Case Last Refreshed: 19 hours ago
Sean Dugan, filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case represented by Aulivola, Michelle, Bohler, Nicole Lynn, Szalkiewicz, Daniel S, against Anthony Berini, represented by Cilento, Michael Dominick, Lin, David Dong Ann, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Supreme with Lisa S. Ottley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLisa S. Ottley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 08, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Defamation) |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Kings. The plaintiff, Sean Dugan, is suing the defendant, Anthony Berini, for defamation, intentional infliction of emotional distress, and false impers...
COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: April 16, 2024NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 02, 2024ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 29, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 24, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #3)
Date: January 24, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #3)
Date: January 24, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #3)
Date: January 24, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #3)
Date: January 24, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #3)
Date: January 24, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 13 Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #3)
Date: January 24, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #3)
Date: January 18, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 12 Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #3) *Corrected*
Date: October 24, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 24, 2023ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: September 22, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: March 16, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: March 08, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: February 27, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: January 06, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: November 16, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE *Corrected*
Date: December 05, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 04, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 04, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 04, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 03, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 03, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 30, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 30, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 30, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 24, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 24, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 16, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 16, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 16, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 19, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 19, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 01, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2024 |
COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Second Amended Verified Complaint |
||
April 02, 2024 | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #3) | ||
March 29, 2024 |
ORDER - OTHER DTD 03/27/2024 (DECISION/ORDER) |
||
January 24, 2024 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
January 24, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #3) March 16, 2023 Email from Opposing Counsel |
||
January 24, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #3) Patrick Dugan Affidavit with Exhibits |
||
January 24, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #3) March 16, 2023 Email to Opposing Counsel |
||
January 24, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #3) March 16, 2023 Email to Opposing Counsel |
||
January 24, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #3) January 16, 2023 Email to Opposing Counsel |
||
January 24, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #3) Daniel Szałkiewicz Affirmation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.