Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Remver, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Cohen, Justin, Henley, Geoff J, against Amsoil Inc., Brooks, Brian, Cowan, Patrick, Tsg Trinity Security Group Llc, Tubaiste, (total of 5) See All represented by Courtney, Geoffrey N, Dubois, Allan, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 298th District Court with TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 07, 2020 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House298th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Remver, LLC has filed a civil action against Brooks, Cowan, and AMSOIL in Texas state court.
Remver and AMSOIL had a professional services agreement, under which Remver was to provide consulting services to AMSOIL for a pricing project. Cowan and Br...
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: August 07, 2020REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: August 07, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 27, 2020Final Disposition Hearing
Date: October 05, 2020RULE 11
Date: September 08, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 02, 2020SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: October 30, 2020MOTION - COMPEL
Date: November 02, 2020MOTION - PRO HAC VICE
Date: October 01, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 02, 2020ORDER - GRANTING PRO HAC VICE
Date: December 04, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 10, 2021MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: March 09, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 10, 2021MOTION - PROTECT
Date: January 22, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: August 07, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 19, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 20, 2020SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: October 09, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: October 08, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 29, 2020MOTION - SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Date: August 11, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 11, 2020SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS
Date: April 01, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: March 29, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 29, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 16, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER TO CROSS CLAIM - COUNTER PETITION
Date: April 05, 2021MOTION - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: April 19, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: April 09, 2021SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: October 08, 2020MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: October 08, 2020RULE 11
Date: September 30, 2020RESPONSE
Date: April 20, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 19, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 20, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 21, 2021MOTION - STAY
Date: April 21, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: August 18, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 29, 2020MOTION - WITHDRAW MISC
Date: August 24, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 16, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 29, 2020Special Appearance
Date: April 23, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: May 12, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 07, 2021COUNTER CLAIM
Date: March 12, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: June 07, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: May 11, 2021Special Appearance
Date: June 04, 2021RULE 11
Date: November 13, 2020MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: April 16, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 01, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: June 25, 2021REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: June 18, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 22, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 12, 2021RULE 11
Date: July 06, 2021SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: August 24, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 27, 2021AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: March 12, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: July 01, 2021RESPONSE
Date: August 20, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 23, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 27, 2021ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 23, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 23, 2021RESPONSE
Date: August 20, 2021SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: July 27, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 12, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 22, 2021CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: August 18, 2021OBJECTION
Date: August 20, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 27, 2021MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: August 04, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 01, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 01, 2021RESPONSE
Date: June 02, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 29, 2021AMENDED PETITION
Date: June 18, 2021RESPONSE
Date: June 02, 2021ISSUE CITATION
Date: June 18, 2021MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: July 22, 2021MOTION - PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: July 27, 2021MOTION - PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: July 27, 2021ISSUE CITATION COMM OF INS OR SOS
Date: June 24, 2021MOTION - STAY
Date: June 25, 2021Non Jury Trial
Date: August 03, 2021ORDER - STAY
Date: April 23, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 17, 2021DEPUTY REPORTER STATEMENT
Date: August 24, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 24, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - CONTEST LETTER
Date: August 27, 2021RESPONSE
Date: August 31, 2021MOTION - QUASH
Date: August 30, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 01, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 04, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 27, 2021RESPONSE
Date: August 23, 2021MOTION - LEAVE
Date: August 20, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 04, 2021MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: August 17, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 06, 2021SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: July 27, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 18, 2021RESPONSE
Date: August 20, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 18, 2021MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: August 17, 2021MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: August 04, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 28, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 20, 2021RESPONSE
Date: August 31, 2021Special Appearance
Date: September 03, 2021RESPONSE
Date: September 16, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 16, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 16, 2021Motion - Quash
Date: October 08, 2021OBJECTION
Date: September 10, 2021SPECIAL APPEARANCE
Date: December 22, 2021RESPONSE
Date: August 27, 2021Motion - Partial Summary Judgment
Date: September 17, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: February 09, 2022MOTION HEARING
Date: August 24, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 09, 2022RESPONSE
Date: September 17, 2021Non Jury Trial
Date: January 11, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 22, 2021RESPONSE
Date: September 10, 2021RESPONSE
Date: September 16, 2021MOTION - LEAVE
Date: September 10, 2021RETURNED MAIL
Date: March 23, 2022RESPONSE
Date: August 27, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: August 27, 2021RESPONSE
Date: September 10, 2021Non Jury Trial
Date: November 30, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 17, 2021NOTICE OF NONSUIT
Date: February 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL ORDER OF NONSUIT - GEOFFREY COURTNEY |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTE - CLERKS MAILED ORDER NONSUIT TO ALL PARTIES |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
LETTER CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE PLF FILING LTR RE-NOTICE OF AGREED NON-SUIT AND PROPOSED ORDER |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER NONSUIT NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER GRANTING AND ACKNOWLEDGING THE PARTIES' JOINT NOTICE OF NON-SUIT |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NONSUIT AGREED |
|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Non Jury Trial Notice Non Jury Trial |
|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendants_Unopposed_Motion_Continuance SPECIAL APPEARANCE SUBJECT TO THEIR SPECIAL APPEARANCES AND PENDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS OR STAY DEFENDANT AMSOIL INC., BRIAN BROOKS, PATRICK COWAN, AND TSG/TRINITY SECURITY GROUP LLC'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE |
|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER AGREED ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT AGREED ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non Jury Trial Notice Non Jury Trial |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO QUASH Motion - Quash VIA CONFERENCE CALL * PROPOSED ORDER NEED TO BE ON FILED SET BY CHARLEEN 214-821-0222 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.