Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Investment Retrievers, Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Griffin, Michael J, Iii, Tucker, Carl L, against Espinoza, Gabriela, Espinoza Torres, Jorge L, represented by Clark, Robert M, in the jurisdiction of Dallas County, TX, . Dallas County, TX Superior Courts 298th District Court with TOBOLOWSKY, EMILY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTOBOLOWSKY, EMILY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 15, 2019 |
CategoryCntr Cnsmr Com Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDallas County, TX |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court House298th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: February 13, 2020Motion - Continuance
Date: January 16, 2020ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: January 16, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 05, 2020MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: January 09, 2020MOTION HEARING
Date: February 20, 2020REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: May 15, 2019ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 01, 2019ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: May 15, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: February 05, 2020VACATION LETTER
Date: July 01, 2019RESPONSE
Date: February 05, 2020ORDER - DENY
Date: February 20, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 09, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 23, 2020RESPONSE
Date: March 11, 2020CASE NOT SETTLED AT MEDIATION
Date: March 13, 2020MOTION - MEDIATION
Date: January 23, 2020MOTION HEARING
Date: February 20, 2020DISCOVERY
Date: August 29, 2019ORDER - DENY
Date: February 20, 2020VACATION LETTER
Date: July 01, 2019MOTION - CONTINUANCE
Date: January 09, 2020ORIGINAL ANSWER - GENERAL DENIAL
Date: July 01, 2019NOTICE SENT VIA EMAIL/FAX
Date: February 20, 2020MOTION - MISCELLANOUS
Date: March 09, 2020RESPONSE
Date: March 10, 2020MEDIATION SCHEDULED
Date: March 04, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: March 09, 2020RESPONSE
Date: March 11, 2020NOTICE OF JUDGMENT MAILED
Date: August 14, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 10, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: August 13, 2020ISSUE CITATION
Date: May 15, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: June 05, 2019MOTION - MEDIATION
Date: January 23, 2020FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW
Date: September 08, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 09, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: September 09, 2020MOTION - MODIFY FINAL ORDER
Date: September 09, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 09, 2020REQUEST FOR SERVICE
Date: May 15, 2019RESPONSE
Date: February 05, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 10, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 13, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: February 05, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 29, 2020MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: February 13, 2020MISCELLANOUS EVENT
Date: February 13, 2020CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: September 28, 2020CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 07, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 23, 2020Non Jury Trial
Date: January 21, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: January 29, 2020MOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: December 19, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: February 05, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 20, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: December 19, 2022MOTION HEARING
Date: October 02, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 02, 2020OBJECTION
Date: September 25, 2020CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE
Date: September 28, 2020NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: September 25, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING / FIAT
Date: September 14, 2020RESPONSE
Date: September 25, 2020ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: May 15, 2019NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: January 09, 2020Motion - Continuance
Date: January 16, 2020ORDER - GRANTING CONTINUANCE
Date: January 16, 2020CASE NOT SETTLED AT MEDIATION
Date: March 13, 2020Non Jury Trial
Date: March 31, 2020Non Jury Trial
Date: August 04, 2020Non Jury Trial
Date: August 13, 2020BRIEF FILED
Date: October 01, 2020Motion - Sanctions
Date: October 20, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE
Date: October 20, 2020RESPONSE
Date: October 15, 2020ORDER - DENY
Date: October 19, 2020ORDER - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY
Date: December 21, 2022NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT
Date: October 15, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER - WITHDRAW ATTORNEY | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL MOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL MOTION |
|
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER SUBSTITUTE COUSNEL NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT DENYING SANCTIONS |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE HEARING SANCTIONS Motion - Sanctions RESPONSE/DEFENDANT/FOF/SANCTIONS. KEVIN JONES 866-457-4107 |
|
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE LETTER RE:PROPOSED ORDER CORRESPONDENCE - LETTER TO FILE RE: PROPOSED ORDER |
|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER - DENY MOTION TO MODIFY JUDGMENT/TAKE NOTHING JUDGMENTFOR LACK OF STANDING ORDER - DENY MOTION TO MODIFY JUDGMENT TO A TAKE NOTHING JUDGMENT FOR LACK OF STANDING |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS RESPONSE |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
PROPOSED ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS NON-SIGNED PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS |
|
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
BRIEF/MODIFICATION HEARING BRIEF/TAKE NOTHING JUDGMENT-DEFENDANTS MOTION HEARING KIM 214-528-2400 MOTION TO MODIFY JUDGMENT T |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.