Case Last Refreshed: 20 hours ago
Keishe Olivierre, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Emery Celli Brinckerhoff Abady Ward & Maazel Llp, Houk, Diane L., Housing Works, Inc., against Parkchester Preservation Company, L.P., Parkchester Preservation Management, Llc, represented by Goodman, Carol M, Heighington, Andrew Ryan, Muller, Jennifer Morgan, Newman, Jared David, in the jurisdiction of New York County. This case was filed in New York County Superior Courts Supreme with Richard G. Latin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard G. Latin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 11, 2022 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Human Rights Law -Housing) |
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNew York County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
Plaintiff, Parkchester Preservation Company, L.P. (Parkchester Company) and Parkchester Preservation Management, LLC (Parkchester Management) seek an injunction against Defendants Parkchester Company, Parkchester Management, and Housing Works, Inc., ...
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 26, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 04, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 14, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 14, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 23, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 22, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 22, 2023ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST
Date: January 30, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: April 11, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 24, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: April 11, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 13, 2023STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)
Date: April 04, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 13, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 08, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 22, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: May 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 13, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 26, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 13, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 13, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 13, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 13, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 08, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 08, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: September 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 27, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: September 07, 2022ANSWER
Date: September 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 27, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 08, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 27, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 27, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 18, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 12, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 12, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 12, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: July 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: July 11, 2022RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: July 11, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: July 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: July 11, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: July 11, 2022NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: July 11, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 11, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2024 | Notice of Entry with Decision and Order on Motion, entered April 8, 2024 | ||
April 11, 2024 | Notice of Entry with So-Ordered Stipulation of Settlement, entered April 4, 2024 | ||
April 08, 2024 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) | ||
April 04, 2024 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | ||
June 22, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
May 26, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #002) MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS |
||
April 26, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #002) Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss |
||
April 26, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #002) | ||
April 26, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #002) City of New York's Memorandum of Law |
||
April 04, 2023 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -IN SUBMISSIONS PART -RM 130 (Motion #002) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.