Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
T.H. Trust, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by George M. Bishop, Iii, against Pate, Judy K, Pate, Robert G, represented by Alicia M. Matsushima, Russell C. Jones, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts with James H. Shoemake presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames H. Shoemake Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 25, 2017 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
|
Motion for Contempt Index # 89
Date: February 24, 2021Motion (No Fee) Index # 86
Date: February 08, 2021Amended Filing Index # 84
Date: February 08, 2021No Fee Documents Index # 81
Date: July 30, 2020No Fee Documents Index # 78
Date: July 30, 2020No Fee Documents Index # 71
Date: July 30, 2020No Fee Documents Index # 80
Date: July 30, 2020Notice Index # 82
Date: August 05, 2020No Fee Documents Index # 79
Date: July 30, 2020No Fee Documents Index # 75
Date: July 30, 2020No Fee Documents Index # 76
Date: July 30, 2020Letters
Date: June 18, 2020No Fee Documents Index # 73
Date: July 30, 2020No Fee Documents Index # 77
Date: July 30, 2020No Fee Documents Index # 69
Date: July 30, 2020No Fee Documents Index # 70
Date: July 30, 2020No Fee Documents Index # 74
Date: July 30, 2020No Fee Documents Index # 72
Date: July 30, 2020No Fee Documents Index # 68
Date: July 30, 2020No Fee Documents Index # 66
Date: July 30, 2020No Fee Documents Index # 67
Date: July 30, 2020Notice Index # 65
Date: July 28, 2020Opinion Index # 64
Date: July 21, 2020Letters
Date: July 21, 2020Letters
Date: June 25, 2020Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 61
Date: March 16, 2020Proposed Order Index # 62
Date: March 16, 2020Proposed Order Index # 60
Date: March 13, 2020Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 59
Date: March 13, 2020Motion (No Fee) Index # 57
Date: March 12, 2020Order Index # 58
Date: March 17, 2020Notice Index # 63
Date: March 16, 2020Proposed Order Index # 56
Date: March 13, 2020Motion (No Fee) Index # 55
Date: March 13, 2020Order Index # 52
Date: March 04, 2020Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 49
Date: February 20, 2020Request Index # 53
Date: March 06, 2020Request Index # 54
Date: March 06, 2020No Fee Documents Index # 51
Date: March 02, 2020No Fee Documents Index # 50
Date: February 28, 2020Notice Index # 48
Date: February 19, 2020Amended Filing Index # 45
Date: February 07, 2020Notice Index # 42
Date: December 04, 2019Notice Index # 47
Date: February 19, 2020Motion (No Fee) Index # 44
Date: February 06, 2020Request Index # 46
Date: February 17, 2020Motion (No Fee) Index # 43
Date: February 05, 2020Motion (No Fee) Index # 40
Date: November 26, 2019Proposed Order Index # 35
Date: July 01, 2019Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 41
Date: November 26, 2019Motion (No Fee) Index # 38
Date: October 21, 2019Motion (No Fee) Index # 34
Date: July 01, 2019Notice Index # 39
Date: November 06, 2019Motion (No Fee) Index # 36
Date: July 10, 2019Notice Index # 32
Date: September 07, 2018Proposed Order Index # 37
Date: July 10, 2019Mandate Index # 33
Date: September 07, 2018Opinion Index # 28
Date: June 21, 2018Notice Index # 30
Date: July 18, 2018Issuance Index # 31
Date: July 27, 2018Counter Claim/Cross Action/Intervention/Third Party - Civil Index # 29
Date: July 18, 2018Motion (No Fee) Index # 27
Date: May 15, 2018Notice Index # 26
Date: February 05, 2018Letters
Date: February 05, 2018Notice of Appeal Index # 25
Date: February 02, 2018Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 21
Date: November 08, 2017Notice Index # 23
Date: December 11, 2017Other Dispositions Index # 20
Date: November 06, 2017Order to Reinstate (open event) Index # 24
Date: January 29, 2018Motion (No Fee) Index # 22
Date: November 30, 2017Certificate Index # 14
Date: September 27, 2017Notice Index # 19
Date: October 27, 2017Order Index # 16
Date: October 02, 2017Motion (No Fee) Index # 18
Date: October 27, 2017No Fee Documents Index # 17
Date: October 03, 2017No Fee Documents Index # 11
Date: August 16, 2017Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 15
Date: October 02, 2017Notice Index # 10
Date: August 16, 2017Amended Filing Index # 13
Date: August 23, 2017Certificate Index # 12
Date: August 16, 2017Proposed Order Index # 7
Date: August 16, 2017No Fee Documents Index # 8
Date: August 16, 2017Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 4
Date: August 16, 2017Motion (No Fee) Index # 6
Date: August 16, 2017Proposed Order Index # 5
Date: August 16, 2017Petition Index # 1
Date: July 25, 2017Issuance Index # 2
Date: July 31, 2017Issuance Index # 3
Date: July 31, 2017Letters
Date: February 08, 2023Letters
Date: February 07, 2023Letters
Date: February 07, 2023Letters
Date: February 07, 2023Letters
Date: February 06, 2023Letters
Date: January 20, 2023Clerks Record Complete
Date: January 23, 2023Letters
Date: January 23, 2023Letters
Date: February 06, 2023Letters
Date: January 23, 2023Clerks Record Complete
Date: January 20, 2023Bill of Cost - Other
Date: January 23, 2023Request Index # 175
Date: January 17, 2023Request Index # 176
Date: January 17, 2023Bill of Cost - Other
Date: January 20, 2023Letters
Date: January 05, 2023Notice of Appeal Index # 170
Date: January 04, 2023Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 169
Date: December 28, 2022Notice Index # 173
Date: January 11, 2023Request Index # 172
Date: January 11, 2023Letters
Date: January 05, 2023Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 168
Date: December 28, 2022Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 167
Date: December 28, 2022Notice Index # 171
Date: January 05, 2023Letters
Date: January 09, 2023Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 165
Date: December 28, 2022Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 166
Date: December 28, 2022Notice Index # 161
Date: December 06, 2022Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 163
Date: December 28, 2022Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 164
Date: December 28, 2022Letters
Date: November 08, 2022Notice Index # 159
Date: October 18, 2022Notice Index # 156
Date: September 27, 2022Final Judgment After Non-Jury Trial Index # 162
Date: December 28, 2022Opinion Index # 160
Date: November 08, 2022Motion (No Fee) Index # 157
Date: September 27, 2022Notice Index # 152
Date: September 01, 2022Order Index # 155
Date: September 16, 2022Notice Index # 158
Date: September 27, 2022Amended Filing Index # 154
Date: September 06, 2022Amended Filing Index # 153
Date: September 02, 2022Notice of Appeal Index # 150
Date: August 08, 2022No Fee Documents Index # 151
Date: August 15, 2022Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 149
Date: August 08, 2022Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 148
Date: August 08, 2022Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 145
Date: August 08, 2022Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 147
Date: August 08, 2022Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 144
Date: August 08, 2022Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 146
Date: August 08, 2022Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 142
Date: August 08, 2022Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 143
Date: August 08, 2022Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 140
Date: August 08, 2022Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 141
Date: August 08, 2022Proposed Order Index # 139
Date: August 01, 2022Motion (No Fee) Index # 138
Date: August 01, 2022Other Disposition/Non-Final Index # 87
Date: February 07, 2022Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 137
Date: February 11, 2022Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 135
Date: February 07, 2022Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 133
Date: January 31, 2022Copy Request
Date: February 09, 2022Order Index # 122
Date: February 04, 2022Notice Index # 134
Date: February 04, 2022Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 131
Date: January 27, 2022Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 132
Date: January 27, 2022Amended Filing Index # 130
Date: January 18, 2022Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 129
Date: January 12, 2022Notice Index # 128
Date: December 03, 2021Motion (No Fee) Index # 126
Date: December 02, 2021Proposed Order Index # 127
Date: December 03, 2021Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 125
Date: July 19, 2021Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 121
Date: June 21, 2021Proposed Order Index # 120
Date: June 21, 2021Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 123
Date: June 28, 2021Appeal of Associate Judge Index # 124
Date: July 01, 2021Motion (No Fee) Index # 115
Date: May 28, 2021Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 119
Date: June 21, 2021Motion (No Fee) Index # 117
Date: June 21, 2021Exhibit
Date: June 14, 2021Order Index # 116
Date: June 04, 2021Order Index # 97
Date: June 10, 2021Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 111
Date: April 27, 2021Proposed Order Index # 113
Date: April 28, 2021Proposed Order Index # 118
Date: June 21, 2021Motion (No Fee) Index # 114
Date: April 30, 2021Amended Filing Index # 112
Date: April 28, 2021No Fee Documents Index # 108
Date: April 22, 2021Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 109
Date: April 26, 2021Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 110
Date: April 27, 2021Notice Index # 107
Date: April 20, 2021Motion (No Fee) Index # 105
Date: April 16, 2021Motion (No Fee) Index # 106
Date: April 19, 2021Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 104
Date: April 14, 2021Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 100
Date: April 05, 2021No Fee Documents Index # 103
Date: April 14, 2021No Fee Documents Index # 102
Date: April 14, 2021Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 101
Date: April 08, 2021Notice Index # 99
Date: March 29, 2021Motion (No Fee) Index # 92
Date: March 16, 2021Notice Index # 98
Date: March 26, 2021Counter Claim/Cross Action/Intervention/Third Party - Civil Index # 93
Date: March 15, 2021Motion (No Fee) Index # 96
Date: March 26, 2021Amended Filing Index # 85
Date: February 08, 2021Amended Filing Index # 94
Date: March 22, 2021Notice Index # 95
Date: March 22, 2021Notice Index # 83
Date: October 05, 2020Notice Index # 88
Date: February 11, 2021Proposed Order Index # 90
Date: February 24, 2021Notice Index # 91
Date: February 24, 2021Letters
Date: May 01, 2020Letters
Date: March 09, 2020Clerks Record Complete
Date: March 09, 2020Letters
Date: June 21, 2018Letters
Date: February 20, 2018Letters
Date: February 21, 2018Letters
Date: February 07, 2018Letters
Date: February 20, 2018Letters
Date: February 07, 2018Letters
Date: February 07, 2018Letters
Date: February 06, 2018Bill of Cost - Other
Date: February 05, 2018Clerks Record Complete
Date: February 05, 2018Letters
Date: February 05, 2018Letters
Date: February 05, 2018Docket Sheet
Date: July 25, 2017Proposed Order      Doc ID# 62
Date: March 16, 2020Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver      Doc ID# 59
Date: March 13, 2020Proposed Order      Doc ID# 56
Date: March 13, 2020Motion (No Fee)Â Â Â Â Â Â Doc ID#Â 55
Date: March 13, 2020Motion (No Fee)Â Â Â Â Â Â Doc ID#Â 57
Date: March 12, 2020Motion (No Fee)Â Â Â Â Â Â Doc ID#Â 43
Date: February 05, 2020Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver      Doc ID# 41
Date: November 26, 2019Motion (No Fee)Â Â Â Â Â Â Doc ID#Â 40
Date: November 26, 2019Motion (No Fee)Â Â Â Â Â Â Doc ID#Â 38
Date: October 21, 2019Proposed Order      Doc ID# 35
Date: July 01, 2019Motion (No Fee)Â Â Â Â Â Â Doc ID#Â 34
Date: July 01, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
01-23-00008-CV_SUPP CLK RECORD FLD_FILECOPY LettersLetter from First Court of Appeals (Supplemental Clerk's Record Received) |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
*X Appeal - Form Letter/Receipt and Index LettersCopy of Receipt and Index Mailed to Parties for One Volume of the Clerks First Supplemental |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
01-23-00008-CV_CLK RECORD FLD CV_FILECOPY LettersLetter from First Court of Appeals (Clerk's Record Received) |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | LettersConfirmation from the First Court of Appeals - Clerks 1st Supplemental Sent | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
*X Appeal - Form Letter/Receipt and Index LettersCopy of Receipt and Index Mailed to Parties for One Volume of the Clerks Record |
|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | LettersConfirmation from the First Court of Appeals - Clerks Record Sent | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Clerks Record Complete-Index-First Supplemental Clerks Record CompleteIndex of One Volume of First Supplemental Clerk's Record |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Fax Confirmation LettersFax Confirmation of Bill of Costs sent to Attorney |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
*X Appeal - Fee Notice LettersBill of Costs Mailed to Attorney |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
X Cost Bill - Appeal Bill of Cost - OtherBill of Costs for One Volume of First Supplemental Clerk's Record |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.