We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Lukasz Gottwald P/K/A Dr. Luke, Kasz Money, Inc., Prescription Songs, Llc V. Kesha Rose Sebert P/K/A Kesha (Counterclaim Plaintiff)

Case Last Refreshed: 13 hours ago

Kasz Money, Inc., Lukasz Gottwald P K A Dr. Luke, Prescription Songs, Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Frankel, Samantha Wendy, Lepera, Christine, Movit, Jeffrey M, Mullins, Bradley James, Nguyen, Elaine, (total of 6) See All against Kesha Rose Sebert P K A Kesha, represented by Godesky, Leah, Johnson, Allessandra Rose, Littleiv, Joseph Alexander, Little, J. Alex, Metlitsky, Anton, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts Supreme with Jennifer G. Schecter presiding.

Case Details for Kasz Money, Inc. v. Kesha Rose Sebert P K A Kesha , et al.

Judge

Jennifer G. Schecter

Time To Management

493 days

Filing Date

October 14, 2014

Category

Commercial Division

Last Refreshed

June 16, 2024

Practice Area

Commercial

Filing Location

New York County, NY

Matter Type

General Commercial

Filing Court House

Supreme

Case Cycle Time

1967 days

Case Complaint Summary

This is a complaint filed in New York by Kesha's record label and publisher, KMI, and one of its principals, Lukasz Gottwald (aka Dr. Luke), and Kesha's co-publisher, Prescription Songs, against Kesha and a number of her agents, alleging breach of co...

Parties for Kasz Money, Inc. v. Kesha Rose Sebert P K A Kesha , et al.

Plaintiffs

Kasz Money, Inc.

Lukasz Gottwald P K A Dr. Luke

Prescription Songs, Llc

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Frankel, Samantha Wendy

Lepera, Christine

Movit, Jeffrey M

Mullins, Bradley James

Nguyen, Elaine

Nourafchan, Gabriella A

Defendants

Kesha Rose Sebert P K A Kesha

Attorneys for Defendants

Godesky, Leah

Johnson, Allessandra Rose

Littleiv, Joseph Alexander

Little, J. Alex

Metlitsky, Anton

Kady, Zachary Arthur

Pearl, James

Other Parties

Geragos & Geragos, Apc (Non Party)

Katheryn Hudson Pka Katy Perry (Non Party)

Kemosabe Records, Llc (Non Party)

Mark Geragos (Non Party)

Rebekah Tischker (Non Party)

Sony Music Entertainment (Non Party)

Stefani Germanotta P K A Lady Gaga (Non Party)

Struble, Cory Daniel (Attorney)

Zibas, Jura Christine (Attorney)

Case Documents for Kasz Money, Inc. v. Kesha Rose Sebert P K A Kesha , et al.

REMITTITUR

Date: March 11, 2022

TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS

Date: November 03, 2022

EXHIBIT(S)  - 1

Date: May 04, 2023

REMITTITUR

Date: August 01, 2023

REMITTITUR

Date: July 11, 2023

REMITTITUR

Date: April 20, 2022

EXHIBIT(S)  - 10  (Motion #075)

Date: September 14, 2022

EXHIBIT(S)  - F

Date: August 30, 2022

EXHIBIT(S)  - A

Date: September 08, 2022

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED

Date: September 03, 2021

APPENDIX  (Motion #046)

Date: November 29, 2018

ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION)

Date: November 07, 2022

AFFIDAVIT  (Motion #048)

Date: December 05, 2019

EXHIBIT(S)  - A

Date: March 29, 2019

EXHIBIT(S)  - C

Date: August 30, 2022

EXHIBIT(S)  - 9  (Motion #075)

Date: September 14, 2022

EXHIBIT(S)  - B

Date: August 30, 2022

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

Date: September 08, 2022

EXHIBIT(S)  - A

Date: August 30, 2022

EXHIBIT(S)  - 2

Date: May 04, 2023

NOTIFICATION FROM COURT

Date: October 27, 2020

EXHIBIT(S)  - E

Date: August 30, 2022

EXHIBIT(S)  - A

Date: August 30, 2022

EXHIBIT(S)  - 3

Date: May 04, 2023

COURT NOTICE

Date: June 22, 2023