Case Last Refreshed: 7 hours ago
Jennifer Garofolo, Kenneth Garofolo, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Spilbor, Jonna M., Varble, Michael R., against Consolidated Rail Corporation, Csx Transportation, Inc., Devin J. Carpenter, Preferred Group Of Manhattan, Inc., represented by Bailey, Lawrence Randolph, Diberardino, Philip Joseph, Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford, Mainetti, Alexander Eli, Mainetti, Michael, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Hal B presiding.
Case Number |
Judge |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2015 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Personal Injury) |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: September 15, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: September 15, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 01, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: September 15, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 01, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 14, 2023ORDER - PRE-TRIAL
Date: November 15, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 13, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Â (Motion #4)
Date: October 04, 2023STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) *Corrected*
Date: September 12, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 04, 2023ADMISSION OF SERVICE Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 08, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 03, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #4)
Date: September 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #4)
Date: September 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #4)
Date: September 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #4) Pltf Verfied Bill of Particulars
Date: September 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #4)
Date: September 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: September 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 08, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 08, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 08, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 08, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 08, 2023NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: July 14, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: July 03, 2023TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: April 08, 2024LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2-4
Date: April 17, 2024TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: April 08, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 31, 2023NOTICE
Date: January 20, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: September 16, 2022TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: April 05, 2024LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 04, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 14, 2022EXTRACT
Date: April 17, 2024TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: April 05, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 04, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 25, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 04, 2024TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: March 22, 2024ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 22, 2024LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 26, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 01, 2024SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM
Date: March 22, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 25, 2024COURT NOTICE
Date: March 22, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 03, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 06, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 03, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: November 17, 2017COURT NOTICE
Date: November 26, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: November 17, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 03, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 22, 2021ANSWER
Date: June 16, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 14, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 09, 2019ADMISSION OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 03, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: November 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 18, 2020COURT NOTICE
Date: May 14, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: December 14, 2018AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 03, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: June 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 18, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 15, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 14, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 18, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 18, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 15, 2017NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 11, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 18, 2020ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: March 20, 2017LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: October 23, 2018THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: January 24, 2020ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 28, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 23, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 25, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 22, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 24, 2020APPENDIX
Date: July 06, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 24, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: May 08, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 24, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 24, 2019LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: July 06, 2016LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: July 11, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 08, 2018ANSWER
Date: June 20, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: July 01, 2016NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 25, 2016RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 10, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 21, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 21, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 10, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 21, 2024AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 22, 2016AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 29, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 21, 2024SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)
Date: April 11, 2016NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #3)
Date: January 08, 2024ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 21, 2024ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: February 02, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 05, 2024LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 23, 2024DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: January 05, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 23, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 28, 2015NOTICE *Corrected*
Date: December 20, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 08, 2024LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 15, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 14, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 14, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 16, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: March 31, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: August 31, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: May 06, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 03, 2022NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 27, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: May 26, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 13, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: June 15, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 24, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 03, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2-4 Exhibits 2, 3 & 4 (Court Exhibit 1 - uploaded seperately as Verdict Sheet) |
||
April 17, 2024 | VERDICT SHEET | ||
April 17, 2024 | EXTRACT | ||
April 08, 2024 |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS Deft Proposed Verdict Sheet |
||
April 08, 2024 |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS Deft Proposed Request to Charge |
||
April 05, 2024 |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS Proposed Verdict Sheet |
||
April 05, 2024 |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS Proposed Jury Instructions |
||
April 04, 2024 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
April 04, 2024 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Pltf letter to Court re Trial |
||
April 04, 2024 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.