Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Alejandra Ramirez, Stanley Sarauw, Yazmen F. Cohill, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kreinces, Matthew R, Noll, Richard E, Viener, Joseph B, against Denise Russo, Ellis Bolodoff, Nassau Inter-County Express, The County Of Nassau, Veolia Transportation Service Inc., (total of 6) See All represented by Curran, Brian Francis, Ferretti, John R, Nicolini, John J, Quinn, Maureen, Scahill, Francis J, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Nassau County. This case was filed in Nassau County Superior Courts Nassau County Supreme Court with John M. Galasso presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2012 |
CategoryTort-Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNassau County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseNassau County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time2356 days |
ANSWER
Date: February 05, 2013COMPLAINT
Date: July 18, 2013STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: November 26, 2013NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 08, 2014RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 11, 2013ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: August 27, 2013NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 05, 2013SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2012NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #007)
Date: May 23, 2014ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: August 27, 2013DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 16, 2013ANSWER
Date: July 18, 2013NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 01, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 11, 2013MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #009)
Date: June 11, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #007)
Date: August 25, 2014MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #011)
Date: June 27, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 13, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: June 06, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: July 22, 2014MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #011)
Date: June 30, 2014SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: June 03, 2014NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #008) *Corrected*
Date: June 04, 2014RADI (REQUEST FOR APP DIV INTERVENTION)
Date: July 17, 2013NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #011) *Corrected*
Date: June 27, 2014NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #009)
Date: June 11, 2014APPELLATE TERM ORDER (COPY)
Date: July 02, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #009)
Date: July 29, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: July 21, 2014NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: November 26, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 05, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 05, 2013AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: June 13, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: June 12, 2013AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: July 08, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: July 25, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: April 23, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 29, 2013AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #011)
Date: June 27, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 21, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: April 16, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: June 05, 2013AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: May 02, 2014NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: July 17, 2013AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: August 29, 2013STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 04, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #009)
Date: June 11, 2014STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 21, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: March 25, 2014STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: March 25, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION
Date: June 04, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #005)
Date: April 16, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 22, 2015STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 17, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #011)
Date: June 30, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Â (Motion #002)
Date: June 05, 2013DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 10, 2013ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 25, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: April 11, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
APPELLATE COURT DECISION/ORDER (CERTIFIED COPY) originally filled 06-03-14 as hard copy to complete clerk record |
|
February 04, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
November 09, 2015 | Hearing |
Reassignment DCM Trial Part PICKED (Conversion) Judge: Trial Judge, DCM |
|
November 09, 2015 | Hearing |
Settled Randy Sue Marber Trial Part PICKED (Conversion) Judge: Trial Judge, DCM |
|
November 09, 2015 | Hearing |
REFERRED TO ANOTHER JUDGE DCM TRIAL PART PICKED Judge: DCM TRIAL JUDGE |
|
November 09, 2015 | Hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL RANDY SUE MARBER (TRIAL) PICKED Judge: DCM TRIAL JUDGE |
|
November 05, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned Central Jury TOD1105 (Conversion) Judge: Trial Judge, DCM |
|
November 05, 2015 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED CENTRAL JURY TOD1105 Judge: DCM TRIAL JUDGE |
|
November 04, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned Central Jury TOD1105 (Conversion) Judge: Trial Judge, DCM |
|
November 04, 2015 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED CENTRAL JURY TOD1105 Judge: DCM TRIAL JUDGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.