Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bielski, Jerzy R,, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bourbeau, Esq., Allison K, Connor, Esq., John Patrick, Stobierski, Esq., John J, against Crocker Communications, Inc., Crocker, James B, Rutter, James J, represented by Benedetti, Esq., Kaci, Iacolino, Esq., Jessica L, Mccormack, Esq., Patrick Mallon, in the jurisdiction of Hampshire County, MA, . Hampshire County, MA Superior Courts with Richard J. Carey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2016 |
CategoryTorts |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHampshire County, MA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Affidavit of Attorney Brown
Date: August 09, 2016Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A Applies To: Bielski, Jerzy R, (Plaintiff)
Date: September 29, 2017Affidavit of Allison K. Murphy
Date: September 29, 2017Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum filed:
Date: May 11, 2017Amended: Second amended complaint filed by Crocker Communications, Inc.
Date: August 11, 2016Jerzy R Bielski's Memorandum in support of motion to file second amended complaint.
Date: August 09, 2016Amended: amended complaint filed by Jerzy R Bielski with jury claim
Date: June 01, 20163rd Party Complaint filed.
Date: February 17, 2016Received from Defendant Crocker, James B: Answer to original complaint;
Date: February 17, 2016Original civil complaint filed.
Date: January 12, 2016Received from Defendant Rutter, James J: Answer to the Third Party Complaint;
Date: March 28, 2016Service Returned for Defendant Rutter, James J: Service made at last and usual;
Date: March 10, 2016Service Returned for Defendant Crocker, James B: Service made at last and usual;
Date: February 19, 2016Opposition to to Plaintiff's Motion for attorney conducted panel voir dire filed by James J Rutter
Date: September 29, 2017Endorsement on Motion for Directed Verdict filed (#32.0): DENIED Judge: Carey, Hon. Richard J
Date: November 07, 2017Pre-Trial ORDER: Trial with jury 1-2 days. October 2017 Trial List
Date: May 11, 2017Affidavit of Christopher Brown
Date: June 01, 2016Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 01/13/2016
Date: January 12, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibits Destroyed Spoke with Attorney Stobierski, ok to destroy exhibits. | |
November 08, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered on this date.: Judgment on Jury Verdict After Jury Verdict Presiding: Hon. Richard J Carey Judgment For: Jerzy R, Bielski Judgment Against: James B Crocker Crocker Communications, Inc. Terms of Judgment: Interest Begins: 01/12/2016 Jdgmnt Date: 11/08/2017 Interest Rate: .12 Daily Interest Rate: .000329 Damages: Damage Amt: 57000.00 Filing Fees: 275.00 Costs Pd to Court: 56.58 Judgment Total: 69,821.08 | |
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Verdict of jury for party plaintiff Jerzy R. Bielski as to defendant James B. Crocker and Crocker Communication, Inc. in the amount of $57,000.00. Defendant James Rutter was found not to be negligent. | |
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Endorsement on Motion for Directed Verdict filed (#32.0): DENIED Judge: Carey, Hon. Richard J
Judge: Carey, Richard |
|
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Defendant in a 3rd Party Claim James J Rutter's Motion for Directed Verdict filed | |
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Judge: Carey, Hon. Richard J The following event: Jury Trial scheduled for 11/07/2017 09:00 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled
Judge: Carey, Richard J |
|
November 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Judge: Carey, Hon. Richard J The following event: Jury Trial scheduled for 11/06/2017 09:00 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Held as Scheduled
Judge: Carey, Richard J |
|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Jerzy R, Bielski's affidavit of written notice of intent to offer as evidence: medical bills pursuant to G.L. c.233, § 79G | |
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Event Result: Judge: Carey, Hon. Richard J The following event: Trial Ready scheduled for 11/06/2017 09:00 AM has been resulted as follows: Result: Trial Begins
Judge: Carey, Richard J |
|
October 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Attorney appearance On this date Jessica L Breton, Esq. added for Defendant James J Rutter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.