Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Michael Messina, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Dell, Joseph Gerard, Viener, Joseph B, against Morton Village Realty Inc., Phillips International Realty Inc., represented by Andreou, Michael E., Berne, Richard William, Cox, Ariel S., Johnson, Candace Renee, Lewis, Darnisha Alon, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Nassau County, NY, . Nassau County, NY Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with Erica L Prager presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management181 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 14, 2014 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1719 days |
ANSWER
Date: August 03, 2015ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: September 11, 2014ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: June 24, 2015ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: August 12, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 27, 2015THIRD-PARTY ANSWER
Date: August 26, 2015ANSWER
Date: July 31, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: June 24, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 16, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003) *Corrected*
Date: May 04, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 04, 2018ORDER - CERTIFICATION
Date: February 16, 2018THIRD-PARTY ANSWER
Date: July 31, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 14, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 03, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: September 04, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: September 05, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 22, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 03, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: August 13, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: May 15, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: August 07, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 18, 2018NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: December 03, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 30, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: May 18, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #007)
Date: November 06, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: June 18, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 02, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #005) *Corrected*
Date: June 18, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION
Date: June 28, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: October 15, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 30, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #006)
Date: July 26, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 15, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 15, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 31, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 11, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 24, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #007)
Date: October 15, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION
Date: September 24, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: June 18, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 02, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #007)
Date: October 15, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: June 29, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: July 26, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #007)
Date: November 05, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #007)
Date: November 01, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 28, 2014THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: June 05, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: June 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: June 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: June 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: June 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: June 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: June 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - L
Date: June 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - P
Date: June 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: June 28, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - N
Date: June 18, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #004)
Date: August 08, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - M
Date: June 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - R
Date: June 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #006)
Date: July 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - O
Date: June 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #006)
Date: July 26, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 28, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 29, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004) Exhibit B - Responses
Date: June 28, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q
Date: June 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #006)
Date: July 26, 2018NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #006) *Corrected*
Date: July 26, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 02, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #006)
Date: July 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 13, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #006)
Date: July 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #006)
Date: July 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 13, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 31, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004) Exhibit C - Responses
Date: June 28, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #004)
Date: July 02, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #003)
Date: June 29, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 30, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006)
Date: July 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 31, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #006)
Date: July 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 30, 2018NOTICE OF APPEAL/RADI/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE *Corrected*
Date: August 22, 2018AFFIRMATION
Date: August 13, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006)
Date: July 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 30, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 30, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 31, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 31, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 31, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 31, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 31, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 31, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 31, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 31, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 31, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - L
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - N
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #006)
Date: August 31, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - M
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - O
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q
Date: September 05, 2018NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - R
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - P
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - S
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - T
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #007)
Date: September 24, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #007)
Date: September 24, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 11, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #007)
Date: October 15, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #007) Original Bill of Particulars Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 24, 2018CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: October 22, 2018NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: April 29, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #007)
Date: October 15, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 26, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #006)
Date: December 03, 2018APPELLATE DECISION AND/OR ORDER (COPY)
Date: March 01, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 03, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #005)
Date: February 24, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 15, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #005)
Date: December 03, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 15, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 06, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: September 21, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #006)
Date: October 11, 2018NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 02, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #007)
Date: October 15, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 03, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: March 03, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #008) *Corrected*
Date: November 03, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 26, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #006)
Date: November 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 03, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 26, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 27, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 14, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 03, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 03, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 14, 2022SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: November 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #009) EBT TRANSCRIPT OF PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 14, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #006)
Date: July 26, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #008)
Date: November 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #009)
Date: November 18, 2022ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: November 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 01, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 01, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 28, 2022ANSWER
Date: November 29, 2022ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: December 01, 2022COPY OF SUBPOENA
Date: December 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: January 18, 2023TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: January 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: January 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: January 18, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: January 13, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: January 10, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 05, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: January 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: January 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: January 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: January 10, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: January 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: January 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 10, 2023ORDER - RECUSAL
Date: January 31, 2023EXTRACT
Date: January 31, 2023EXTRACT
Date: January 27, 2023EXTRACT
Date: February 01, 2023STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #010)
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #010)
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #010)
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #010)
Date: February 09, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #010) *Corrected*
Date: February 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #010)
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #010)
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #010)
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #010)
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #010)
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #010)
Date: February 09, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #010)
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #010)
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #010)
Date: February 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #011)
Date: February 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #011)
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #011)
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #011)
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #011)
Date: February 24, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #011)
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #011)
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #011)
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #011)
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #011)
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #011)
Date: February 24, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #011)
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #011)
Date: February 24, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #011)
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #011)
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #011)
Date: February 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: March 22, 2023MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: March 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: March 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 22, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #011)
Date: February 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: February 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 22, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #011)
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #011)
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 22, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #011)
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #011)
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #011)
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #011)
Date: February 24, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 22, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: March 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Y Â (Motion #012) W2 of 2014 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #011)
Date: March 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 22, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #010)
Date: May 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Z Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 22, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #012)
Date: March 27, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: June 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: March 27, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: September 11, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 03, 2017STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 25, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 26, 2015ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 17, 2018RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 05, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 11, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 05, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2015AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: June 24, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2015ADMISSION OF SERVICE
Date: July 31, 2015ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: October 07, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 03, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 11, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 05, 2015ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 19, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 14, 2015ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: July 07, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 22, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 03, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 22, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 24, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 22, 2015AFFIRMATION
Date: June 24, 2015CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: February 19, 2016ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: October 02, 2017ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: March 22, 2016ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: January 05, 2016ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: June 23, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: August 03, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 31, 2015SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: November 03, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 03, 2015ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: June 27, 2017ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: January 24, 2017ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: September 26, 2016AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 04, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 19, 2016ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: May 08, 2017NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 03, 2017NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: April 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 04, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 04, 2018AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 19, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 04, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 04, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 15, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 15, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 04, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 04, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 04, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 15, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 15, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003) Exhibit A
Date: May 18, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 04, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 04, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 15, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 15, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003) Exhibit D
Date: May 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003) Exhibit C
Date: May 18, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #003)
Date: May 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #003) Exhibit H
Date: May 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003) Exhibit G
Date: May 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003) Exhibit F
Date: May 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003) Exhibit E
Date: May 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003) Exhibit B
Date: May 18, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 25, 2018CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: May 21, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 18, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 18, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 25, 2018NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: May 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Morton & Phillips Motion to Vacate NOI
Date: June 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: June 18, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: June 18, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Motion Seq 010, 011 and 012 |
||
May 15, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
May 11, 2023 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #010) MOT. SEQ. 10, 11 and 12 |
||
March 27, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #010) Affirmation in Reply in Support of Motion for Post-Trial Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to CPL Affirmation in Reply in Support of Motion for Post-Trial Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to CPL ... show more |
||
March 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #011) Copy of Court's Decision |
||
March 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - O (Motion #012) Proposed Amended Third-Party Complaint |
||
March 27, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #012) Affirmation in Opposition to Third-Party Defendants' Cross Motion to Dismiss the Third-Party Complai Affirmation in Opposition to Third-Party Defendants' Cross Motion to Dismiss the Third-Party Complai ... show more |
||
March 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #012) Judge Prager's Rules |
||
March 27, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
March 26, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.