Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Jason Penna, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Goldman Gruder & Woods Llc, against Angelo G. Tranquillo, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. As Nominee For Homebridge Financial Services, Inc., represented by Bendett & Mchugh Pc, Brock And Scott Pllc, Cotter Cotter & Mullins, in the jurisdiction of New Haven County, CT, . New Haven County, CT Superior Courts Superior with Theodore R. Tyma presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTheodore R. Tyma Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
CategoryP10 - Property - Partition |
Last RefreshedMarch 20, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNew Haven County, CT |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
MOTION TO QUASH
Date: May 25, 2022OFFER OF COMPROMISE
Date: August 29, 2022DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS
Date: June 17, 2022OBJECTION Objection to P's Motion for Order of Default
Date: July 21, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 4/25/2022 HON MATTHEW FRECHETTE
Date: April 25, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 7/25/2022 HON MATTHEW FRECHETTE
Date: July 25, 2022MOTION FOR DEFAULT FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH ORDER
Date: July 11, 2022NOTICE Notice of Filing Responses to P's Req. for Admissions
Date: May 27, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 5/25/2022 HON MATTHEW FRECHETTE
Date: May 25, 2022CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Order 5/25/2022 HON MATTHEW FRECHETTE
Date: May 25, 2022OBJECTION TO MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME Objection to #114 and #115
Date: April 14, 2022MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 3/1/2023 HON MATTHEW FRECHETTE
Date: February 28, 2023CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST
Date: December 09, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/9/2022 HON ARTHUR HILLER
Date: November 09, 2022REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE as to MERS Special Defense
Date: December 09, 2021NOTICE
Date: March 31, 2022OBJECTION to Defendant's Caseflow Request
Date: November 21, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 12/8/2022 HON MATTHEW FRECHETTE
Date: December 08, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 9/19/2022 HON ARTHUR HILLER
Date: September 19, 2022CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116)
Date: November 21, 2022REQUEST TO REVISE
Date: March 11, 2021MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 3/29/2021 HON THEODORE TYMA
Date: March 15, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/29/2021 HON THEODORE TYMA
Date: March 29, 2021MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 11/9/2022 HON ARTHUR HILLER
Date: November 09, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 5/9/2023 HON MATTHEW FRECHETTE
Date: May 09, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/1/2023 HON MATTHEW FRECHETTE
Date: March 01, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE OF REQUEST FOR ADMISSION PB 13-22
Date: March 31, 2022SUMMONS
Date: February 23, 2021REPLY TO SPECIAL DEFENSE AND ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM
Date: December 09, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER Revised Scheduling Order RESULT: Granted 12/8/2022 HON MATTHEW FRECHETTE
Date: December 07, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: November 21, 2022ORDER RESULT: Order 10/20/2022 HON ARTHUR HILLER
Date: October 20, 2022REVISED COMPLAINT
Date: March 16, 2021MOTION FOR ORDER OF COMPLIANCE – PB SEC 13-14 (INTERR/PROD – 13-6/13-9)
Date: February 13, 2024ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE
Date: November 23, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER RESULT: Order 8/6/2021 HON THEODORE TYMA
Date: August 03, 2021MOTION FOR DEFAULT-FAILURE TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 11/30/2021 BY THE CLERK
Date: November 23, 2021ORDER RESULT: Denied 11/21/2022 HON MATTHEW FRECHETTE
Date: November 21, 2022MOTION FOR DEFAULT FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH ORDER RESULT: Order 11/22/2022 HON ARTHUR HILLER
Date: September 22, 2022MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PB 13-5
Date: September 28, 2022ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE AND COUNTERCLAIM
Date: December 08, 2021ORDER RESULT: Order 11/22/2022 HON ARTHUR HILLER
Date: November 22, 2022DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS
Date: February 14, 2024APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: August 24, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER REVISED RESULT: Granted 2/3/2022 HON MATTHEW FRECHETTE
Date: February 01, 2022ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/30/2021 BY THE CLERK
Date: November 30, 2021CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116) RESULT: Granted 9/19/2022 HON ARTHUR HILLER
Date: September 12, 2022APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: March 05, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 2/3/2022 HON MATTHEW FRECHETTE
Date: February 03, 2022RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: February 23, 2021APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: March 15, 2021ORDER RESULT: Order 8/6/2021 HON THEODORE TYMA
Date: August 06, 2021MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 6/22/2023 HON MATTHEW FRECHETTE
Date: June 21, 2023CASEFLOW REQUEST (JD-CV-116)
Date: January 22, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: February 23, 2021ORDER RESULT: Granted 9/1/2023 HON THEODORE TYMA
Date: September 01, 2023SCHEDULING ORDER Revised Scheduling Order RESULT: Granted 9/1/2023 HON THEODORE TYMA
Date: August 31, 2023ORDER RESULT: Order 8/28/2023 HON JASON WELCH
Date: August 28, 2023ORDER RESULT: Granted 6/22/2023 HON MATTHEW FRECHETTE
Date: June 22, 2023ORDER RESULT: Sustained 3/4/2024 HON THEODORE TYMA
Date: March 04, 2024ORDER RESULT: Denied 3/4/2024 HON THEODORE TYMA
Date: March 04, 2024MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 5/9/2023 HON MATTHEW FRECHETTE
Date: May 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2024 | Trial | ||
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Sustained 3/4/2024 HON THEODORE TYMA | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Denied 3/4/2024 HON THEODORE TYMA | |
March 04, 2024 | Short Calendar SC-12 #025 | ||
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO MOTION Objection to Plaintiff's Motion for Default and Sanctions RESULT: Sustained 3/4/2024 HON THEODORE TYMA | |
February 28, 2024 | Trial | ||
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ORDER Motion for Order of Default and Sanctions RESULT: Denied 3/4/2024 HON THEODORE TYMA | |
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS | |
February 14, 2024 | Trial Management Conference | ||
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ORDER OF COMPLIANCE – PB SEC 13-14 (INTERR/PROD – 13-6/13-9) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.