Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ortega, Britney, Ortega, Estela, Ortega, Jose, Waste Management Of Texas Inc, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Boujaoude, Roy Antoine, Vaughan, Jeffrey Ray, against Cardenas, Filiberto, Roth, Anastasios C, Roth, Tasi C, Waste Management Houston Metro, Waste Management Inc, (total of 6) See All represented by Schadle, Caroline C., Wertz, Barry Lee Jr., in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 080th with LARRY WEIMAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLARRY WEIMAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2010 |
CategoryPersonal Injury-Auto |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House080th |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment Signed For Plaintiff (Non-Jury) |
DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: February 09, 2011Defendant Waste Management of Texas, Inc.s First Amended Answer
Date: August 31, 2010Proposed Order
Date: March 16, 2011Filing letter
Date: April 15, 2011Defendant Waste Management of Texas Inc's Original Answer
Date: April 20, 2010Filing letter
Date: April 20, 2010Filing letter
Date: March 16, 2011Filing letter
Date: August 31, 2010Plaintiffs Original Petition and request for disclosure
Date: February 22, 2010Proposed Order
Date: May 25, 2011Trial Preparation Order
Date: May 04, 2011DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: May 25, 2011Proposed Order
Date: October 07, 2011Amended Agreed Motion for Continuance
Date: October 13, 2011ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: October 14, 2011Agreed Motion for Continuance
Date: October 13, 2011Proposed Order
Date: October 13, 2011Trial Preparation Order
Date: August 23, 2011Proposed Order
Date: June 08, 2011Civil Process Request
Date: April 15, 2011ORDER SIGNED GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE 3RD PARTY ACTION
Date: May 24, 2011Order Resetting Trial
Date: October 14, 2011ORDER SIGNED GRANTING REFERRAL TO MEDIATION
Date: October 14, 2011Defendant Waste Management of Texas, Inc.s Second Amended Answer
Date: October 14, 2011Proposed trial preparation order
Date: January 11, 2012Proposed Order
Date: February 22, 2012Agreed Motion for Continuance
Date: February 22, 2012Proposed Amended order granting third agreed motion for continuance
Date: February 24, 2012Amended Third agreed motion for continuance
Date: February 24, 2012order resetting trial
Date: March 02, 2012ORDER SIGNED GRANTING TRIAL CONTINUANCE
Date: March 02, 2012notice -trial preparation order
Date: July 09, 2012Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion For Substitution Of Counsel
Date: July 31, 2012Plaintiff's Motion For Substitution Of Counsel
Date: July 31, 2012Letter to court
Date: August 14, 2012proposed Order
Date: August 24, 2012ORDER SIGNED SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY OF RECORD
Date: August 28, 2012Trial Preparation Order
Date: September 12, 2012Order Resetting Trial
Date: September 12, 2012Civil Process Request
Date: October 17, 2012Letter
Date: October 22, 2012Order Resetting Trial
Date: January 15, 2013Trial Preparation Order
Date: January 25, 2013Rule 11 Agreement
Date: March 05, 2013Rule 11 Agreement Regarding Trial Docket
Date: March 05, 2013Order Resetting Trial
Date: March 08, 2013Proposed Order
Date: May 03, 2013Proposed Final Judgment Against Anastasios C. Roth
Date: April 03, 2013Proposed Final Judgment
Date: March 22, 2013Attorneys Supporting Affidavit
Date: May 03, 2013Proposed Writ of Garnishment after Judgment
Date: April 09, 2014Filing Letter
Date: August 29, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address of Receiver | |
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Waste Management of Texas Inc's Application for Writ of Garnishment after Judgment | |
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Proposed Writ of Garnishment after Judgment | |
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Exhibit C | |
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Submission | |
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Exhibit B | |
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Exhibit A | |
August 30, 2013 | Docket Event | bond log in book | |
August 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Filing Letter | |
August 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Abstract of Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.