Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Beavers, Angela Jewel, against One 2008 Triumph Motorcycle, Pereira, Yanick Semedo Lopes, represented by Stoll, Michael E, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 061st with FREDERICKA PHILLIPS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFREDERICKA PHILLIPS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 05, 2017 |
CategorySeizure & Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court House061st |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment, Order Signed |
Proposed Final Judgment
Date: June 16, 2017Rule 11 Agreement
Date: June 26, 2017AGREED JUDGMENT, ORDER SIGNED
Date: February 14, 2018Proposed Agreed Final Judgment
Date: January 19, 2018Proposed Order
Date: February 22, 2018Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration and Modification of Judgment
Date: February 22, 2018JUDGMENT NUNC PRO TUNC SIGNED
Date: March 05, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2018 | ORDER MODIFYING AND AMENDING TEMPORARY ORDERS SIGNED (Temporary Order) | ||
March 05, 2018 | JUDGMENT NUNC PRO TUNC SIGNED(Final Order) | ||
March 05, 2018 |
RE-HEARING - MOTION FOR Law Day Docket |
||
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT NUNC PRO TUNC SIGNED | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER MODIFYING AND AMENDING TEMPORARY ORDERS SIGNED | |
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration and Modification of Judgment | |
February 14, 2018 | DEFENDANT COSTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.