Case Last Refreshed: 15 hours ago
Andrew Yen, Ball, James, Blanco, Kaitlin, James Ball, Kaitlin Blanco, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Ethan L. Silverstein, against 1428 Jackson Strret Associates, Lp, 553 Sycamore Street Associates, Lp, Conservice, Llc, Fpi Management, Inc., Mosser, Neveo, (total of 12) See All represented by Abraham Aleem Tabaie, George A. Guthrie, Guthrie, George A., Jeffrey Michael Vucinich, John M. Neukom, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts Superior Court of Alameda County with Brad Seligman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrad Seligman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 25, 2021 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of Alameda County |
Demurrer to Complaint Filed by Neveo Mosser, The Mosser Companies, INc. , 553 Sycamore Street Associ
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Order Extending Time for Yardi and Yes Energy Management Defendants to Respond Filed
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Order to Extend Defendants Neveo Mosser, Mosser Companies, Inc., 553 Sycamore St. Associates, LP, 14
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Order to Extend Defendants Oak 9 Portfolio Owner, LP and Pach Affordable Holdings, LLC's Time to Res
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Granted
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint Filed by Conservice, LLC
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint Filed by FPI Management, Inc.
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Time To Respond To The First Amended Complaint
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Yes Energy Management, Inc. Filed
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Yardi Systems, Inc. Filed
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Pach Affordable Holdings, LLC Filed
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Oak 1428 Jackson, LLC Filed
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Oak 1425 Harrison Street Property, LLC Filed
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Oak-553 Sycamore, LLC Filed
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Oak 406 Van Buren Ave. Property, LLC Filed
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Oak9 Portfolio Owner, LP Filed
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to FPI Management, Inc. Filed
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Conservice, LLC Filed
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to 1428 Jackson Strret Associates, LP Filed
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to 553 Sycamore Street Associates, LP Filed
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to The Mosser Companies, INc. Filed
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Neveo Mosser Filed
Date: 2021-09-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for Yes Energy Management,
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for Oak9 Portfolio Owner,
Date: 2021-08-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for Yardi Systems, Inc. ,
Date: 2021-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Motion Dropped
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Oak9 Portfolio Owner, LP, Pach Affordable Holdings, LLC Filed
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement of Andrew Yen Filed
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Complaint Other Real Property - Motion Rescheduled
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Related Case(s) Filed
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Case Management Conference 07/27/2021 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Andrew Yen
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Complaint Other Real Property Filed (Amended)
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: October 04, 2022Case Management Statement Joint Filed by: Andrew Yen (Plaintiff)
Date: September 27, 2022Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: July 27, 2022Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: July 27, 2022Case Management Statement Filed by: Andrew Yen (Plaintiff)
Date: July 20, 2022Updated -- Stephen Alter Scott (Attorney):Middle Name changed from A. to Alter
Date: 2022-06-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by: FPI Management, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: June 16, 2022Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Oak9 Portfolio Owner, LP (Defendant)
Date: June 16, 2022Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: May 24, 2022Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: May 24, 2022Case Management Statement Filed by: Andrew Yen (Plaintiff)
Date: May 17, 2022Case Management Statement Filed by: Conservice, LLC (Defendant)
Date: May 12, 2022Case Management Statement Filed by: FPI Management, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: May 09, 2022Amended Complaint (3rd) Filed by: Melina Tessier (Plaintiff) As to: Neveo Mosser (Defendant)
Date: 2022-05-06T00:00:00Order re: Ruling on Submitted Matter Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 22, 2022Order re: Ruling on Submitted Matter Entered by: Clerk
Date: April 22, 2022Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 12, 2022Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: April 12, 2022Order re: Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: April 12, 2022Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)
Date: April 12, 2022Order re: Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 22, 2022Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike)
Date: March 22, 2022Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: March 22, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by: Andrew Yen (Plaintiff)
Date: February 25, 2022Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: January 06, 2022Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: January 06, 2022Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: December 14, 2021Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: December 14, 2021Summons on Amended Complaint (2nd) Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00Order re: Ruling on Submitted Matter Entered by: Clerk
Date: November 05, 2021Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Hearing on De...)
Date: October 22, 2021Order re: Ruling on Submitted Matter Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 05, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed by: FPI Management, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: October 15, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 08, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Filed
Date: October 08, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 05, 2021Proposed Order
Date: October 05, 2021Demurrer to Complaint Hearing Confirmed for 10/22/2021 10:01 AM D- 21
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00Declaration in Support
Date: October 05, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: October 05, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: October 05, 2021Order Extending Time for Yardi and Yes Energy Management Defendants to Respond Filed
Date: September 28, 2021Order to Extend Defendants Oak 9 Portfolio Owner, LP and Pach Affordable Holdings, LLC's Time to Res
Date: September 23, 2021Motion to Strike Complaint Reservation Set for dept: 21 date: 10/22/2021 time: 10:01 AM
Date: 2021-10-04T00:00:00Order to Extend Defendants Neveo Mosser, Mosser Companies, Inc., 553 Sycamore St. Associates, LP, 14
Date: September 23, 2021Order Extending Time for Yardi and Yes Energy Management Defendants to Respond Filed
Date: September 23, 2021Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Granted
Date: September 23, 2021Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted
Date: September 23, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 23, 2021Proof of Service on Motion
Date: September 23, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 23, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: September 23, 2021Proposed Order
Date: September 23, 2021Demurrer to Complaint Hearing Confirmed for 10/22/2021 10:01 AM D- 21
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Demurrer to Complaint Filed by Pach Affordable Holdings, LLC, Oak9 Portfolio Owner, LP
Date: September 23, 2021Proof of Service on Motion
Date: September 22, 2021Proposed Order
Date: September 22, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 22, 2021Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint Hearing Confirmed for 10/22/2021 10:01 AM D- 21
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00Declaration in Support
Date: September 22, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 22, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: September 22, 2021Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint Filed by Conservice, LLC
Date: September 22, 2021Rejection Letter Issued on Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint
Date: September 17, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 13, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: September 13, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: September 13, 2021Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint Hearing Confirmed for 10/22/2021 10:00 AM D- 21
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint Filed by FPI Management, Inc.
Date: September 13, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 13, 2021Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Time To Respond To The First Amended Complaint
Date: September 13, 2021Proof of Service on Motion
Date: September 13, 2021Proposed Order
Date: September 13, 2021Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint Filed by Yes Energy Management, Inc., Yardi Systems, Inc.
Date: September 13, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Yes Energy Management, Inc. Filed
Date: September 09, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Yardi Systems, Inc. Filed
Date: September 09, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Pach Affordable Holdings, LLC Filed
Date: September 09, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Oak 1428 Jackson, LLC Filed
Date: September 09, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Oak 1425 Harrison Street Property, LLC Filed
Date: September 09, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Oak-553 Sycamore, LLC Filed
Date: September 09, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Oak 406 Van Buren Ave. Property, LLC Filed
Date: September 09, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Oak9 Portfolio Owner, LP Filed
Date: September 09, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to FPI Management, Inc. Filed
Date: September 09, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Conservice, LLC Filed
Date: September 09, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to 1428 Jackson Strret Associates, LP Filed
Date: September 09, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to 553 Sycamore Street Associates, LP Filed
Date: September 09, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to The Mosser Companies, INc. Filed
Date: September 09, 2021Proof of Service on Complaint As to Neveo Mosser Filed
Date: September 09, 2021Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Filed for Yes Energy Management,
Date: September 03, 2021Exhibit Stipulation and Order|Proof od Service
Date: September 03, 2021Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued
Date: August 11, 2021Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: August 03, 2021Motion Dropped
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed
Date: July 27, 2021Case Management Conf Continuance 12/14/2021 10:00 AM D- 21
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: June 29, 2021Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed
Date: August 03, 2021TR - Motion Dropped
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued
Date: July 21, 2021Case Management Statement of Andrew Yen Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Hearing Continued to Complex Determination Hearing dept: 23 date: 08/03/2021 time: 03:00 PM
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Hearing Reset to Case Management Conference 07/27/2021 10:00 AM D- 21
Date: 2021-07-23T00:00:00Declaration of Service by Mail
Date: July 27, 2021Case Management Conference Order Issued
Date: July 27, 2021Complaint Other Real Property - Motion Rescheduled
Date: June 29, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 28, 2021Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Continued
Date: June 29, 2021First Amended Complaint Filed
Date: June 28, 2021Complex Determination Hearing 06/29/2021 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Related Case(s) Filed
Date: June 09, 2021Case Management Conference 07/27/2021 03:00 PM D- 23
Date: June 01, 2021Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: May 25, 2021Complex Designation Requested
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Andrew Yen
Date: May 25, 2021Complaint Other Real Property Filed (Amended)
Date: May 25, 2021Minute Order (Case Management Conference)
Date: March 22, 2022Case Management Statement Filed by: FPI Management, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: March 07, 2022Updated -- George A. Guthrie (Attorney):Name Suffix: blank
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Updated -- Robert Salinas (Attorney):Name Suffix: blankMiddle Name: blank
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Updated -- Anna S Mclean (Attorney):Name Suffix: blank
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Updated -- L Theodore Scheley, III - III (Attorney):Name Suffix changed from III to III - III
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Updated -- John M. Neukom (Attorney):Name Suffix: blank
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Updated -- Stephen A. Scott (Attorney):Name Suffix: blank
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk
Date: October 04, 2022Demurrer to Complaint Filed by Oak9 Portfolio Owner, LP, Pach Affordable Holdings, LLC
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Demurrer to the First Amended Complaint Filed by Yardi Systems, Inc. , Yes Energy Management, Inc.
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Granted
Date: 2021-09-23T00:00:00Complaint Other Real Property Filed
Date: 2021-05-25T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2025 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial RCD / Department 21 |
|
April 18, 2025 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference RCD / Department 21 |
|
March 10, 2025 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Re: Trial Readiness RCD / Department 21 |
|
August 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference RCD / Department 21 |
|
June 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference RCD / Department 21 |
|
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference RCD / Department 21 |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses filed by Kaitlin Blanco (Plaintiff); Melina Tessier (Plaintiff) RCD / Department 21 |
|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference RCD / Department 21 |
|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference RCD / Department 21 |
|
January 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference RCD / Department 21 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.