Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Offen, Todd, filed a(n) Other (Civil) case represented by Clark, Collen A, Goff, James Meadows, Le, Linda, Mccrea, Mitchell, Von Plonski, Jacob, (total of 5) See All against Kenyon, Carla, Kenyon, John, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Statefarm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, represented by Boswell, Jacob C, Hightower, Wesley M, Walters, Randall G, Wilkinson, Kamela Ann, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 134th District Court with TILLERY, DALE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTILLERY, DALE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 02, 2020 |
CategoryOther (Civil) |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
|
Filing Court House134th District Court |
PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION AND JURY DEMAND
Todd Offen (hereinafter referred to as "Plaintiff") files this Original Petition against Carla Kenyon, John Kenyon, and Progressive Casualty Insurance Company (hereinafter referred to as "Defendants"), c...
ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: April 02, 2020NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: April 08, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: June 19, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: May 05, 2020AMENDED PETITION
Date: May 20, 2020NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: May 05, 2020NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: May 05, 2020Jury Trial - Civil
Date: May 10, 2021AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 27, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 08, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: April 02, 2020NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION
Date: April 08, 2020Motion - Sever
Date: November 09, 2020AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 27, 2020RESPONSE
Date: November 04, 2020SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: May 05, 2020AMENDED PETITION
Date: May 20, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: May 08, 2020NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: May 05, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: June 19, 2020MOTION - SEVER
Date: September 11, 2020Jury Trial - Civil
Date: May 10, 2021OBJECTION
Date: September 21, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 11, 2020ORDER - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: November 25, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 24, 2020AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: January 19, 2021MOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: November 24, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: October 22, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: September 22, 2021MOTION - QUASH
Date: September 20, 2021RESPONSE
Date: October 29, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 29, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 29, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 30, 2021SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: May 06, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 29, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 03, 2021Jury Trial - Civil
Date: December 13, 2021AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: September 16, 2021RESPONSE
Date: October 29, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: October 23, 2020RESPONSE
Date: October 29, 2021CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: October 19, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 20, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 30, 2021JURY DEMAND
Date: April 02, 2020JURY DEMAND
Date: April 20, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 10, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: April 10, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: April 20, 2020DESIGNATE LEAD COUNSEL
Date: July 06, 2020ISSUE CITATION
Date: May 20, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 01, 2020DISCOVERY
Date: January 19, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 17, 2020NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: May 06, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS
Date: May 10, 2021CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 11, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: April 13, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: March 15, 2021MOTION - QUASH
Date: March 11, 2021CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: June 02, 2021DISCOVERY
Date: May 12, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 13, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 18, 2021OBJECTION
Date: October 18, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: October 11, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 18, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: October 14, 2021CERTIFICATE OF WRITTEN DISCOVERY
Date: September 16, 2021OBJECTION
Date: May 03, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 21, 2021MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: May 03, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 28, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 27, 2021NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: November 08, 2021ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: November 02, 2021ORDER - COMPEL
Date: November 06, 2021MOTION - QUASH
Date: November 12, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 22, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 21, 2021ORDER - MISC.
Date: November 06, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: November 19, 2021MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: November 12, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 18, 2021MOTION - COMPEL
Date: January 25, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 13, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 04, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 28, 2021ORDER - DISMISSAL
Date: December 10, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 31, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 17, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 01, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: June 07, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 18, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 27, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 25, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 22, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: February 24, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: June 13, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: February 18, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 01, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: May 27, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 30, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 30, 2021MOTION - DISMISS
Date: December 07, 2021MOTION - COMPEL
Date: February 01, 2022MOTION - COMPEL
Date: February 01, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 01, 2021NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 07, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 16, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 01, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: November 22, 2021CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 29, 2021MOTION - COMPEL
Date: February 21, 2022MOTION - COMPEL
Date: February 21, 2022MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: June 07, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: March 22, 2022MOTION - QUASH
Date: May 27, 2022MOTION - COMPEL
Date: October 20, 2021Motion - Continuance
Date: November 01, 2021MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: October 20, 2021RESPONSE
Date: August 30, 2021ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: June 12, 2022MOTION - QUASH
Date: July 15, 2022NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: June 13, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: July 15, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 27, 2022CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: July 22, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: July 26, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: October 10, 2022MOTION - MISCELLANEOUS
Date: October 20, 2021MOTION - MISCELLANEOUS
Date: November 12, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: August 09, 2022Motion - Quash
Date: August 23, 2022MOTION - LEAVE
Date: August 18, 2022BRIEF FILED
Date: August 18, 2022Jury Trial - Civil
Date: November 27, 2023MOTION - DISMISS
Date: November 07, 2023DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 10, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 14, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 04, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: December 29, 2022MOTION HEARING
Date: December 15, 2021MOTION - EXCLUDE
Date: August 14, 2023DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 14, 2023OBJECTION
Date: August 14, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: April 12, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: April 12, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 20, 2023NOTE - CLERKS
Date: December 16, 2021Motion - Quash
Date: August 23, 2022FINAL DISPOSITION HEARING
Date: October 17, 2023Motion - Exclude
Date: July 17, 2023Motion - Continuance
Date: January 10, 2023DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 14, 2023DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 14, 2023AMENDED ANSWER - AMENDED GENERAL DENIAL
Date: August 23, 2022ORDER - DISMISSAL
Date: November 13, 2023ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: January 10, 2023MOTION - DISMISS
Date: November 15, 2023DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 14, 2023DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 14, 2023Motion - Quash
Date: August 10, 2022DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 14, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 20, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: October 31, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 11, 2023Final Disposition Hearing
Date: November 27, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: December 29, 2022Motion - Continuance
Date: November 01, 2021NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: August 14, 2023MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: August 11, 2023Motion - Sever
Date: November 09, 2020DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 14, 2023MOTION - QUASH
Date: December 22, 2022MOTION - QUASH
Date: December 22, 2022PROPOSED JURY CHARGE
Date: August 14, 2023DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 14, 2023DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 14, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: May 10, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: April 19, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 14, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 05, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: June 29, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: July 18, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: May 05, 2020WITNESS LIST
Date: August 14, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: August 04, 2023RESPONSE
Date: August 22, 2022MOTION - QUASH
Date: December 22, 2022OBJECTION
Date: August 14, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: November 07, 2023OBJECTION
Date: August 14, 2023DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 14, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: January 12, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: August 14, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: August 11, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 29, 2022DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 14, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: August 14, 2023MOTION HEARING
Date: August 31, 2021Motion - Compel
Date: February 23, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 14, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 14, 2023MOTION - EXCLUDE
Date: June 27, 2023OBJECTION
Date: August 14, 2023OBJECTION
Date: August 14, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: August 14, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: August 14, 2023MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: November 15, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: August 14, 2023OBJECTION
Date: August 14, 2023DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 14, 2023WITNESS LIST
Date: August 11, 2023OBJECTION
Date: August 14, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 14, 2023EXHIBIT LIST
Date: August 14, 2023CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: July 21, 2023NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 10, 2022ISSUE CITATION
Date: April 02, 2020DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 14, 2023MOTION - IN LIMINE
Date: August 11, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 19, 2023RESPONSE
Date: July 12, 2023DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 11, 2023DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 14, 2023ORDER - STRIKE
Date: July 21, 2023MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: October 04, 2022DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 14, 2023ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: April 17, 2023Motion - Exclude
Date: July 17, 2023Jury Trial - Civil
Date: August 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
134th Trial Notice Letters Jury Trial - Civil SPECIAL SET // All ready, 3-4 days |
|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
134th Disposition Mondays Setting Final Disposition Hearing |
|
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
MTN TO DISMISS MOTION - DISMISS JOINT |
|
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT PROPOSED ORDER TO DISMISS |
|
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
ESERVE ORDER PARTIAL DISMISSAL MISCELLANOUS EVENT ESERVE COVER LETTER - ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL ORDER - DISMISSAL AGAINST PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INS CO |
|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
AGREED MTN TO DISMISS MOTION - DISMISS AGREED |
|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
DC-20-05169 NFDH FINAL DISPOSITION HEARING NOTICE |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEF STATE FARM'S PROPOSED JURY CHARGE NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.