Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Street Snacks Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Carlin, Amy D, against Adam D. Luckner, Bridge Associates Of Soho, Inc., City Of New York, John Does, Numbered 1 Through 25, Midway Holdings Corp., (total of 11) See All represented by Anakhu, Joy Tolulope, Kamran, Peter K, Mirro, Michele, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts with Francis A. Kahn Iii presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrancis A. Kahn Iii Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Foreclosure) |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: August 12, 2021NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: August 24, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: August 24, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES
Date: September 23, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 24, 2021CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: September 17, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #005)
Date: April 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: June 14, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 09, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 01, 2022ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: February 04, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 17, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 14, 2022COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: August 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 01, 2022ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: September 28, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 14, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 14, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: June 07, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: June 10, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: May 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 14, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130
Date: May 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Z Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Y Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - BB Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - AA Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - CC Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: August 22, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 23, 2022SERVICE ON SUPREME COURT CLERK (GENL. CLERK) W/COPY OF ORDER
Date: August 23, 2022NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C)
Date: August 23, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Y Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 28, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #006)
Date: June 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: July 12, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 14, 2022REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE
Date: September 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M
Date: October 17, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O
Date: October 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 17
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 16
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 15
Date: October 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 18
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 17, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 14
Date: October 17, 2022REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 19
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: October 17, 2022REFEREE REPORT OF AMOUNT DUE
Date: October 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: October 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #007)
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #007)
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #007)
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #007)
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #007)
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #007)
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #007)
Date: December 14, 2022ORDER - STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: December 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #007)
Date: December 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: December 14, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #007)
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #007)
Date: December 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #007)
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #007)
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #007)
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #007)
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #007)
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #007)
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #007)
Date: December 14, 2022BILL OF COSTS (PROPOSED)
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #007)
Date: December 14, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #007)
Date: December 14, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #007)
Date: January 10, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #007)
Date: February 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #007)
Date: March 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #007) Affirmation in Further Support of Cross Motion |
||
February 22, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #007) Deposition transcript of Adam Luckner |
||
February 22, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #007) Affirmation of Amy D. Carlin |
||
February 22, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 22, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #007) Affidavit of Thomas Makkos |
||
February 09, 2023 |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #007) Adjourn to March 2, 2023 |
||
January 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #007) Exhibit 2 - Consolidated Mortgage |
||
January 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #007) Exhibit 1 - Consolidated Note |
||
January 30, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #007) Affidavit of Adam Luckner in Support of Cross Motion |
||
January 30, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #007) Exhibit 3 - Guaranty |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.