Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bank Of New York, Bank Of New York Mellon, Cwalt Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Leopold, Saul O, against Duane D Kinnon, Empower Federal Credit Union, represented by Shaw, Amanda C, in the jurisdiction of Onondaga County. This case was filed in Onondaga County Superior Courts with Joseph E Lamendola presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph E Lamendola Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOnondaga County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: February 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #4) Exhibit C - Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 09, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 10, 2022REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: February 02, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 04, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 16, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 16, 2021JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: August 09, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - Y Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: October 04, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #5)
Date: October 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 12, 2022COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: February 10, 2021EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: October 04, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 09, 2022RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: February 10, 2021FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: February 02, 2023CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: July 27, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 10, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 16, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 04, 2021NOTICE OF SALE
Date: September 12, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: November 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 04, 2021NOTIFICATION FROM COURT Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 09, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 04, 2022BILL OF COSTS Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 04, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: February 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4) Exhibit B - Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 09, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #4) Exhibit D - Assignments Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 04, 2021BILL OF COSTS Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 04, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: June 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3) Exhibit B- Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 04, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 02, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3) Exhibit C- Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3) Exhibit D- Assignments of Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3) Exhibit E- Notice of Default Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #3) Exhibit F- 90 Day Notices Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #3) Exhibit H- Summons and Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 04, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 09, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 04, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: November 10, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: December 10, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 09, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #3) Exhibit J- Affidavits of Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2023 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
February 02, 2023 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
October 17, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #5) Order for Extension of Time to Conduct Sale |
||
October 04, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP | ||
October 04, 2022 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
September 12, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 12, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
August 10, 2022 | Notice of Entry of Order Confirming Referee Report and Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale | ||
August 10, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Notice of Entry |
||
August 09, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.