Case Last Refreshed: 2 days ago
Nancy Lauricella, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Gabiger, Pamela J., against Arlington Professional Suites, Llc, D'Arcangelo & Co., Llp, Michael C Betros Cpa Pfs, represented by Cadet, Akim Christian, Dolce, Mariah Wind, Mandell, Adam Trent, Schultz, Bridget Molly, in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Thomas R. Davis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas R. Davis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Negligence) |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 15, 2024NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 28, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 12, 2024ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 12, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 28, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 25, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 25, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 25, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 25, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 20, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 20, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 05, 2024AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 25, 2024NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 25, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 20, 2024NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 20, 2024NOTICE OF APPEAL (AMENDED)
Date: February 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - H1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 20, 2024NOTICE OF APPEAL (AMENDED)
Date: February 11, 2024NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 08, 2024ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 26, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 20, 2024LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: February 07, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 20, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 20, 2024LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 19, 2024DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 09, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 20, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 18, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 07, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 20, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 07, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 20, 2024AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 20, 2024NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: December 27, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 07, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 17, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 07, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 18, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 18, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: July 18, 2023ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST
Date: July 18, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 25, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 12, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: June 02, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 07, 2022NOTICE
Date: July 03, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: June 12, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 06, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 01, 2023NOTICE
Date: January 20, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 13, 2022ANSWER
Date: June 20, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 06, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: December 04, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: May 26, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 13, 2022DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: February 03, 2022ANSWER
Date: February 03, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT *Corrected*
Date: December 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2024 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #3) of Order to Show Cause |
||
April 15, 2024 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #3) | ||
April 12, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #3) of Akim C. Cadet, Esq. |
||
April 12, 2024 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3) | ||
March 28, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #2) Plaintiff's Expert Disclosure |
||
March 28, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2) | ||
March 25, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) CERTIFIED WEATHER REPORT |
||
March 25, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) STATEMENT SIGNED BY BETROS-FELL ON ICE |
||
March 25, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) VERIFICATION BILL OF PARTICULARS |
||
March 25, 2024 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #1) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.