Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Action Premier Hauling Inc, Coleman, Kelly, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Wolfe, Robert C. E., against Board Of Trustees Of The Pines Condominium Association Inc, Cummings, Robert, Nassar, Emile, Coleman, Kelly, Creative Management Company, (total of 10) See All represented by Godkin, Gregory Bryan, Goldstein, Allen D., Hartmann, Kelly Clinton, Katine, Mitchell, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 157th with TANYA GARRISON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTANYA GARRISON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 05, 2017 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
|
Filing Court House157th |
Action Premier Hauling Inc.s Petition in Intervention
Date: October 09, 2017The Pines Condominiums Original Answer and Counterclaim
Date: October 11, 2017Robert Cumming's Original Answer
Date: October 12, 2017Emile Nassar's Original Answer
Date: October 12, 2017DOCKET CONTROL ORDER
Date: October 26, 2017Action Premier Hauling Inc's First Amended Petition in Intervention
Date: November 14, 2017Proposed Order Granting Protective Order to Trial Second Non-Party Subpoena
Date: October 19, 2017Agreed Joint Motion for Continuance of Trial Setting
Date: April 05, 2018Proposed Order to Remove M&M Lien
Date: December 20, 2017Proposed Agreed Order Granting Continuance of Trial Setting
Date: April 05, 2018Proposed Order Granting Chamberlain, Hrdlicka, White, Williams & Aughtry's Motion to Withdraw
Date: December 13, 2017Proposed Order
Date: January 11, 2018Rule 11 Agreement on Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: April 06, 2018Proposed Order
Date: April 05, 2018Action Premier Hauling Inc's Second Amended Petition in Intervention
Date: December 13, 2017Chamberlain, Hrdlicka, White, Williams & Aughtry's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record
Date: December 13, 2017ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY SIGNED
Date: January 16, 2018Proposed Order on Plaintiffs' Motion For Summary Judgment
Date: April 13, 2018Defendant's Emergency Motion for Continaunce of Trial Setting
Date: September 25, 2018DOCKET CONTROL ORDER
Date: May 01, 2018ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED
Date: June 19, 2018Motion for Continuance
Date: August 30, 2018Proposed Order Granting Nonsuit
Date: June 13, 2018Proposed Order Granting Continuance of Trial Setting
Date: September 25, 2018Proposed Order on Motion for Continuance
Date: August 30, 2018Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record
Date: September 26, 2018Proposed Order
Date: September 26, 2018The Pines Condominium's Original Answer to Petition in Intervention
Date: August 30, 2018Intervenor's Motion to Compel
Date: June 18, 2018ORDER SIGNED DENYING PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 18, 2018Proposed Order
Date: June 18, 2018Proposed Order in Limine
Date: September 25, 2018Motion in Limine
Date: September 25, 2018Pretrial Order
Date: September 26, 2018ORDER RESETTING TRIAL
Date: October 01, 2018Invervenor Defendant's Motion to Strike/Withdraw Deemed Admissions
Date: October 02, 2018ORDER OF PARTIAL NONSUIT SIGNED
Date: October 02, 2018Proposed Order Striking Deemed Admissions
Date: October 02, 2018ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY SIGNED
Date: October 10, 2018Proposed Order Granting Motion for Continuance
Date: October 24, 2018ORDER SIGNED STRIKING PLEADING
Date: October 22, 2018DCA Generic Letter
Date: November 05, 2018Action Premier Hauling, Inc's Fourth Amended Petition in Intervention
Date: November 30, 2018Action Premier Hauling, Incs Original Answer
Date: November 30, 2018Action Premier Hauling Inc's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Reply
Date: November 05, 2018ORDER SIGNED DENYING PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: November 14, 2018The Pines Condominium Association First Amended Answer to Third Amended Petition in Intervention
Date: November 30, 2018Proposed Order
Date: December 04, 2018Intervenor's Motion to Compel
Date: December 10, 2018Proposed Order on Action Premier Hauling LLC's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Date: December 10, 2018Fifth Amended Petition in Intervention
Date: December 10, 2018ORDER SIGNED STRIKING PLEADING
Date: December 14, 2018Civil Process Request Form
Date: April 09, 2019Proposed Order on Omega's Special Exceptions
Date: April 17, 2019Proposed Order
Date: April 25, 2019DOCKET CONTROL ORDER-JCVO02
Date: October 06, 2020Action Premier Hauling LLC's Motion to Designate Responsible Third Party
Date: April 29, 2019ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD
Date: April 26, 2019Action Premier Hauling Inc's Motion to Dismiss
Date: April 29, 2019Proposed Order Granting Motion For Contempt
Date: August 16, 2019DOCKET CONTROL ORDER
Date: September 23, 2019Agreed Motion for Continuance
Date: March 18, 2020ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: March 25, 2020DOCKET.CONTROL.ORDER
Date: April 01, 2020PARTIAL DISMISSAL ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION
Date: March 19, 2020Proposed Order
Date: March 18, 2020ORDER ALLOWING ENTRY UPON LAND/PROPERTY SIGNED
Date: January 17, 2020ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: September 30, 2020Proposed Order
Date: May 11, 2020Proposed Order Granting Counter Party Defendant's Amended Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Date: September 10, 2020Agreed Motion for Continuance
Date: September 24, 2020Proposed Order
Date: September 24, 2020Proposed Order Denying Intervenor's Motion for Traditional and No Evidence Partial Summary Judgment
Date: September 30, 2020The State of Texas Subpoena to Appear and Produce Documents
Date: October 18, 2017Proposed Order on Action Premier Hauling, LLC's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Date: October 12, 2018Sixth Amended Petition Intervention.
Date: December 14, 2018Civil Process Request Form
Date: December 14, 2018Defendant, The Pines Condominium Association, Inc.'s Designation of Expert Witnesses
Date: December 17, 2018CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST
Date: December 26, 2018Agreed Motion for Continuance
Date: December 26, 2018Proposed Order
Date: December 26, 2018Proposed Order Denying Intervenor's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Breach of Contract
Date: December 28, 2018ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: January 08, 2019Civil Process Request Form
Date: January 04, 2019Action Premier Hauling, Inc's Seventh Amended Petition in Intervention
Date: January 04, 2019Proposed Order on Action Premier Hauling, LLC's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Date: January 04, 2019DOCKET CONTROL ORDER
Date: January 14, 2019ORDER SIGNED DENYING PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: January 31, 2019Third Party Defendant's Original Answer and Special Exceptions
Date: February 11, 2019Civil Process Request Form
Date: December 10, 2018ORDER SIGNED DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION
Date: May 12, 2020Civil Process Request
Date: April 09, 2019Proposed Order
Date: April 29, 2019DEFENDANT PINES CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT
Date: August 16, 2019ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR CONTEMPT
Date: August 16, 2019Counter-Defendant Action Premier Hauling's Answer to Pine's First Amended Counterclaim
Date: September 13, 2019Action Premir Hauling Inc's Third Amended Petition in Intervention
Date: March 02, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2021 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting |
||
November 09, 2020 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting AGRED CONT GRNTED |
||
November 09, 2020 |
Trial on Merits Trial Setting |
||
October 08, 2020 |
SUMMARY JUDG - MTN PARTIAL (TRCP 166A) Law Day Docket PER MICHELLE BY PHONE 10/5/2020 |
||
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | DOCKET CONTROL ORDER-JCVO02 | |
September 30, 2020 | ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE (Temporary Order) | ||
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | The Pines Condo Association Inc.'s Objection to the Proposed Order Submitted by Action Premier Hauling LLC | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Denying Intervenor's Motion for Traditional and No Evidence Partial Summary Judgment | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | The Pines Condominium Association Inc's Response to Action Premier Hauling LLC's Partial Amend Motions for Summary J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.