Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bar Id filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Tarrant County, TX, . Tarrant County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 21, 2019 |
CategoryDivorce |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTarrant County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
ORDER ON PTNR'S MOTION CONTINUANCE (PROPOSED)
Date: August 19, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING - 8/22/19 @9AM
Date: August 16, 2019PTNR'S MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: August 19, 2019ASSOC JUDGE'S REPORT
Date: August 21, 2019ORDER RESETTING HEARING-9/18/19 @1:30PM
Date: September 09, 2019AMENDED ASSOC JUDGE'S REPORT
Date: August 21, 2019PRE-TRIAL CONTROL SCHEDULING ORD-10/19/20 @9:30AM
Date: September 09, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING (9/9/19 @ 9:30 AM)
Date: September 04, 2019AGREED ORDER OF REFERRAL FOR MEDIATION
Date: September 09, 2019NOT OF HRG ON RESP'S MTN FOR PRE-TRIAL CONF(9/9/19@ 9:30 AM)
Date: August 28, 2019(PROPOSED) TRO AND ORD SET HRG FOR TEMP ORD
Date: March 21, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING (9/9/19 @ 9:30 AM)
Date: August 28, 2019T.R.O.-ISSUED ON DAVID A. HALLUM. H/R 04/03/2019 - 09:00-On 03/22/2019
Date: March 22, 2019ORIGINAL COUNTERPETITION FOR DIVORCE
Date: April 02, 2019RESP'S ORIGINAL ANSWER
Date: April 02, 2019ORIGINAL PETITION FOR DIVORCE
Date: March 21, 2019ORD ON MOT FOR W/D OF COUNSEL
Date: June 06, 2019Citation-ISSUED ON DAVID A. HALLUM-On 03/22/2019
Date: March 21, 2019(PROPOSED) ORDER ON MOT FOR W/DRAWAL OF COUNSEL
Date: June 03, 2019AGREED MOT TO MOD TEMP ORD(S)
Date: June 18, 2019(PROPOSED) AGREED ORD ON MOT TO MOD TEMP ORD(S)
Date: June 18, 2019CONFIRMATION LETTER 4/24/19 @ 1:30PM *CL
Date: April 02, 2019PTNR'S MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: November 14, 2019ASSOCIATE JUDGE'S REPORT CUT OFF "HOUSE"
Date: December 02, 2019TRO/ORD SET HRG FOR TEMP ORD 4/3/19 9AM
Date: March 22, 2019APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL - ATTY BONILLA
Date: June 18, 2019AGREED TEMP MUTUAL INJ - 4/24/2019 @ 1:30PM
Date: April 08, 2019REQ FOR DE NOVO HRG
Date: April 26, 2019A/J'S REPORT PAGE 2 BY THE SIGNATURE READS "AGREED"
Date: April 24, 2019PTNR'S MOTION EXTEND DEADLINE FOR MEDIATION
Date: October 28, 2019ASSOCIATE JUDGE'S REPORT
Date: September 18, 2019(ATTACHED) PRE-TRIAL DOCKET CONTROL SCHED ORDER
Date: December 23, 2019AGREED MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: December 23, 2019ORDER ON AGREED MOTION W/D (PROPOSED)
Date: December 30, 2019AFFIDAVIT NANCY BONILLA CONCERN ATTY FEES(ATTACHED
Date: November 14, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING -12/2/19 @ 9AM
Date: November 18, 2019ORDER ON MOTION FOR SUB OF COUNSEL- ATTY PARMER
Date: January 02, 2020NOTICE INTENT TAKE DEPO WRIT QUESTIONS/SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM
Date: March 04, 2020AGREED ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE- 10/4/21 @9:30AM
Date: September 16, 2020AGREED ORDER OF REFERRAL FOR MEDIATION
Date: September 21, 2020MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT-SUSPENDED/CL
Date: February 11, 2020NOTICE OF BUSINESS RECORDS AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 04, 2020REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL /CL
Date: April 06, 2020PTNR'S CERT OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: February 06, 2020NOTICE OF BUSINESS RECORDS AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 12, 2020MOTION TO STRIKE EVIDENTIART FACTS FROM PLEADINGS
Date: November 13, 2020PETITIONER'S CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: April 14, 2020NOT OF HRG ON RESP'S MTN TO DENY REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL- 6/3/20 @9AM
Date: May 18, 2020PRE-TRIAL CONTROL SCHEDULING ORD -10/4/21 @ 9:30AM
Date: September 21, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE- ATTY WILSON
Date: October 09, 2020INVENTORY/APPRAISEMENT OF DAVID HALLUM
Date: December 09, 2019FIRST AMENDED RESP'S CERT WRIT DISC DIRECTED PTNR
Date: August 19, 2019MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: September 15, 2020MOTION TO COMPEL DISC/FOR SANCTIONS
Date: November 19, 2019NOTICE OF HRG (PROPOSED)
Date: November 14, 2019RESP'S CERT OF WRITTEN DISC RESPONSES
Date: September 16, 2019(PROPOSED)AGREED ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: September 15, 2020RESPONSE TO MOTION DENY JURY TRIAL/REQUEST STRIKE NONJURY SETTING
Date: June 03, 2020MOTION FOR SUB OF COUNSEL-E PARMER
Date: December 31, 2019MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Date: November 14, 2019NOT OF HRG RESP'S MTN TO COMPEL DISC- 12/2/19 @9AM
Date: November 19, 2019MOTION EQUALIZE ATTY FEES
Date: August 15, 2019RULE 11 AGREEMENT/CL
Date: January 06, 2020RULE 11 FOR COUNSELING /CL
Date: May 07, 2020(PROPOSED)NOH RESP'S MOT REQUEST JURY TRIAL
Date: April 08, 2020RESP'S CERT OF WRITTEN DISC DIRECTED TO PTNR
Date: August 16, 20191ST AMENDED INVENTORY & APPRAISEMENT DAVID HALLUM
Date: February 06, 2020RESP'S MOTION ADDITIONAL TEMP ORDERS/REQUEST EXPEDITED HRG
Date: August 16, 2019(PROP) AGREED TEMPORARY MUTUAL INJUNCTION
Date: April 08, 2019MOTION TO COMPEL TURNOVER PROPERTY
Date: August 15, 2019MOTION FOR W/DRAWAL OF COUNSEL
Date: June 03, 2019MOTION FOR PRETRIAL CONF
Date: August 15, 2019(PROPOSED)ORD RESP'S MOT DENY REQUEST JURY TRIAL
Date: April 08, 2020NOTICE OF HRG (PROPOSED)
Date: August 15, 2019MOTION TO DENY REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: April 08, 2020RULE 11 AGREEMENT/CL
Date: February 11, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO STRIKE EVIDENTIART FACTS FROM PLEADINGS | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF BUSINESS RECORDS AFFIDAVIT | |
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE- ATTY WILSON | |
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER OF REFERRAL FOR MEDIATION | |
September 21, 2020 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL CONTROL SCHEDULING ORD -10/4/21 @ 9:30AM | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE- 10/4/21 @9:30AM | |
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE | |
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event | (PROPOSED)AGREED ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE | |
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO MOTION DENY JURY TRIAL/REQUEST STRIKE NONJURY SETTING | |
May 18, 2020 | Docket Event | NOT OF HRG ON RESP'S MTN TO DENY REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL- 6/3/20 @9AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.