Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ann Marie Nonkin, filed a(n) T90 - Torts - All Other case represented by Conti Levy Salerno & Antonio Llc, against Judy Peschel, Michael Peschel, Upcountry Services Of Sharon, represented by Cramer & Anderson, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts with John W. Pickard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn W. Pickard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2013 |
CategoryT90 - Torts - All Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
|
ORDER RESULT: Off 12/8/2014 HON JOHN DANAHER
Date: December 08, 2014DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS Amended Disclosure of Expert Witness Ned Towle
Date: May 14, 2015REVISED COMPLAINT Amended Revised Complaint
Date: November 04, 2014MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD RESULT: Granted 2/10/2014 HON JOHN PICKARD
Date: January 24, 2014MOTION FOR EXPERT TESTIMONY FEE Against Defendants Michael and Judy Peschel
Date: September 21, 2015REVISED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Revised Complaint
Date: June 06, 2014BRIEF Plaintiff's Post-Trial Brief
Date: May 25, 2016ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE of the Defendants Peschel
Date: April 23, 2014MOTION TO INSPECT Motion for Site Inspection by Trial Court
Date: April 08, 2016DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS Szymanski
Date: September 22, 2015SCHEDULING ORDER RESULT: Order 1/21/2015 HON JOHN PICKARD
Date: January 21, 2015DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS Richard Calkins at Northeast Consulting, LLC
Date: March 02, 2015OBJECTION TO INTERROGATORIES/PRODUCTION PB 13-8 and 13-10
Date: January 09, 2015REQUEST TO REVISE Amended Complaint of July 25, 2014
Date: October 21, 2014REVISED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Amended Revised Complaint
Date: July 25, 2014DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS John Morgan of Timberworks Building Company
Date: March 02, 2015COMPLAINT
Date: December 26, 2013DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS Mark Fenn of Connecticut Building Company
Date: May 13, 2015OBJECTION TO REQUEST TO USE DEPOSITION OF WITNESS JOHN BURKHART AT TRIAL #162.00
Date: March 07, 2016ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE to Amended Revised Complaint
Date: November 07, 2014ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE TO REVISED COMPLAINT
Date: July 08, 2014REQUEST Plaintiff's Request to Use the Deposition of Witness John Burkhart at Trial
Date: March 04, 2016MOTION FOR ORDER OF COMPLIANCE – PB SEC 13-14 (INTERR/PROD – 13-6/13-9) Defendant UpCountry
Date: February 03, 2015MOTION IN LIMINE Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Preclude Testimony
Date: April 05, 2016OBJECTION TO INTERROGATORIES/PRODUCTION PB 13-8 and 13-10
Date: July 03, 2014MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME RESULT: Granted 5/19/2014 HON JOHN PICKARD
Date: May 02, 2014MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD
Date: February 10, 2014ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/8/2015 HON JOHN PICKARD
Date: October 08, 2015MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE For the Joint Trial Management Conference
Date: October 08, 2015NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Supplemental Compliance #2
Date: September 08, 2015NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Supplemental Compliance
Date: September 04, 2015MOTION FOR EXPERT TESTIMONY FEE Against Defendant Peschel
Date: August 19, 2015WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION Motion for Expert Testimony Fee Entry No. 145.00
Date: August 19, 2015ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/18/2015 HON JOHN PICKARD
Date: March 18, 2015MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE For the TMC
Date: March 17, 2015MOTION FOR EXPERT TESTIMONY FEE and to Compel Discovery
Date: August 12, 2015ORDER RESULT: Order 5/4/2015 HON JOHN DANAHER
Date: May 04, 2015MOTION TO MODIFY - GENERAL Re Scheduling Order of 1/21/15
Date: April 21, 2015ORDER RESULT: Granted 3/26/2015 HON JOHN PICKARD
Date: March 26, 2015MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE For the Trial Management Conference
Date: March 26, 2015NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE with Pltf. discovery requests to Def. Peschel
Date: March 04, 2015DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS Ned Towle of Director of Westchester Wine School
Date: March 02, 2015MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE of January 15 status conference
Date: January 08, 2015AFFIDAVIT OF ATTEMPT TO RESOLVE DISCOVERY OBJECTION Defendant UpCountry
Date: October 16, 2014ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/8/2015 HON JOHN PICKARD
Date: January 08, 2015CERTIFICATE OF CLOSED PLEADINGS AND CLAIM FOR TRIAL LIST
Date: December 05, 2014AFFIDAVIT OF ATTEMPT TO RESOLVE DISCOVERY OBJECTION Defendant Peschel
Date: October 16, 2014ANSWER AND SPECIAL DEFENSE TO REVISED COMPLAINT DATED 6-6-14 (UpCountry)
Date: July 11, 2014OBJECTION TO INTERROGATORIES/PRODUCTION PB 13-8 and 13-10
Date: July 08, 2014ORDER RESULT: Order 12/8/2014 HON JOHN DANAHER
Date: December 08, 2014AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: May 07, 2014REQUEST TO REVISE (UPCountry)
Date: April 28, 2014MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD (CORRECTED) RESULT: Granted 2/24/2014 HON JOHN PICKARD
Date: February 10, 2014WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION #102 (error in certification)
Date: February 10, 2014APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: January 23, 2014APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: January 15, 2014RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 26, 2013SUMMONS
Date: December 26, 2013BRIEF DEFENDANTS' POST TRIAL BRIEF
Date: May 25, 2016MEMORANDUM OF DECISION
Date: August 23, 2016LIST OF EXHIBITS (JD-CL-28/JD-CL-28a)
Date: April 22, 2016NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Plaintiff's Supplemental Discovery
Date: March 16, 2016TRIAL MANAGEMENT REPORT Amended Joint Trial Management Report
Date: March 29, 2016MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE RESULT: Granted 2/5/2016 HON JOHN PICKARD
Date: February 04, 2016ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/5/2015 HON JOHN PICKARD
Date: November 05, 2015MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE For the Trial scheduled on November 10, 2015
Date: November 05, 2015REQUEST TO BRING AUDIO/VISUAL EQUIPMENT INTO THE COURTHOUSE (JD-CL-90) Plaintiff's Request
Date: November 04, 2015ORDER RESULT: Granted 11/4/2015 HON JOHN PICKARD
Date: November 04, 2015TRIAL MANAGEMENT REPORT Joint Trial Management Report for November 5, 2015
Date: November 03, 2015AFFIDAVIT OF ATTEMPT TO RESOLVE DISCOVERY OBJECTION
Date: October 28, 2015REQUEST TO AMEND AND AMENDMENT re Answer and Special Defenses dated Nov. 7 2014 #128.00
Date: October 28, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2016 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF DECISION | |
August 23, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT AFTER COMPLETED TRIAL TO THE COURT FOR THE DEFENDANT(S) RESULT: HON JOHN PICKARD | |
May 25, 2016 | Docket Event | BRIEF Plaintiff's Post-Trial Brief | |
May 25, 2016 | Docket Event | BRIEF DEFENDANTS' POST TRIAL BRIEF | |
April 22, 2016 | Docket Event | LIST OF EXHIBITS (JD-CL-28/JD-CL-28a) | |
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION TO INSPECT Motion for Site Inspection by Trial Court | |
April 05, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION IN LIMINE Plaintiff's Motion in Limine to Preclude Testimony | |
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event | TRIAL MANAGEMENT REPORT Amended Joint Trial Management Report | |
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Plaintiff's Supplemental Discovery | |
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST Amended Plaintiff's Request to Use the Deposition of Witness John Burkhart at Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.