Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
In The Matter Of The Foreclosure Of Tax Liens By Proceeding In Rem Pursuant To Article Eleven Of The Real Property Tax Law By The County Of Orange, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Nothnagle, Matthew Joseph, against Ricky Guzman, represented by Haysom, Simon David, in the jurisdiction of Orange County, NY, . Orange County, NY Superior Courts with Sandra B Sciortino presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandra B Sciortino Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationOrange County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
PETITION Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 11, 2021NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: June 11, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 14, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: June 14, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: June 14, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: June 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1) Answer Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 14, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 14, 2021ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: June 14, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: April 01, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 14, 2021NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI)
Date: August 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 14, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: July 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: July 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 14, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: July 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 14, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: December 06, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 12, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: August 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 09, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 14, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 14, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: July 01, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 08, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 19, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: May 03, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: August 04, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 30, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: December 05, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: December 05, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: February 28, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
February 24, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
December 05, 2022 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
December 05, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 30, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
August 22, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
August 12, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
May 03, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
April 29, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
April 01, 2022 | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.