Case Last Refreshed: 9 hours ago
Sonny St. John Individually And On Behalf Of All Others Similarly Situated,, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Berger Montague Pc, Laughlin, Thomas Livezey, Scott+Scott Attorneys At Law Llp, Scott & Scott Llp, against Changxun Sun, China International Capital Corporation Hong Kong Securities Limited, Ching Chiu, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Cloopen Group Holding Limited, (total of 19) See All represented by Bassin, Sheryl Shapiro, Chadha, Priya, Cording, Charles Dean, Cosenza, Todd G., Diakos, Joanna A, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts Supreme with Andrew Borrok presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAndrew Borrok Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 19, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
Plaintiff Sonny St. John, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated, brings this action against Cloopen Group Holding Limited and others, alleging violations of the Securities Act of 1933. Specifically, the complaint alleges that the Reg...
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 03, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: October 03, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Â (Motion #006)
Date: September 23, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #006)
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #006)
Date: September 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #006)
Date: September 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: September 08, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #006)
Date: September 08, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: September 08, 2022ANSWER
Date: August 30, 2022ANSWER
Date: August 30, 2022ANSWER
Date: August 30, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE
Date: August 30, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 16, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 11, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: August 10, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 01, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 10, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 10, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 01, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 27, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 18, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #005)
Date: February 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 18, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 19, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 19, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 19, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 19, 2022STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 14, 2022ORDER - TRANSFER CASE - REASSIGNMENT
Date: January 06, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 06, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 03, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 03, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 03, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #004)
Date: December 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 03, 2021APPENDIX Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 03, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 03, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 03, 2021COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: October 04, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: September 17, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: July 16, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 06, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 28, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 22, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 22, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 17, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 17, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 17, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 17, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: June 03, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: June 03, 2021ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: April 26, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: June 03, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: June 03, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: April 26, 2021PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: June 03, 2021URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE
Date: April 27, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: April 19, 2021SUMMONS
Date: April 19, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #011)
Date: January 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #011)
Date: January 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #011)
Date: January 16, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #011)
Date: January 16, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #011)
Date: January 16, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #011)
Date: December 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #012)
Date: December 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #012)
Date: December 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #012)
Date: December 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #012)
Date: December 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #012)
Date: December 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #012)
Date: December 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #013)
Date: December 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #013)
Date: December 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #012)
Date: December 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #013)
Date: December 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #013)
Date: December 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #012)
Date: December 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #012)
Date: December 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #012)
Date: December 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #012)
Date: December 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #011)
Date: December 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #011)
Date: December 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #011)
Date: December 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #011)
Date: December 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #011)
Date: December 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #011)
Date: December 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #011)
Date: December 19, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #012)
Date: December 19, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #013) *Corrected*
Date: December 19, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #012) *Corrected*
Date: December 19, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #011)
Date: December 19, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #011) *Corrected*
Date: December 19, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #010)
Date: December 19, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #010)
Date: December 19, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #010)
Date: December 19, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #010) *Corrected*
Date: December 19, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #009)
Date: October 06, 2023ORDER - OTHER (MOTION RELATED) Â (Motion #009)
Date: October 05, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 16, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 16, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #009)
Date: August 16, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 06, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: April 11, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Â (Motion #006)
Date: April 10, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 19, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Â (Motion #006)
Date: December 05, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 15, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 11, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 11, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #008) *Corrected*
Date: November 11, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #007)
Date: November 14, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #007)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #007)
Date: November 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #007)
Date: November 09, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER Â (Motion #007)
Date: November 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #007)
Date: November 09, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #007)
Date: November 09, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: November 07, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 30, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: October 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 30, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: October 30, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: October 28, 2022ORDER - FINAL
Date: January 23, 2024ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION)
Date: January 23, 2024ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #011)
Date: January 16, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2024 |
ORDER - FINAL FINAL JUDGMENT |
||
January 23, 2024 | ORDER - OTHER (NON-MOTION) | ||
January 16, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #011) [Proposed] Order Approving Attorneys' Fees, Litigation Expenses, and Service Awards |
||
January 16, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #011) [Proposed] Order Approving Plan of Allocation |
||
January 16, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #011) [Proposed] Order and Final Judgment |
||
January 16, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #011) Supplemental Joint Affirmation in Support of Motion Nos. 118, 120, 121 |
||
January 16, 2024 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #011) Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion Nos. 118, 120, 121 |
||
January 16, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #011) Supplemental Affidavit in Support of Motion Nos. 118, 120, 121 |
||
December 19, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #011) Corrected Declaration of Gouzhang Wang in Support of Motion for Final Approval and Attorneys Fees |
||
December 19, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #012) Kirby McInerney Firm Resume |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.