Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Keesha Woods, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Smith, Stephen J, Subin, Herbert S, Zieher, Maria Christine, against Dollar General Store, Mekkah Mediteranean Market, Musleh-Forest Realty, Llc, represented by Barry, Kerrie Marie, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County. This case was filed in Richmond County Superior Courts with Lizette Colon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLizette Colon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 10, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Personal Injury) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 29, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 10, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 10, 2020ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: February 03, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 18, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 04, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 18, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 10, 2021ORDER - DISMISSAL
Date: September 20, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: May 04, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 29, 2020RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 08, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: February 08, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Case Scheduling Order Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 08, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: August 08, 2022NOTICE
Date: June 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 08, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 12, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 12, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: August 27, 2021NOTICE
Date: September 08, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: September 10, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: October 27, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY *Corrected*
Date: January 26, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 06, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 18, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: June 08, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: August 08, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: August 08, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 08, 2022ORDER - MEDIATION
Date: July 05, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 02, 2020RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: April 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 04, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 18, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 23, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: January 31, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 08, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 27, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 31, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: October 27, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 06, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 06, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 26, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 18, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: August 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: January 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 31, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 31, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: December 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 08, 2022ORDER - MOTION - SHORT FORM Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 08, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 12, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 12, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 12, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 03, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 08, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #004)
Date: September 12, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
December 07, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
November 14, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
November 14, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
October 03, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
September 12, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #004) Plaintiff's Exhibit 5 - Order granting default |
||
September 12, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #004) Plaintiff's Exhibit 2 - Answer |
||
September 12, 2022 |
NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #004) Plaintiff's Notice of Cross Motion for Summary Judgment |
||
September 12, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #004) Plaintiff's Exhibit 4 - Compliance and Restore Order |
||
September 12, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 6 (Motion #004) Plaintiff's Exhibit 6 - PLT EBT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.