Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Alberto Joseph Safra, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Baldoni, Jeremy Andrew, Matetsky, Ira B, Oblak, Jonathan, Schwartz, Alexander Matthew, Shehigian, Grant A, (total of 6) See All against Carlos Alberto Vieira, Carlos Cesar Bertaco Bomfim, David Joseph Safra, Jacob Joseph Safra, Simoni Passos Morato, (total of 7) See All represented by Bock, Karl Leon, Devlin, Michael Philip, Micarelli, Carl Jonas, Nelles, Sharon L, Porpora, Matthew Joseph, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Margaret Pui Yee Chan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMargaret Pui Yee Chan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 06, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Business Entity - Commercial Division |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
SUMMONS
Date: February 06, 2023RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: February 06, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: February 06, 2023ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: February 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 03, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 05, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16 Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 03, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17 Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14 Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15 Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 03, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 03, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 08, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: February 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 14, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: March 02, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 14, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: February 24, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 03, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #005) Return of Shares Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 26, 2023APPENDIX Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 30, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 30, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 26, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY
Date: June 30, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 30, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 29, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 30, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 30, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Â (Motion #005)
Date: July 06, 2023NOTIFICATION FOR SEALING
Date: August 25, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: July 10, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: August 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: September 11, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #005)
Date: September 11, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #005)
Date: September 11, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #006)
Date: September 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: September 18, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY
Date: September 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 22, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #006)
Date: September 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: September 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #005)
Date: September 11, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 26, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: April 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 26, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 23, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: March 23, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: April 26, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 23, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 06, 2023MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: April 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: April 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 23, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: April 13, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: March 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 23, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: March 23, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: June 23, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2023 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
October 06, 2023 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #005) Stipulation and (Proposed) Order Adjourning Motion in Room 130 |
||
October 04, 2023 |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Plaintiff's Co-Counsel from Ganfer Shore Leeds & Zauderer LLP to Dorf Nelson & Zau Consent to Change Plaintiff's Co-Counsel from Ganfer Shore Leeds & Zauderer LLP to Dorf Nelson & Zau ... show more |
||
September 22, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY | ||
September 22, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 22, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #006) | ||
September 18, 2023 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #006) Proposed Order to Show Cause Pursuant to 22 N.Y.C.R.R. 216.1 Directing Sealing of NYSCEF Docket No. Proposed Order to Show Cause Pursuant to 22 N.Y.C.R.R. 216.1 Directing Sealing of NYSCEF Docket No. ... show more |
||
September 18, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #006) Affirmation of Jonathan B. Oblak in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Seal |
||
September 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #006) Memorandum of Law in Opposition |
||
September 11, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #005) Affirmation of Jonathan B. Oblak in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismi Affirmation of Jonathan B. Oblak in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismi ... show more |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.