Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gaeta, Sandra, Sandra Gaeta, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Leifer, Deanna S., against Abraham Ayala, Ayala, Abraham, Jbbc, Inc., Jim Bailey, represented by Richardson, Lyne A, in the jurisdiction of Kern County. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts Superior with Clark, Thomas S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Thomas S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 15, 2021 |
Category15-Cv Other Employment - Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationKern County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Order to Show Cause
Date: June 16, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: December 13, 20212022 02 04 Gaeta Sep Stmt ISO MTC RFPs [MLG]
Date: February 04, 20222022 02 04 Gaeta MTC RFPs [MLG]
Date: February 04, 20222022 02 04 Gaeta OG Decl ISO MTC RFPs [MLG]
Date: February 04, 2022Gaeta Proposed MTC RFPs [final].doc
Date: February 04, 20222022 02 04 Gaeta POS re MTC RFPs [MLG]
Date: February 04, 2022Proposed Order Granting MTC SROGs [final].doc
Date: February 04, 20222022 02 04 Gaeta MTC SROGs [MLG]
Date: February 04, 20222022 02 04 Gaeta Sep Stmt ISO MTC SROGs [MLG]
Date: February 04, 20222022 02 04 Gaeta POS re MTC SROGs
Date: February 04, 20222022 02 04 Gaeta OG Decl ISO MTC SROGs [MLG]
Date: February 04, 202253872Defen013ed7
Date: February 24, 202253872Defen03be05
Date: February 24, 202253872Defen002243
Date: February 24, 202253872Defen026698
Date: February 24, 20222022 03 01 Gaeta Reply ISO MTC SROGs [MLG]
Date: March 01, 20222022 03 01 Gaeta Reply ISO MTC RFPs [MLG]
Date: March 01, 20222022 03 23 Gaeta Renewed MTC SROGs [MLG]
Date: March 23, 20222022 03 23 Gaeta OG Decl
Date: March 23, 20222022 03 23 Gaeta Proposed [MLG]
Date: March 23, 20222022 03 23 Gaeta POS
Date: March 23, 20222022 03 23 Gaeta Sep Stmt
Date: March 23, 20222022 03 24 Gaeta Pl's Amended Ntc
Date: March 24, 20222022 03 28 Gaeta
Date: March 28, 202257101Defen00d2ea
Date: May 03, 202257101Decla010728
Date: May 03, 202257101Defen02303b
Date: May 03, 2022Reply Renewed ISO MTC SROGs
Date: May 09, 202261303Propo015755
Date: August 02, 202261303Defen00e902
Date: August 02, 2022Ntc of Non Opp to Mtn to Bifurcate
Date: August 15, 202262451Joint00aab3
Date: August 24, 20222023 02 24 Gaeta Amendment to Compl
Date: February 25, 20232023 06 30 Gaeta Pls Req for Dismissal
Date: June 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023 06 30 Gaeta Pls Req for Dismissal | |
February 25, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023 02 24 Gaeta Amendment to Compl | |
September 26, 2022 | Hearing |
Jury Trial estimate 10 days Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
September 26, 2022 | Hearing |
Final Case Management Conference
Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial estimate 10 days Judge: Clark, Thomas S. |
|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | 62451Joint00aab3 | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Ntc of Non Opp to Mtn to Bifurcate | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | 61303Propo015755 | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | 61303Defen00e902 | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Reply Renewed ISO MTC SROGs |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.