Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cannone Ventures, Inc., filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Adang, Anthony P., against Yasmin Nurani Badruddin A K A Yasmin Nurani, Yasmin Nurani Kaderali Badruddin, Zaharah Badrudin, in the jurisdiction of Saratoga County, NY, . Saratoga County, NY Superior Courts with Dianne N Freestone presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDianne N Freestone Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Void &Amp; Cancel Transfers) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSaratoga County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L
Date: August 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 03, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 08, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T-6 Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T-2 Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T-3 Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T-5 Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T-1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: February 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: August 24, 2021ANSWER
Date: October 19, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: August 24, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 08, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: February 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: June 23, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - GG Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - HH Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - JJ Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - II Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T-7 Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T-8 Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - CC Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T-4 Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T-9 Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T11 Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T12 Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Y Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - DD Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - AA Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - BB Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Z Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T14 Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T13 Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - FF Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - LL Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T10 Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 21, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - EE Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - MM Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: July 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - KK Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: August 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: August 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: August 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge Freestone 08 30 22 |
||
August 30, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Deed Copy - Enclosure 2 |
||
August 30, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 Deed Copy - Enclosure 3 |
||
August 30, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Deed Copy - Enclosure 1 |
||
July 21, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Decree |
||
July 21, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Assets-Inventory |
||
July 21, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #2) Citizen Acct 1380 |
||
July 21, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #2) Check |
||
July 21, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Petition |
||
July 21, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.