Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Vaughan, Daniel & Karen, filed a(n) Modify - Custody case against Vaughn, Aaron, Vaughn, Lacy, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Clark, Carole W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Carole W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2012 |
CategoryModify - Custody |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeTerminate |
Order of Termination
Date: April 28, 2015Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Date: March 23, 2015Motion
Date: March 03, 2015Motion
Date: February 09, 2015Motion/Order
Date: February 09, 2015Answer
Date: February 09, 2015Motion/Order
Date: February 06, 2015Answer
Date: February 06, 2015Motion
Date: February 06, 2015Subpoena
Date: February 05, 2015Protective Order
Date: February 04, 2015Order of Nonsuit
Date: February 04, 2015Answer
Date: February 04, 2015Motion/Order
Date: February 04, 2015Amended Motion
Date: February 04, 2015Motion
Date: February 04, 2015Motion
Date: February 03, 2015Amended Motion
Date: January 30, 2015Petition
Date: January 28, 2015Original Answer
Date: January 26, 2015Order
Date: January 09, 2015Motion
Date: January 09, 2015Motion/Order
Date: January 07, 2015Motion
Date: December 10, 2014Request for Setting
Date: December 10, 2014Request
Date: December 09, 2014Scheduling Order
Date: November 17, 2014Order For Drug Testing
Date: October 07, 2014Answer
Date: October 07, 2014Appeal Opinion
Date: October 02, 2014Order
Date: September 30, 2014Scheduling Order
Date: September 19, 2014Appeal Judgment
Date: September 18, 2014Motion
Date: September 11, 2014RESPONSE
Date: August 13, 2014Motion
Date: August 11, 2014Letter
Date: August 11, 2014Letter
Date: July 07, 2014Scheduling Order
Date: June 24, 2014Letter
Date: June 11, 2014Letter
Date: May 23, 2014Amended Motion
Date: April 30, 2014Motion to Modify
Date: April 24, 2014Letter
Date: April 02, 2014Letter
Date: March 19, 2014Order to Withdraw as Counsel
Date: February 17, 2014Letter
Date: February 11, 2014Letter
Date: February 05, 2014Letter
Date: February 04, 2014Order to Withdraw as Counsel
Date: January 29, 2014Letter
Date: January 28, 2014Motion
Date: January 28, 2014Letter
Date: January 23, 2014Motion to Substitute Counsel
Date: January 21, 2014Order
Date: January 21, 2014Order For Drug Testing
Date: January 21, 2014Motion for Drug Testing
Date: January 21, 2014Order
Date: January 08, 2014Amended Petition
Date: January 02, 2014Order
Date: December 20, 2013Order of Nonsuit
Date: December 20, 2013Letter
Date: December 20, 2013Motion for Continuance
Date: December 20, 2013Order of Nonsuit
Date: December 19, 2013Order
Date: December 19, 2013Motion for Continuance
Date: December 19, 2013Amended Petition
Date: December 18, 2013Letter
Date: December 18, 2013Motion to Compel
Date: December 17, 2013Motion for Nonsuit
Date: December 17, 2013Motion
Date: December 12, 2013Letter
Date: December 12, 2013Letter
Date: December 11, 2013Motion to Compel
Date: December 10, 2013Objections
Date: December 05, 2013Letter
Date: November 22, 2013Letter
Date: November 08, 2013Motion to Modify
Date: November 07, 2013Motion
Date: October 24, 2013Letter
Date: October 24, 2013Order Substituting Counsel
Date: October 08, 2013Order To Pay Court Appointed Attorney
Date: October 04, 2013Motion to Substitute Counsel
Date: September 19, 2013Request
Date: September 18, 2013Order
Date: September 10, 2013Letter
Date: September 03, 2013Scheduling Order
Date: August 20, 2013Order
Date: August 15, 2013Order to Retain
Date: August 15, 2013Motion To Strike
Date: August 12, 2013Order
Date: July 18, 2013Original Answer
Date: July 18, 2013Petition
Date: July 18, 2013Order To Pay Court Appointed Attorney
Date: July 18, 2013Agreed Order
Date: July 11, 2013Motion to Retain Case on Docket
Date: July 09, 2013Statutory Written Statement
Date: June 27, 2013Order Dismissing Attorney
Date: June 28, 2013Order To Pay Court Appointed Attorney
Date: June 28, 2013Order To Pay Court Appointed Attorney
Date: June 26, 2013Letter
Date: June 24, 2013Order To Pay Court Appointed Attorney
Date: June 18, 2013Request
Date: May 16, 2013Request for Setting
Date: April 11, 2013Original Answer
Date: March 04, 2013Letter
Date: March 04, 2013Order To Pay Court Appointed Attorney
Date: February 21, 2013Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem
Date: February 21, 2013Original Answer
Date: February 21, 2013Statutory Written Statement
Date: February 14, 2013Letter
Date: January 14, 2013Order To Pay Court Appointed Attorney
Date: December 20, 2012Statutory Written Statement
Date: December 20, 2012Order
Date: December 20, 2012Ex Parte Order for Chemical Dependency Evaluation
Date: December 06, 2012Order To Pay Court Appointed Attorney
Date: December 03, 2012Order
Date: December 06, 2012Statutory Written Statement
Date: November 29, 2012Order To Pay Court Appointed Attorney
Date: November 08, 2012Court of Continuing Jurisdiction
Date: October 23, 2012Motion/Order
Date: September 27, 2012Scheduling Order
Date: September 27, 2012Statutory Written Statement
Date: September 27, 2012Ex Parte Order for Chemical Dependency Evaluation
Date: September 27, 2012Agreed Order
Date: September 20, 2012Statutory Written Statement
Date: September 06, 2012Order To Pay Court Appointed Attorney
Date: September 06, 2012Original Petition (OCA)
Date: August 24, 2012Motion
Date: December 14, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Vaughan-Motion to Unseal Court Records Motion Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
June 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Exhibit List
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
April 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order of Termination
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dimiss for Want of Prosecution Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Charge Of The Court
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
March 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Certificate
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
scan.Motion for Directed Verdict Motion Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Clark, Carole W)
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Trial (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Clark, Carole W)
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.