Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Dfps, filed a(n) Child Protection - Family case against Cornett, Christopher, James, Britney, represented by Alicia Barkley, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Clark, Carole W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Carole W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2015 |
CategoryChild Protective Services |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Protection |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Motion
Date: August 04, 2017Order of Dismissal
Date: February 08, 2018Order
Date: April 20, 2017Order of Termination
Date: October 24, 2017Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem
Date: October 24, 2017Scheduling Order
Date: October 05, 2017Order
Date: July 28, 2016Motion
Date: September 28, 2017Order
Date: September 28, 2017Scheduling Order
Date: September 18, 2017Rule 11 Agreement
Date: August 24, 2017Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem
Date: August 18, 2017Order
Date: January 18, 2017Statutory Written Statement
Date: December 15, 2016Order
Date: August 30, 2016Order to Retain
Date: June 30, 2017Original Answer
Date: May 25, 2017Statutory Written Statement
Date: April 20, 2017Order
Date: December 15, 2016Court of Continuing Jurisdiction
Date: October 20, 2016Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem
Date: July 14, 2016Statutory Written Statement
Date: July 28, 2016Amended Motion
Date: July 07, 2016Order
Date: July 14, 2016Original Answer
Date: July 15, 2016Petition
Date: June 24, 2016Nunc Pro Tunc Order
Date: June 30, 2016Scheduling Order
Date: June 30, 2016Attorney Ad Litem's Original Answer
Date: June 27, 2016Scheduling Order
Date: June 24, 2016Motion/Order
Date: December 14, 2015Scheduling Order
Date: June 20, 2016Amended Motion
Date: May 12, 2016Order for Required Participation
Date: January 07, 2016Scheduling Order
Date: December 14, 2015Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 14, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
January 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Permanency Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Clark, Carole W)
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Permanency Report To the Court
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Clark, Carole W)
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
October 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order of Termination
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
October 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
October 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Clark, Carole W)
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.