Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Cheri Pierson, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Christensen, Jeanne-Marie Bates, Varghese, Renan F., against Darren K. Indyke In His Capacity As The Executor For The Estate Of Jeffrey E. Epstein And Administrator Of The 1953 Trust, Estate Of Jeffrey E. Epstein, Leon Black, Richard D. Kahn In His Capacity As The Executor For The Estate Of Jeffrey E. Epstein And Administrator Of The 1953 Trust, The 1953 Trust, (total of 5) See All represented by Barrett, Jennifer Jackson, Carlinsky, Michael Barry, Gwynne, Peter Anthony, Moskowitz, Bennet J, Parachini, Alexander Kitsock, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Suzanne J. Adams presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSuzanne J. Adams Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 28, 2022 |
CategoryTorts - Adult Survivors Act |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 28, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: December 15, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: December 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 21, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: December 15, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: December 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: December 05, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: December 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: December 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 16, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: December 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 20 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 21, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 21, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 28, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE
Date: January 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 05, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 05, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - BEFORE JUDGE
Date: January 04, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 06, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: January 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 06, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 06, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: January 11, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 05, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 09, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 10, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 01, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 01, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 01, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: February 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #005)
Date: February 01, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: February 01, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 07, 2023STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Date: February 07, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: February 14, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #005) Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Estate of Jeffrey Epstein, Darren K. Indy Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Estate of Jeffrey Epstein, Darren K. Indy ... show more |
||
March 15, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #004) Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant Leon Black's Motion to Dismiss |
||
February 14, 2023 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 | ||
February 07, 2023 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #004) Stipulation and [Proposed] Order re Mot. Seq. Nos. 1 and 4 |
||
February 07, 2023 | STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE | ||
February 01, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #004) Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant Leon Blacks Partial Motion to Dismiss |
||
February 01, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
February 01, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #004) Affirmation of E. Danya Perry |
||
February 01, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004) Notice of Motion |
||
February 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #004) Exhibit 1 - Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.