Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Ana Maria Tejada Rubio, filed a(n) Wages case represented by Brian Robert Reynolds, against Z Axis Tech Solutions Inc, represented by N A, in the jurisdiction of Boulder County, CO, . Boulder County, CO Superior Courts with Andrew Hartman presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 08, 2017 |
CategoryWages |
Last RefreshedJuly 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBoulder County, CO |
|
Order(Related Document)
Date: November 09, 2017Subpoena(Related Document)
Date: October 06, 2017Proposed Order
Date: October 05, 2017Order
Date: July 26, 2017Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: July 25, 2017Return of Service
Date: October 10, 2017Subpoena
Date: October 10, 2017Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document)
Date: October 06, 2017Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: July 25, 2017Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: August 02, 2017Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: June 08, 2017Motion(Related Document)
Date: August 02, 2017Certificate
Date: October 10, 2017Summons
Date: August 28, 2017Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document)
Date: August 04, 2017Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: October 10, 2017Letter
Date: August 28, 2017Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document)
Date: August 04, 2017Proposed Order(Related Document)
Date: August 04, 2017Return of Service(Related Document)
Date: October 06, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: June 08, 2017Motion for Default Judgment(Related Document)
Date: August 04, 2017Return of Service
Date: July 05, 2017Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document)
Date: August 02, 2017Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: August 02, 2017Proposed Order
Date: August 02, 2017Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: June 08, 2017Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document)
Date: August 02, 2017Order(Related Document)
Date: August 04, 2017Request
Date: July 25, 2017Bill of Costs
Date: August 02, 2017Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: June 08, 2017Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: July 25, 2017Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: August 02, 2017Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document)
Date: August 02, 2017Complaint w/Jury Demand
Date: June 08, 2017Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: June 08, 2017Proposed Order
Date: July 25, 2017Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: August 02, 2017Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: August 02, 2017Bill of Costs(Related Document)
Date: August 04, 2017Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document)
Date: August 04, 2017Motion for Default Judgment(Related Document)
Date: August 02, 2017Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc
Date: October 05, 2017Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document)
Date: August 04, 2017Motion(Related Document)
Date: October 05, 2017Certificate(Related Document)
Date: October 06, 2017Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document)
Date: August 04, 2017Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document)
Date: August 04, 2017Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document)
Date: August 04, 2017Order
Date: August 29, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order(Related Document) Order: MOTION FOR TURNOVER ORDER PURSUANT TO C.R.C.P. 69(g) |
|
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Return of Service AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RE SUBPOENA |
|
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM - CISCO SYSTEMS, INC. | |
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc EXHIBIT 1 - MAILING ENVELOPE |
|
October 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Subpoena(Related Document) SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM - BANK OF AMERICA |
|
October 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Exhibit - Attach to Pleading/Doc(Related Document) EXHIBIT 1 - MAILING ENVELOPE |
|
October 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Return of Service(Related Document) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM - BANK OF AMERICA |
|
October 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certificate(Related Document) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM - BANK OF AMERICA |
|
October 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ORDER RE MOTION FOR TURNOVER ORDER PURSUANT TO C.R.C.P. 69(g) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.