Case Last Refreshed: 8 hours ago
Dino Bonavita, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Albani, Arjeta, Laughlin, Mark Alexander, Robin, Caitlin Anne, Volkommer, Kevin Scott, against North Shore University Hospital, Northwell Health, Precision Surgery Of New York, Pc, Syed Mujahid Sayeed Md, represented by Andrieux, Melissa Grace, Benvenuto, Thomas J, Klein, Nicole Lynne, Criscuolo, Angela Maria, Dyckman, Deborah A, (total of 11) See All in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Supreme with Thomas Rademaker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas Rademaker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management187 days |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
|
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau. The plaintiff, Dino Bonavita, is suing the defendants, Syed Mujahid Sayeed, Precision Surgery of New York, P.C., North Shore University Hospital...
EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 05, 2021NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 05, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 05, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 20, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 05, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #003)
Date: January 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 05, 2021AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 05, 2021AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 05, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 20, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: January 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 20, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: January 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 20, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 06, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: June 26, 2019NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: January 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 20, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: June 26, 2019STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: January 29, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 02, 2019STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE
Date: November 08, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 20, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 01, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 09, 2019ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 29, 2019COURT NOTICE
Date: January 29, 2019RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 28, 2024NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 22, 2019NOTICE
Date: November 14, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: August 18, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: August 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 22, 2019NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #005)
Date: April 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 22, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: April 11, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 22, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 31, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: January 17, 2019RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 17, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 24, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 17, 2019BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 17, 2019BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 17, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 24, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 17, 2019CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: December 19, 2018CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: December 19, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #005) Portions of North Shore Certified Chart - REDACTED
Date: October 24, 2022ANSWER
Date: September 28, 2018STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 13, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 20, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 13, 2018ANSWER
Date: September 20, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 13, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 13, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 28, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 24, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #005) Certified record from Precision Surgery of New York, P.C.
Date: October 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 12, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 12, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 12, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 12, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 12, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 29, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 12, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 12, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 29, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 12, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 12, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 06, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #004)
Date: October 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S)  - j  (Motion #004)
Date: August 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 29, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 29, 2022ORDER - CERTIFICATION
Date: June 22, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 22, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: August 17, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: August 15, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 22, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: May 25, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2024 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Expert Witness Response |
||
March 28, 2024 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 14, 2023 | NOTICE | ||
August 18, 2023 |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) CTCA Precision Surgery of NY |
||
August 18, 2023 |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) CTCA Syed Mujahid Sayeed, M.D. |
||
April 14, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #005) | ||
April 11, 2023 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004) mot4&5 |
||
October 31, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #005) Reply Affirmation (Motion for Summary Judgment) |
||
October 24, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #005) Affirmation of Dr. Greenberg |
||
October 24, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #005) Portions of Transcript of EBT of Dr. Sayeed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.