Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Onewest Bank, National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Mccalla Raymer Leibert Pierce Llc, against Dorothy M Shelton The Widower, Heirs And Or Creditors Of The Estate Of, Secretary Of Housing Urban Development, State Of Connecticut, Department Of Revenue Services, in the jurisdiction of Litchfield County, CT, . Litchfield County, CT Superior Courts with John D. Moore presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn D. Moore Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2013 |
CategoryP00 - Property - Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLitchfield County, CT |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ORDER RESULT: Granted 7/14/2014 HON JOHN DANAHER
Date: July 14, 2014MOTION FOR JUDGMENT-STRICT FORECLOSURE
Date: July 23, 2014MOTION FOR FINDING FURTHER NOTICE UNNECESSARY PB 9-1
Date: June 02, 2014ORDER RESULT: Order 1/23/2015 HON JOHN DANAHER
Date: January 23, 2015COMPLAINT
Date: December 19, 2013ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/4/2014 HON JOHN DANAHER
Date: August 04, 2014ORDER RESULT: Granted 8/1/2014 BY THE CLERK-ADMIN ACTION
Date: August 01, 2014ORDER RESULT: Denied 6/10/2014 HON JOHN PICKARD
Date: June 10, 2014ORDER Judgment of Foreclosure By Sale RESULT: Granted 9/2/2014 HON JOHN PICKARD
Date: September 02, 2014ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/1/2014 BY THE CLERK
Date: October 01, 2014ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/11/2016 HON JOHN MOORE
Date: January 11, 2016MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLANTIFF WITH APPEARANCE
Date: June 02, 2014MOTION TO OPEN JUDGMENT
Date: December 30, 2015MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20
Date: July 23, 2014MOTION FOR DEFAULT -FAILURE TO APPEAR PB 17-20
Date: June 02, 2014BILL OF COSTS FILED FOR TAXATION BY CLERK - PB SEC 18-5
Date: September 09, 2014OATH OF APPRAISERS
Date: December 03, 2014NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED
Date: September 09, 2014NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: September 09, 2014AFFIDAVIT OF DEBT
Date: August 28, 2014AFFIDAVIT RE: ATTORNEY/COUNSEL FEES
Date: August 28, 2014AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH EMAP
Date: August 28, 2014FORECLOSURE WORKSHEET JD-CV-77
Date: August 28, 2014COMMITTEE DEED
Date: January 23, 2015APPRAISAL
Date: July 23, 2014OATH OF APPRAISERS
Date: July 23, 2014AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: June 02, 2014AFFIDAVIT FEDERAL LOSS MITIGATION PROGRAMS (JD-CL-114)
Date: December 20, 2013RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 19, 2013APPEARANCE Appearance
Date: October 31, 2014SUMMONS
Date: December 19, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 1/11/2016 HON JOHN MOORE | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION TO OPEN JUDGMENT | |
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Order 1/23/2015 HON JOHN DANAHER | |
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event | COMMITTEE DEED | |
January 02, 2015 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF COMMITTEE SALE/DEED/REPORT/FEES AND EXPENSES/APPRAISER’S FEES JD-CV-99 | |
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event | OATH OF APPRAISERS | |
October 31, 2014 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE Appearance | |
October 01, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER RESULT: Granted 10/1/2014 BY THE CLERK | |
September 09, 2014 | Docket Event | BILL OF COSTS FILED FOR TAXATION BY CLERK - PB SEC 18-5 | |
September 09, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT – CERTIFIED/SERVED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.