Case Last Refreshed: 19 hours ago
Najah Stevens, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Borden, Andrea Valley, Cassisi, Orazio John, Jacoby, Ashley Nicole, against Irt Partnership, Sdhr Management, Llc, represented by Gold, Jeffrey Bruce, Macchia, Robert P, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Supreme with Mark Partnow presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark Partnow Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 31, 2017 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Slip/Fall) |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: October 28, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 23, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 18, 2023NOTICE OF REJECTION
Date: October 18, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 06, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 18, 2023NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: October 17, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 17, 2023TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: October 17, 2023NOTICE OF REJECTION
Date: October 09, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 06, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 06, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 06, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 27, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 02, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 02, 2023AFFIRMATION OF ENGAGEMENT
Date: October 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 20, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 19, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 25, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 25, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 24, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: April 27, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 04, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 04, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: November 04, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 04, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: November 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 04, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 04, 2022NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: October 18, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 03, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 18, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: August 14, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 14, 2022NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: December 11, 2020NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: October 14, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: August 22, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 11, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: January 22, 2020ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 10, 2020ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 30, 2019AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 21, 2019AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 21, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 16, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 16, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 16, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 16, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 07, 2019AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 07, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 07, 2019AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 07, 2019ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: May 13, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 07, 2019ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 18, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 11, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 11, 2018STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 13, 2018ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: October 19, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 19, 2018STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 16, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 11, 2018DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 15, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 11, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 11, 2018NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (PRE RJI)
Date: July 06, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 31, 2017ANSWER
Date: December 15, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 15, 2017STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: November 27, 2017EXTRACT
Date: November 13, 2023TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: November 07, 2023TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: November 07, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 07, 2023TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: November 07, 2023SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 07, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 07, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 07, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 07, 2023TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: October 30, 2023TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: October 30, 2023TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: October 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 30, 2023CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 30, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3) Plaintiff Deposition Transcript
Date: October 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 30, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 30, 2023TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: October 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 30, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 30, 2023NOTICE OF REJECTION
Date: October 28, 2023TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: October 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 30, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2023 | EXTRACT | ||
November 07, 2023 |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Damages Motion in Limine |
||
November 07, 2023 |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS Defendant's attorney affirmation of diligent search |
||
November 07, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service |
||
November 07, 2023 |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS Defendant's affidavit of no additional coverage |
||
November 07, 2023 |
SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION (Motion #3) Certification as to compliance with word limit |
||
November 07, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) Affidavit of service |
||
November 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #3) |
||
November 07, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #3) Memorandum of law in support of defendants motion in limine to suppress plaintiff's use of inflamaory graphics and speculative testimony regarding future surgeries |
||
November 07, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #3) Deposition transcript excerpts |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.