Case Last Refreshed: 15 hours ago
Attorney General Of Texas, Gupta, Atul Kumar, Jain, Vibha, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Christine Rosetta Thrash, Leena Khaterpal Bhasin, Ronald C Muller, Stacy Schnitzer Mccarty, against Gupta, Atul Kumar, Jain, Vibha, represented by Christine Rosetta Thrash, Ronald C Muller, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts 328th District Court with Ronald R. Pope presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald R. Pope Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce - With Children |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House328th District Court |
Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 110
Date: October 12, 2023Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 42
Date: January 25, 2021Issuance Index # 40
Date: December 21, 2020Request Index # 38
Date: December 18, 2020Order Index # 39
Date: December 21, 2020Order Disposing Post Judgment Index # 36
Date: July 10, 2019Motion for Modification - Other Post Judgment Index # 37
Date: December 18, 2020Motion (No Fee) Index # 35
Date: July 10, 2019Certificate Index # 34
Date: June 26, 2019Certificate Index # 33
Date: June 17, 2019Certificate Index # 32
Date: May 20, 2019Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 31
Date: May 09, 2019Issuance Index # 29
Date: March 22, 2019Officers Return Index # 30
Date: April 23, 2019Case Information Sheet
Date: March 19, 2019Request Index # 28
Date: March 20, 2019Bill of Cost - Other
Date: January 09, 2018Copy
Date: January 22, 2018Motion for Modification - Other Post Judgment Index # 27
Date: March 19, 2019Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 25
Date: January 09, 2018Order Disposing Post Judgment Index # 24
Date: January 08, 2018Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 26
Date: January 09, 2018Copy
Date: August 04, 2017No Fee Documents Index # 23
Date: January 04, 2018Case Information Sheet
Date: January 04, 2018Title IV-D Post Judgment Index # 22
Date: January 04, 2018Copy
Date: May 30, 2017Order Index # 21
Date: July 27, 2017Copy
Date: May 10, 2017Issuance Index # 20
Date: May 08, 2017Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 19
Date: May 04, 2017Notice Index # 15
Date: May 03, 2017Counter Claim/Cross Action/Intervention/Third Party - Family Index # 6
Date: June 23, 2016Agreed Judgment Index # 18
Date: May 04, 2017Request Index # 16
Date: May 03, 2017Order Index # 17
Date: May 04, 2017No Fee Documents Index # 14
Date: February 21, 2017Order Index # 9
Date: September 16, 2016No Fee Documents Index # 13
Date: January 19, 2017No Fee Documents Index # 7
Date: July 15, 2016Notice Index # 8
Date: August 11, 2016Motion (No Fee) Index # 11
Date: December 29, 2016No Fee Documents Index # 12
Date: January 09, 2017Parent Education Certificate Index # 10
Date: September 19, 2016No Fee Documents Index # 5
Date: June 23, 2016Case Information Sheet
Date: May 27, 2016Officers Return Index # 4
Date: June 10, 2016Issuance Index # 3
Date: May 31, 2016Docket Sheet
Date: May 27, 2016Request Index # 2
Date: May 27, 2016Petition Index # 1
Date: May 27, 2016Order Index # 61
Date: July 19, 2022Letters
Date: May 31, 2016Issuance Index # 112
Date: October 18, 2023Officers Return Index # 113
Date: October 25, 2023Request for Issuance of Wage Withholding Index # 111
Date: October 13, 2023Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 109
Date: October 12, 2023Notice Index # 114
Date: December 21, 2023Order Index # 103
Date: October 11, 2023Exhibit
Date: October 13, 2023Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 107
Date: October 12, 2023Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 108
Date: October 12, 2023Order Index # 104
Date: October 11, 2023Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 106
Date: October 12, 2023Order Disposing Post Judgment Index # 105
Date: October 11, 2023Order Index # 101
Date: September 25, 2023Certificate Index # 79
Date: January 13, 2023No Fee Documents Index # 100
Date: September 06, 2023No Fee Documents Index # 98
Date: September 01, 2023Notice Index # 99
Date: September 05, 2023Amended Filing Index # 95
Date: July 27, 2023Notice Index # 96
Date: July 31, 2023No Fee Documents Index # 92
Date: July 26, 2023Notice Index # 97
Date: July 31, 2023No Fee Documents Index # 93
Date: July 26, 2023No Fee Documents Index # 94
Date: July 26, 2023No Fee Documents Index # 91
Date: July 26, 2023No Fee Documents Index # 89
Date: July 21, 2023No Fee Documents Index # 86
Date: July 21, 2023No Fee Documents Index # 90
Date: July 21, 2023No Fee Documents Index # 88
Date: July 21, 2023No Fee Documents Index # 85
Date: July 21, 2023No Fee Documents Index # 87
Date: July 21, 2023No Fee Documents Index # 84
Date: July 21, 2023Notice Index # 83
Date: July 13, 2023Notice Index # 82
Date: May 18, 2023Order Index # 80
Date: February 12, 2023Amended Filing Index # 81
Date: April 17, 2023Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 77
Date: October 17, 2022No Fee Documents Index # 78
Date: December 15, 2022Proposed Order Index # 75
Date: September 26, 2022Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 72
Date: September 22, 2022Order Appointing Index # 76
Date: October 12, 2022Notice Index # 73
Date: September 26, 2022Motion (No Fee) Index # 74
Date: September 26, 2022Motion (No Fee) Index # 69
Date: August 24, 2022Certificate Index # 71
Date: September 13, 2022Proposed Order Index # 70
Date: August 24, 2022Proposed Order Index # 68
Date: August 24, 2022Counter Claim/Cross Action/Intervention/Third Party - Family Index # 66
Date: August 04, 2022Motion (No Fee) Index # 67
Date: August 24, 2022Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 65
Date: August 04, 2022Officers Return Index # 64
Date: July 28, 2022Request Index # 62
Date: July 21, 2022Issuance Index # 63
Date: July 25, 2022Order Index # 59
Date: June 16, 2022Motion (No Fee) Index # 60
Date: July 19, 2022Motion for Modification - Other Post Judgment Index # 58
Date: June 16, 2022Amended Filing Index # 57
Date: March 07, 2022Amended Filing Index # 56
Date: June 24, 2021Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 55
Date: June 04, 2021Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 54
Date: June 04, 2021Order Disposing Post Judgment Index # 53
Date: June 04, 2021Order Index # 52
Date: June 04, 2021Notice Index # 50
Date: May 28, 2021Notice Index # 49
Date: May 21, 2021Notice Index # 48
Date: May 19, 2021No Fee Documents Index # 47
Date: May 07, 2021Notice Index # 46
Date: April 14, 2021Notice Index # 44
Date: March 24, 2021Motion (No Fee) Index # 45
Date: March 24, 2021Counter Claim/Cross Action/Intervention/Third Party - Family Index # 43
Date: January 25, 2021Officers Return Index # 41
Date: January 14, 2021Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver      Doc ID# 31
Date: May 09, 2019Request      Doc ID# 28
Date: March 20, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Employment Notice Index # 114 Notice Index # 114Notice of Change of Employment |
|
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Officers Return Index # 113 Officers Return Index # 113WHO Return for PricewaterhouseCoooers LLP. Issued on 10/18/2023 |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
* Withholding - Notice of Issuance Index # 112 Issuance Index # 112WHO Issued to PricewaterhouseCoooers LLP |
|
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | GarnishmentCMRR: 9336 0699 0430 0113 3465 38PricewaterhouseCoooers LLPServed10/24/2023Returned10/25/2023 | |
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event | GarnishmentCMRR: 9336 0699 0430 0113 3465 38PricewaterhouseCoooers LLP Unserved | |
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Notice to Employer of Income Withholding Request for Issuance of Wage Withholding Index # 111 Request for Issuance of Wage Withholding Index # 111Request for Notice to Employer of Income Withholding |
|
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event | ExhibitExhibit List for 09-06-23, 09-07-23 & 09-13-23 | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
* Judgment Notice 306a.3 (Effective 9/1/23) Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 110 Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 110 |
|
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
* Judgment Notice 306a.3 (Effective 9/1/23) Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 109 Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 109 |
|
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
* Judgment Notice 306a.3 (Effective 9/1/23) Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 107 Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 107 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.