Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
At&T Services, Inc., filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Fusselman, Christopher A., against Hall, Mason, Iii, Nobles, Willie Mae, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 193rd District Court with WHITMORE, BRIDGETT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2023 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House193rd District Court |
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: May 31, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: May 31, 2023MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: August 08, 2023ORDER - INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT
Date: August 10, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 08, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 08, 2023DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: August 17, 2023MOTION - RETAIN
Date: August 08, 2023NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: August 10, 2023DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: July 19, 2023DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: September 14, 2023MOTION - RETAIN
Date: July 17, 2023ISSUE CITATION
Date: May 31, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 17, 2023MOTION-SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: July 31, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 20, 2023ORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: August 01, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
193rd Initial DWOP Notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
193rd Initial DWOP Notice DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER INTERLOCUTORY DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO WILLIE MAE NOBLES ORDER - INTERLOCUTORY JUDGMENT DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO WILLIE MAE NOBLES |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
FP NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT RULE 239(a) NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF MTN INTERLOCUTORY DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO WILLIE MAE NOBLES MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT INTERLOCUTORY/ AS TO WILLIE MAE NOBLES |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER (PL) 2ND RETAIN NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER 2ND RETAIN |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER INTERLOCUTORY DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO WILLIE MAE NOBLES NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINITFF 2ND RETAIN MOTION - RETAIN PLAINTIFF 2ND |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER SUBSTITUTE SERVICE AS TO MASON HALL III ORDER - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE AS TO MASON HALL III |
|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF MTN SUBSITITUTE SERVICE MOTION-SUBSTITUTE SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.