Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
The Lcf Group, Inc.,, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Feldman, Adam J, against Angela Patterson, Angela Patterson D B A Angela Patterson D B A Faires Cleaning Crew, in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts with Christopher G Quinn presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 05, 2023 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 75 |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
This complaint is a verified petition filed by the LCF Group, Inc. against Angela Patterson, doing business as Angela Patterson and Faires Cleaning Crew. The petitioner is seeking to confirm an arbitration award rendered by Mediation & Civil Arbitrat...
BILL OF COSTS
Date: November 09, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 09, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 10, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 07, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 10, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: December 06, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: November 09, 2023NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT
Date: November 09, 2023NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: September 05, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: September 05, 2023PETITION
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: September 05, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 09, 2023 | BILL OF COSTS | ||
November 09, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 09, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
November 09, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 09, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
November 09, 2023 | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT | ||
October 10, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Angela Patterson d/b/a Angela Patterson d/b/a Faires Cleaning Crew- service of Notice of Petition/Ve Angela Patterson d/b/a Angela Patterson d/b/a Faires Cleaning Crew- service of Notice of Petition/Ve ... show more |
||
October 10, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Angela Patterson - service of Notice of Petition/Verified Petition/Exhibits/RJI/E-Notice (mailing af Angela Patterson - service of Notice of Petition/Verified Petition/Exhibits/RJI/E-Notice (mailing af ... show more |
||
October 10, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Angela Patterson - service of Notice of Petition/Verified Petition/Exhibits/RJI/E-Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.