Opposition)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Objection (to Plaintiff's reply to Deft's. opp. to Motion for atty's fees?)
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Objection (to Evidence in support of Defendant's opposition)
Date: 2018-10-05T00:00:00Notice (of Further Continued Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys Fees)
Date: 2018-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees))
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees))
Date: 2018-12-03T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: 2018-11-21T00:00:00Order (Ruling Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees)
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
Date: 2019-02-25T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-11-14T00:00:00Notice (of continuance)
Date: 2018-11-01T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ruling on Submitted Matter: Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's...))
Date: 2019-01-03T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
Date: 2019-02-28T00:00:00Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance of Default on Appeal
Date: April 29, 2019Notice of Default
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.